Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc v. Prince et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc
Defendant: Christopher Prince, Sheldon Shelley and Prince Distribution LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02119
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2011 Filing 141 REPLY by Bright Builders Inc to 140 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Doc. 128, # 2 Exhibit Doc. 129, # 3 Exhibit Doc. 132, # 4 Exhibit Doc. 133, # 5 Exhibit Reply Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Reply Ex. 2)(Doolittle, Paul)
May 9, 2011 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Motion for New Trial, Motion for Relief from Judgment, 135 Supplemental MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of LawSupplemental MOTION for New TrialSupplemental MOTION for Relief from Judgment Response filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/19/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Prince Trial Testimony Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - Gingrich Trial Testimony Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - Jury Charges & Motions Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - Campbell v. BP, # 5 Exhibit E - Golson v. Green Tree Financial, # 6 Exhibit F - Laubach v. Khajawai, M.D., # 7 Exhibit G - East Tennessee Natural Gas v. Acres in Wythe County, VA, # 8 Exhibit H - Coach v. Gata)(McElwaine, John)
April 28, 2011 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Alter Judgment Response filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/9/2011 (McElwaine, John)
April 26, 2011 Filing 138 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 136 Reason: wrong event code used Corrected Filing Document Number 137 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 4/25/2011 (asni, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jury Trial Discussions excerpt, # 2 Exhibit B - Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C - 9.29.10 ltr & Amended Notices of Depos to Doolittle, # 4 Exhibit D - Rolex v. Brown, # 5 Exhibit E - Chanel v. French, # 6 Exhibit F - Rolex v. Jones, # 7 Exhibit G - Lorillard Tobacco v. S&M Central Serv. Corp., # 8 Exhibit H - Employers Council v. Feltman, # 9 Exhibit I - Rodgers v. Anderson, # 10 Exhibit J - Silhouette v. Chakhbazian)(McElwaine, John)
April 22, 2011 Filing 135 Supplemental MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ( Response to Motion due by 5/9/2011), Supplemental MOTION for New Trial, Supplemental MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Bright Builders Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)No proposed order(Doolittle, Paul)
April 14, 2011 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Bright Builders Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/25/2011 (Doolittle, Paul)
April 13, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 8, 2011, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gary Smith, Telephone number/E-mail 256-7743, Gary_Smith@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2011. (gsmith, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 8, 2011 and March 9, 2011, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gary Smith, Telephone number/E-mail 256-7743, Gary_Smith@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2011. (gsmith, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 131 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial, MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Bright Builders Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support , # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P)No proposed order(Doolittle, Paul). Added MOTION for New Trial on 4/12/2011 (asni, ). Added MOTION for Relief from Judgment on 4/12/2011 (asni, ).
April 11, 2011 Filing 130 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Bright Builders Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)No proposed order(Doolittle, Paul)
April 11, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 8, 2011 and March 9, 2011, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gary Smith, Telephone number/E-mail (803) 256-7743, Gary_Smith@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2011. (gsmith, )
April 9, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 8, 2011, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gary Smith, Telephone number/E-mail (803) 256-7743, Gary_Smith@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2011. (gsmith, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Fees & Costs, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Jul 2009, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Aug 2009, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Sep 2009, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Oct 2009, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Nov 2009, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Dec 2009, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Jan 2010, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Feb 2010, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Mar 2010, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Apr 2010, # 12 Exhibit 11 - May 2010, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Jun 2010, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Jul 2010, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Aug 2010, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Sep 2010, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Oct 2010, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Nov 2010, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Dec 2010, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Jan 2011, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Feb 2011, # 22 Exhibit 21 - Mar 2011)No proposed order(McElwaine, John)
March 14, 2011 Filing 126 JUDGMENT in favor of Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc against Prince Distribution LLC, Christopher Prince; in favor of Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc against Bright Builders Inc (mdea )
March 11, 2011 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc re 123 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McElwaine, John)
March 10, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc (McElwaine, John)
March 10, 2011 Filing 122 RECEIPT by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc for trial exhibits (mdea )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RETURNING EXHIBITS. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/10/2011. (mdea )
March 10, 2011 Filing 119 JURY VERDICT. (mdea )
March 10, 2011 Filing 118 Jury Instructions. (mdea )
March 10, 2011 Filing 117 Exhibit List. (mdea )
