Brown v. Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Defendant: Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Kenyon Jemel Brown
Respondent: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2021cv03668
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kenyon Jemel Brown, 257742, Lieber Correctional Facility, 136 Wilborn Ave., P.O. Box 205, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (lbak)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's deadline to make return or otherwise plead is now February 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/4/22. (vhor)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Evans, Tommy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Order 2254 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kenyon Jemel Brown, 257742, Lieber Correctional Facility, 136 Wilborn Ave., P.O. Box 205, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (lbak)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER authorizing service of process. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 1/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 2254 Habeas Petition) (lbak)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Rock Hill. (lbak)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number SCX300096232.), filed by Kenyon Jemel Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenyon Jemel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Represented By: Tommy Evans, Jr
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?