Lisenby v. Rasar et al
Plaintiff: Billy Lee Lisenby, Jr and Malik Al-Shabazz
Defendant: Michael Rasar, Tahirah Thomas and Shanda Priester
Case Number: 1:2021cv01139
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Billy Lee Lisenby, Jr (Malik Al-Shabazz), Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209.. Document Returned: #12 Scheduling Order. (prou, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #12 Scheduling Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Billy Lee Lisenby, Jr (Malik Al-Shabazz), Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/20/2021, Discovery due by 6/21/2021, Motions due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/20/2021. (prou, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Shanda Priester, Michael Rasar, Tahirah Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jett, Norma A); Modified on 4/20/2021 to correct event type(prou, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 Order to Notify of Address Change w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Billy Lee Lisenby (Malik Al-Shabazz), Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/19/2021. (prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Aiken. (prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shanda Priester, Michael Rasar, Tahirah Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Barnwell County Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-06-00079. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9781893), filed by Michael Rasar, Shanda Priester, Tahirah Thomas. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Certificate of Service)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisenby v. Rasar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Lee Lisenby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Al-Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rasar
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahirah Thomas
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanda Priester
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?