March 10, 2011 Filing 116 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Jury Trial completed on 3/10/2011. Jury Charge. Defendant Bright Builders objects to charge - overruled. Jury deliberations. Jury verdict published, jury not polled. Exhibits returned to parties. Jury excused. Adjourn. Court Reporter Gary Smith. (mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 115 ORAL ORDER denying 113 Motion for Directed Verdict; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Directed Verdict Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/9/2011.(mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 114 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 113 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Bright Builders Inc. (mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 112 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Jury Trial continued on 3/9/2011. Witesses/exhibits. Charge conference continued. Defendants rest. Defendant Bright Builders renews motion for directed verdict - denied. Plaintiff moves for directed verdict as to liability as to all defendants - granted as to defendants Prince and Prince Distribution, denied as to defendant Bright Builders. Closing arguments. Recess until 3/10/2011 at 10:00 am. Court Reporter Gary Smith. (mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 111 DEPOSITION of Michael A. Johnson taken on 10/11/2010 by Bright Builders Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 110 DEPOSITION of Brian R. Cole taken on 10/12/2010 by Bright Builders Inc.(mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 109 DEPOSITION of Emily A. Davies taken on 10/28/2010 by Bright Builders Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(mdea )
March 9, 2011 Filing 108 STIPULATION by Bright Builders Inc, Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. as to number of registered trademarks that were subject to trademark infringement without authorization. (mdea )
March 8, 2011 Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT of Frederick Fessenden by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(mdea )
March 8, 2011 Filing 106 ORAL ORDER denying 105 Motion for Directed Verdict Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/8/2011.(mdea )
March 8, 2011 Filing 105 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Bright Builders Inc. (mdea )
March 8, 2011 Filing 104 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Jury Trial begun on 3/8/2011. Jury sworn, given preliminary instructions. Opening statements. Witnesses/exhibits. Plaintiff rests. Defendant Bright Builders moves for directed verdict - denied. Charge conference. Recess until 3/9/2011 at 10:00 am. Court Reporter Gary Smith. (mdea )
March 7, 2011 Filing 103 Supplemental RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 3/24/2011.(McElwaine, John)
March 7, 2011 Filing 102 Supplemental RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Bright Builders Inc. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 3/24/2011.(Fraser, Douglas)
March 7, 2011 Filing 101 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 99 Reason: to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user Corrected Filing Document Number 100 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 3/3/2011 (asni, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Matthew Fraser on behalf of Bright Builders Inc (Fraser, Douglas)
March 3, 2011 Filing 98 Jury List. (mdea )
March 3, 2011 Filing 97 Panel Strike List. (mdea )
March 3, 2011 Filing 96 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Jury Selection held on 3/3/2011. Panel sworn. Jurors excused for conflicts/hardships. Twelve jurors seated, given preliminary instructions, not sworn. Trial set to begin 3/8/2011 for 2 days. Court Reporter Dan Mayo. (mdea )
March 1, 2011 Filing 95 REQUEST TO STRIKE FOR CAUSE by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Request to Strike Jurors For Cause Form)(McElwaine, John)
February 18, 2011 Filing 94 OBJECTIONS byBright Builders Inc to 81 Pretrial Disclosures. (Doolittle, Paul)
February 18, 2011 Filing 93 REPLY by Bright Builders Incto 91 Objections. (Doolittle, Paul)
February 15, 2011 Filing 91 OBJECTIONS byRoger Cleveland Golf Company Inc to 87 Pretrial Disclosures. (McElwaine, John)
February 14, 2011 Filing 89 Withdrawal of Motions: 86 MOTION in Limine filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.. (McElwaine, John)
February 11, 2011 Filing 88 TEXT ORDER he Court has reviewed the parties' responses and replies to its Order to Show Cause why Defendant should not be required to pay the costs incurred by Plaintiff in responding to Defendant's one-and-a-half page conclusory motion for summary judgment. The Court finds that the motion, which lacked any citation to any legal authority or the record, violated D.S.C. Local Civil Rules 7.04 and 7.05, and, in combination with Defendant's failure to reply to Plaintiff's response, failed to meet the burdens imposed on a moving party by Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. However, because the record does not, at this time, support a finding that Defendant filed the motion "for [an] improper purpose, such as to harass, cause unnecessary delay, or needlessly increase the cost of litigation," Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(b), the Court declines to order the sanctions requested by Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/11/2011. (asni, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 87 First Amended RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Bright Builders Inc. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 2/25/2011.(Doolittle, Paul)
February 4, 2011 Filing 86 MOTION in Limine by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/22/2011 No proposed order(McElwaine, John)
February 4, 2011 Filing 85 REPLY by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC to Trial Notice for Term March 3, 2011. (Lizzi, Christopher)
February 4, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 3/8/2011 - 3/9/2011 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. The parties are directed to refer to this court's website at www.scd.uscourts.gov for filing preferences and requirements. (asni, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 83 REPLY by Bright Builders Inc to Trial Notice for Term March 3, 2011. (Doolittle, Paul)
February 2, 2011 Filing 82 REPLY by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Incto 77 Notice of Hearing. (McElwaine, John)
February 1, 2011 Filing 81 RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 2/18/2011.(McElwaine, John)
February 1, 2011 Filing 80 RULE 26(a)(3)PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Bright Builders Inc. Objections to PreTrial Disclosures due by 2/18/2011.(Doolittle, Paul)
January 19, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour (asni, )
December 15, 2010 Filing 76 REPLY by Bright Builders Inc re 72 Reply by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc to 69 Response to Order to Show Cause. (Doolittle, Paul) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 12/16/2010 (asni, ).
