Habersham v. U.S. Marshal Task Force et al
Petitioner: Christopher Habersham, III
Respondent: Charleston County Sheriff's Office, U.S. Marshal Task Force and North Charleston Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv01981
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
2 Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Habersham, III, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29406. (lbak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the court dismiss the #1 petition in the above-captioned case without prejudice and without requiring the respondents to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 8/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/13/2019. (lbak)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/13/19. (vhor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Habersham, III, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29406. (lbak)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Christopher Habersham, III. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/1/2019. (lbak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 3 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Habersham, III, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29406 (bshr, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Honorable David C. Norton no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christopher Habersham, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #2 Supporting Documents) (lbak, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habersham v. U.S. Marshal Task Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Habersham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charleston County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshal Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: North Charleston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?