American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Cathy T. Sherlock
Case Number: 1:2023cv03578
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American National Insurance Company (Tarver, Derek)
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Cathy T. Sherlock served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified on 8/29/2023 (cbru, ).
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5. Reason: Per request of e-filing attorney. (cbru, )
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cathy T. Sherlock. (cbru, )
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(cbru, )
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cathy T. Sherlock (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11228101) filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 10/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mary G. Carroll Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Plea, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mary G. Carroll Judgment, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Judgment, #7 Exhibit 7 - New Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 8 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #9 Exhibit 9 - RICO Information, #10 Exhibit 10 - Patrick Sherlock Plea, #11 Exhibit 11 - Patrick Sherlock Judgment, #12 Exhibit 12 - Williamson Indictment, #13 Exhibit 13 - Williamson Information, #14 Exhibit 14 - Williamson Plea, #15 Exhibit 15 - Williamson Sentencing Hearing Transcript, #16 Exhibit 16 - Williamson Judgment, #17 Exhibit 17 - Application, #18 Exhibit 18 - Cathy T. Sherlock Premium Payments, #19 Exhibit 19 - Cathy T. Sherlock Correspondence, #20 Exhibit 20 - Reinstatement Application, #21 Exhibit 21 - Change of Beneficiary Form)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Represented By: Ethan Robert Ware, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy T. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?