December 15, 2010 Filing 75 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 71 Reason: document not signed correctly Corrected Filing Document Number 74 (asni, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Morgan T. Nickerson of Fees and Costs by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Fees & Costs)(McElwaine, John) on 12/15/2010 (asni, ).
December 14, 2010 Filing 72 REPLY by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Incto 69 Response to Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E-mail, # 2 Affidavit of Fees & Costs)(McElwaine, John)
December 12, 2010 Filing 69 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bright Builders Inc. (Doolittle, Paul)
December 9, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 1/12/2011 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour (asni, )
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment and issuing an order to show cause why Bright Builders' should not be sanctioned and ordered to pay the costs incurred by plaintiff in responding to this motion. Bright Builders shall file a response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Monday, December 13, 2010. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/3/2010.(asni, )
December 3, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (asni, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 64 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER( Motion in Limine due by 2/4/2011, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/1/2011, Pretrial Briefs due by 2/22/2011, Jury Selection Deadline 3/3/2011,), Motions terminated: granting 63 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Scheduling Order, filed by Christopher Prince, Bright Builders Inc, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc, Prince Distribution LLC.. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/1/2010. (asni, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 63 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Bright Builders Inc, Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2010 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McElwaine, John)
November 22, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 1/12/2011 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour (asni, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (asni, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 56 Withdrawal of Motions: 54 MOTION to Compel filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.. (McElwaine, John)
October 18, 2010 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/28/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Prince Deposition, # 2 Exhibit B - Advertisement sample, # 3 Exhibit C - Agreement between Prince & Bright Bldrs, # 4 Exhibit D - Coaching Sessions materials, # 5 Exhibit E - Johnson Deposition, # 6 Exhibit F - Account Transcript, # 7 Exhibit G - Hosting Agreement)(McElwaine, John)
October 6, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2nd Requests for Production)No proposed order(McElwaine, John)
October 1, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Stuart Patterson on behalf of Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc (Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bright Builders Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2010 No proposed order(Doolittle, Paul)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/26/2010.(asni, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation by Bright Builders Inc, Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2010 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Smith, Janene)
July 16, 2010 Filing 48 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Bright Builders Inc(Doolittle, Paul)
July 16, 2010 Filing 47 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc(Smith, Janene)
June 10, 2010 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Entry of Default Against Sheldon Shelley served on Sheldon Shelley on June 8, 2010, filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Smith, Janene)
June 8, 2010 Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sheldon Shelley (mdea )
June 7, 2010 Filing 44 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Sheldon Shelley byRoger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Default)(Smith, Janene) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2010) (mdea, ).
May 27, 2010 Filing 43 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 43 Reason: discovery documents are not filed with the court, only exchanged between the parties (asni, )
May 11, 2010 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Bright Builders Inc.(Doolittle, Paul)
May 6, 2010 Filing 41 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Bright Builders Inc, Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.(McElwaine, John)
May 4, 2010 Filing 39 Withdrawal of Motions: 23 MOTION to Compel filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.. (Smith, Janene)
May 4, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 02:00 PM before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (asni, )
April 28, 2010 Filing 37 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, (Lizzi, Christopher) Modified remove filers not listed on document on 4/28/2010 (asni, ).
April 26, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 23 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 02:00 PM before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. This hearing will be conducted via telephone. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 803-253-3421.(asni, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Bright Builders Inc served on 3/30/2010, answer due 4/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Summons return executed)(Smith, Janene)
April 14, 2010 Filing 34 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 34 Reason: document was deleted at the request of the attorney. The document will be refiled as an amended answer only and not an amended answer/cross claim. (asni, ) Modified to correct text on 4/14/2010 (asni, ).
April 7, 2010 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Sheldon Shelley served on 4/5/2010, answer due 4/26/2010. refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (Attachments: # 1 return executed)(asni, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Bright Builders Inc. (asni, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 31 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Sheldon Shelley. (asni, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bright Builders Inc, Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Sheldon Shelley, filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bright Builders Materials, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Website, # 3 Exhibit C - Dropshipping Information) (McElwaine, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/24/2010) (asni, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/24/2010) (asni, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/24/2010) (asni, ). Modified to replace exhibits with corrected PDF's at the request of the attorney on 3/24/2010 (asni, ).
