CresCom Bank v. Terry et al
Plaintiff: CresCom Bank
Defendant: Edward L Terry, Harris Street LLC, Sugarloaf Marketplace LLC and CCT Reserve LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00063
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Patrick Michael Duffy
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER deferring ruling on 123 Motion for Contempt; denying 124 Motion to Amend/Correct; and granting 131 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 08/31/2017.(adeh, )
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 CresCom Bank's motion for supplementary proceedings. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 07/06/2017.(adeh, )
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 3/22/2016.(adeh, )
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on October 1, 2013.(kspa, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on July 31, 2013.(kspa, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Stay Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on March 7, 2013.(kspa, )
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on September 26, 2012.(kspa, )
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 7/31/2012.(jlin, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CresCom Bank v. Terry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CresCom Bank
Represented By: Charles S Altman
Represented By: Meredith Long Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugarloaf Marketplace LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCT Reserve LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?