American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Caroline Sherlock
Case Number: 1:2023cv03713
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American National Insurance Company (Tarver, Derek)
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Caroline Sherlock served on 8/26/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 8/29/2023 (cbru, ).
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(Tarver, Derek)
August 1, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caroline Sherlock. (cbru, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(cbru, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caroline Sherlock (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11238265) filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 10/30/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Caroline Sherlock Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Plea, #5 Exhibit 5 - Caroline Sherlock Judgment, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Judgment, #7 Exhibit 7 - New Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 8 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #9 Exhibit 9 - RICO Information, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ann Carrol Guilty Plea, #11 Exhibit 11 - Ann Carroll Sentencing Memo, #12 Exhibit 12 - Ann Carroll Judgment, #13 Exhibit 13 - Caroline Sherlock Application_Redacted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ann Carroll Sentencing Memo)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?