American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Michelle Sherlock
Case Number: 1:2023cv03754
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American National Insurance Company (Tarver, Derek)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Michelle Sherlock served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 9/6/2023 (cbru, ).
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(Tarver, Derek)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michelle Sherlock. (cbru, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(cbru, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Sherlock (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11243721) filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 10/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - New Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 7 - AGLIC v. Ann Mack, #8 Exhibit 8 - Change of Ownership Form - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Check Debit Form - Redacted)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?