American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary Riley Sherlock
Case Number: 1:2023cv03759
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Mary Riley Sherlock answer due 10/5/2023. (Lydon, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 9/8/2023 (cbru, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Mary Riley Sherlock served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 8/29/2023 (cbru, ).
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mary Riley Sherlock. (cbru, )
August 21, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mary Riley Sherlock, filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 11/20/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - New Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 7 - Initial Application - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pre-Authorized Payment Plan - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Change in Beneficiary - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 10 - Initial Change of Address Form, #11 Exhibit 11 - Policy Modification Application - Redacted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Second Pre-Authorized Payment Plan - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Payment Records - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Second Change of Address, #15 Exhibit 15 - Correspondence Records, #16 Exhibit 16 - Aiken County Prop. Records - 1044 Reynolds Pond Property Records, #17 Exhibit 17 - Secretary of State Records, #18 Exhibit 18 - Aiken County Prop. Records - 15 Mim Woodring Property Records, #19 Exhibit 19 - Change of Owner form - Redacted, #20 Exhibit 20 - 4258 Application - Redacted, #21 Summons) (Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 8/21/2023 (cbru, ).
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mary Riley Sherlock. (jpet, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(jpet, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Riley Sherlock ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11244301.), filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 10/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - New Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 7 - Application (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 8 - Check Debit Authorization Form (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 9 - Payment Records (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 - Change of Address, #11 Exhibit 11 - Correspondence Records, #12 Exhibit 12 - Aiken County Prop. Records - 1044 Reynolds Pond Property Records, #13 Exhibit 13 - Secretary of State Records, #14 Exhibit 14 - Aiken County Prop. Records - 15 Mim Woodring Property Records, #15 Exhibit 15 - Change of Owner form (Redacted))(jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Riley Sherlock
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?