Jackson v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Jaelan Jackson
Defendant: Sheriff Anthony Dennis, Capt. Blanding and C.O. Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv02382
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #14 Order on Report and Recommendation and #15 Judgment, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jaelan Jackson, 102-238-6940, Sumter County Sheriff Detention, 1250 Winkles Rd., Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice. (lbak)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER affirming #11 Report and Recommendation, dismissing case without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/16/2019.(eric, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Order - 1983 - No Service, #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jaelan Jackson, 102-238-6940, Sumter County Sheriff Detention, 1250 Winkles Rd., Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff notifies the court within the time set for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that he wishes to continue with this case and either pays the filing fee or submits an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and Recommendation and return the file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the district judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 10/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/24/2019. (lbak)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/24/2019. (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order, standard prisoner complaint form, IFP Application, one Summons and three Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jaelan Jackson, 102-238-6940, Sumter County Sheriff Detention, 1250 Winkles Rd., Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by September 20, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims as to Sheriff and Captain be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 9/20/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/30/2019. (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 9/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion denied: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/30/2019. (lbak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jaelan Jackson. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blanding, Anthony Dennis, Williams, filed by Jaelan Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jaelan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Anthony Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Blanding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?