Lockwood v. Charleston County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Antwan Lockwood and Antwan Jabar Lockwood
Defendant: Sheriff Al Canon, Charleston County Detention Center, Charleston County Sheriff's Office and Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv02134
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #20 Notice of Appeal, #21 Transmittal Sheet and Docket Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Antwan Jabar Lockwood, 0000414604, Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29405. (lbak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #20 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (lbak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #20 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (lbak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #17 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation by Antwan Jabar Lockwood. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #17 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation and #18 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Antwan Jabar Lockwood, 0000414604, Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29405. (lbak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT dismissing the action with prejudice. (lbak)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting the #13 Report and Recommendation and dismissing the #7 amended complaint with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 9/9/2019. (lbak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendation by Antwan Jabar Lockwood. Reply to Objections due by 9/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #12 Order - 1983 - No Service and #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Antwan Jabar Lockwood, 0000414604, Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave., N. Charleston, SC 29405. (lbak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge dismiss the #7 amended complaint without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/13/2019. (lbak)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Motion granted: #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/13/2019. (lbak)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Antwan Jabar Lockwood. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center, filed by Antwan Jabar Lockwood. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelopes) (bgoo)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, #5 Order, standard prisoner complaint form, IFP Application, one Summons and three Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Antwan Lockwood, 3841 Leeds Ave., North Chas, SC 29405. (lbak)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by August 23, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended compliant replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 8/23/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/2/2019. (lbak)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/2/2019. (lbak)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Al Canon, Charleston County Detention Center, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, filed by Antwan Lockwood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockwood v. Charleston County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Al Canon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Al Canon Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Jabar Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?