American National Insurance Company v. Riley
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Patrick M. Riley
Case Number: 1:2023cv03711
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Patrick M. Riley answer due 10/5/2023. (Lydon, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 9/13/2023 (cbru, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Patrick M. Riley served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 8/29/2023 (cbru, ).
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(Tarver, Derek)
August 1, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Patrick M. Riley. (cbru, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(cbru, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick M. Riley (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11238168) filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 10/30/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - New Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 7 - RICO Information, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ann Carrol Guilty Plea, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ann Carroll Sentencing Memorandum, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ann Carroll Judgment, #11 Exhibit 11 - 9949 Application_Redacted, #12 Exhibit 12 - 9949 Change of Ben. Form_Redacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Ann Carroll Sentencing Hearing Transcript, #14 Exhibit 14 - 9949 Change of Address 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - 9949 Payment Records_Redacted, #16 Exhibit 16 - 9949 Change of Address 2, #17 Exhibit 17 - 6242 Application_Redacted, #18 Exhibit 18 - 6242 Change of Address 1, #19 Exhibit 19 - 6242 Change of Address 2_Redacted, #20 Exhibit 20 - 6242 Payment Records_Redacted, #21 Exhibit 21 - 6242 Change of Address 3)(cbru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 8/1/2023 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Riley
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?