Burnett v. Wilson
Petitioner: James L. Burnett
Respondent: Alan Wilson and Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2022cv00057
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
February 24, 2022 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 Terxt Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James L. Burnett, 171713, Tyger River C.I., 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (lbak)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #14 motion to proceed to the extent it requests the petition to be served on Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/24/22. (vhor)
February 24, 2022 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #15 Order 2254 and 16 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James L. Burnett, 171713, Tyger River C.I., 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (lbak)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/23/2022. (lbak)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER authorizing service of process. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 4/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 2254 Habeas Petition) (lbak)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION To Proceed - Seeking Habeas Corpus Relief by James L. Burnett. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
February 15, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by James L. Burnett. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300097677 (lbak)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James L. Burnett, 171713, Tyger River C.I., 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (lbak)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's deadline has already been extended until February 24, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/7/22. (vhor)
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by James L. Burnett. Response to Motion due by 2/18/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James L. Burnett, 171713, Tyger River C.I., 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (lbak)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/24/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/3/2022. (lbak)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #4 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James L. Burnett, 171713, Tyger River C.I., 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (lbak)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 1/31/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.); Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution added. Alan Wilson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/10/2022. (lbak)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (lbak)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James L. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?