Colberth v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Colberth
Defendant: Larry Cartledge, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Michael Stephan, Dennis Bush, Greg Washington and Captain Christine Livingston
Case Number: 1:2019cv02111
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES SUPPLEMENTAL by Junior Kiker, Dennis Terry, Anthony Bolden, Matthew Gilliard, Jeffrey Colberth, Sean Milan.Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02692-DCC-MGB et al.(Bell, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Global Status Conference held on 8/13/2019. Court Reporter Virginia Druce, CourtSmart. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02692-DCC-MGB et al.(hhil, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Global Status Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. The District Judges have assigned all of the cases alleging systemic prison violence at SCDC, brought by the Bell Legal Group, to Judge Baker for pretrial handling. At the global status conference, Judge Baker will discuss how these cases will be handled moving forward. (hada, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: Dispositive Motions due by 10/07/2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/26/2019. (hada, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Bush, Larry Cartledge, Christine Livingston, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Michael Stephan, Greg Washington, filed by Jeffrey Colberth.(hada, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order: Defendants' Motion to Sever (Dkt. No. 141 in 1:17-cv-02692-DCC-MGB) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims should be SEVERED into separate actions. Plaintiff Milan will continue under the instant civil action number. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign new civil action numbers to each of the other individual Plaintiffs.(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colberth v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cartledge
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stephan
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Bush
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Washington
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Christine Livingston
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Colberth
Represented By: Gabrielle Anna Sulpizio
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?