Mackeller v. Aiken, County of

Plaintiff: Nyah "Dani&quot Mackeller
Defendant: Aiken, County of
Case Number: 1:2019cv01765
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
2 Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett. Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Nyah "Dani" Mackeller. Aiken, County of waiver executed on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Turner, Tyler)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aiken, County of. (lbak)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nyah "Dani" Mackeller. (lbak)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aiken, County of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8517200.), filed by Nyah "Dani" Mackeller. Service due by 9/18/2019. (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackeller v. Aiken, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyah "Dani&quot Mackeller
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiken, County of
Represented By: Christopher W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?