American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary O. Sherlock
Case Number: 1:2023cv04208
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/11/2023. (cbru, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by American National Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tamasitis, John)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American National Insurance Company (Tamasitis, John)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7. Reason: The document should not have been filed with the court because it is neither a motion nor is it in compliance with Local Civil Rule 83.I.07(A). (cbru, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Tamasitis on behalf of American National Insurance Company (Tamasitis, John)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Mary O. Sherlock answer due 10/5/2023.(Lydon, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 9/8/2023 (cbru, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Insurance Company. Mary O. Sherlock served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Tarver, Derek) Modified to edit text on 8/29/2023 (cbru, ).
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mary O. Sherlock. (cbru, )
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(cbru, )
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary O. Sherlock (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11280353) filed by American National Insurance Company. Service due by 11/20/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Grosse General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - RICO Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Plea, #4 Exhibit 4 - New Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - New Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 - New Sentencing Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 7 - New Affidavit - Mary O. Sherlock U0629848, #8 Exhibit 8 - Application - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mary Jean Sherlock Debit Authorization - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 10 - Application for Reinstatement (2/17/12) - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 11 - Change of Beneficiary (5/9/12) - Redcated, #12 Exhibit 12 - Payment Records - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Request for Change of Beneficiary (5/2/14) - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Correspondence Records - Redacted)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek Devere Tarver
Represented By: John G. Tamasitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary O. Sherlock
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?