March 23, 2010 Filing 29 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER( Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2010,, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/14/2010,, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/12/2010,, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/15/2010,, Discovery due by 9/15/2010,, Motion in Limine due by 12/6/2010,, Motions due by 9/30/2010,, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/1/2010,, Pretrial Briefs due by 12/24/2010,, Jury Selection Deadline 1/1/2011,, ADR Statement due by 7/30/2010,, Mediation Due by 8/30/2010,), Motions terminated: granting 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order,. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/23/2010. (asni, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/23/2010.(asni, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/8/2010 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McElwaine, John)
March 22, 2010 Filing 26 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 24 Reason: at the request of the attorney document was deleted and refiled by the attorney as Corrected Filing Document Number 25 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 3/22/2010 Response due date modified to that of original filing: 4/8/2010 (asni, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 25 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC, Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/8/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order(McElwaine, John)
March 18, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Production Requests, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - March 12, 2010 Letter, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - March 17, 2010 Emails, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F - March 18, 2010 Emails)No proposed order(Smith, Janene)
March 1, 2010 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.(McElwaine, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 21 SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER( Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/1/2010,, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/1/2010,, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/15/2010,, Discovery due by 4/15/2010,, Motion in Limine due by 7/23/2010,, Motions due by 4/30/2010,, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/12/2010,, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/9/2010,, Jury Selection Deadline 8/16/2010,, ADR Statement due by 5/28/2010,, Mediation Due by 6/28/2010,), Motions terminated: 20 MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Witness Disclosures filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 1/18/2010. (asni, )
January 12, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Witness Disclosures by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2010 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Smith, Janene)
October 22, 2009 Filing 19 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2009, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2010, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/12/2010, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/15/2010, Discovery due by 4/15/2010, Motion in Limine due by 7/23/2010, Motions due by 4/30/2010, ADR Statement due 5/28/2010, mediation due 6/28/2010, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/12/2010, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/9/2010, Jury Selection Deadline 8/16/2010,. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/20/09. (asni, ) Modified to edit text on 10/26/2009 (asni, ).
October 19, 2009 Filing 18 Joint Rule 26(f) Report including 26.03 interrogatories by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc, Prince Distribution LLC and Christopher Prince.(Smith, Janene) Modified to add filers listed on document on 10/20/2009 (asni, ).
September 18, 2009 Filing 17 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/5/2009, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/19/2009, Rule 26 Report due by 10/19/2009, Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2009, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/14/2009, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/12/2010, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/12/2010, Discovery due by 3/15/2010, Motion in Limine due by 6/23/2010, Motions due by 3/29/2010, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/11/2010, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/9/2010, Jury Selection Deadline 7/14/2010, ADR Statement due by 4/27/2010, Mediation Due by 5/27/2010,. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/18/09. (asni, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC.(Lizzi, Christopher) Modified to remove duplicative text on 9/18/2009 (asni, ).
September 17, 2009 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Prince, Prince Distribution LLC.(Lizzi, Christopher) Modified to remove duplicative text on 9/18/2009 (asni, ).
September 17, 2009 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Christopher Prince and Prince Distribution.(Lizzi, Christopher) Modified to link correct event to associated event and add filer listed on document on 9/17/2009 (asni, ).
August 27, 2009 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 3 Summons Issued, 6 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, 1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Sheldon Shelley)(Smith, Janene)
August 18, 2009 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Christopher S Finnerty to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 10 Motion for Morgan T Nickerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/18/09. (erav, )
August 17, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan T. Nickerson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000002249210) by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel (Smith, Janene) Modified on 8/17/2009 to remove proposed order (erav, ).
August 17, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Finnerty ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000002249161) by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Smith, Janene) Modified on 8/17/2009 to remove proposed order (erav, ).
August 14, 2009 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 4 Summons Issued, 6 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Christopher Prince, # 2 Affidavit of Service on Prince Distribution)(Smith, Janene)
August 12, 2009 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.(erav, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc.(erav, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prince Distribution LLC. (erav, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sheldon Shelley. (erav, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Prince. (erav, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Prince, Sheldon Shelley, Prince Distribution LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0422239360), filed by Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Website, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants Dropshipping Information) (erav, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/18/2010) (asni, ). Document was removed by the clerk in error from the wrong case. Document has been replaced correctly.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc v. Prince et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Cleveland Golf Company Inc
Represented By: Janene Boyce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?