Brown v. Centerra-Savannah River Site et al
Plaintiff: Marcialena Tremble Brown
Defendant: Centerra-Savannah River Site, Jerry Stevenson and Raymond Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv02047
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R Myers on behalf of Marcialena Tremble Brown (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Katherine) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/11/2019 with flattened document.) (lba)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 13 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #15 Issued Summons, #14 Order Service, and copy of the #1 Complaint placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marcialena Tremble Brown, 4393 Fulcher Rd., Hephzibah, GA 30815 (bgoo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Centerra-Savannah River Site, Raymond Smith, Jerry Stevenson. Service due by 11/18/2019. (bgoo)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER authorizing issuance of the summons by the Clerk and advising Plaintiff of the responsibility for service of process under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/20/2019. (bgoo)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as Plaintiff has now paid the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/20/19. (vhor)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SCX300083204. (lbak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #8 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marcialena Tremble Brown, 4393 Fulcher Rd., Hephzibah, GA 30815 (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district judge deny Plaintiff's #3 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If the district judge accepts this recommendation, it is further recommended Plaintiff be allowed fourteen days from the date of the order denying indigent status to submit the required filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/2019. (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/2019. (bgoo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marcialena Tremble Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Marcialena Tremble Brown. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centerra-Savannah River Site, Raymond Smith, Jerry Stevenson, filed by Marcialena Tremble Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Centerra-Savannah River Site et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerra-Savannah River Site
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcialena Tremble Brown
Represented By: Katherine R Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?