Wellin v. Wellin et al
Plaintiff: Keith Wellin
Defendant: Peter J Wellin, Cynthia W Plum, Marjorie W King, South Dakota Trust Company LLC, Friendship Management LLC and Friendship Partners LP
Case Number: 2:2013cv01831
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (939 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 679 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 896 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's R&R is incorporated into this order. For the reasons articulated by the Special Master, it is therefore ORDERED that the Wellin Children's motion for protective order is GRANTED as to Questions 2, 3,4, and 5 set forth in Exhibit C-1 (Dkt. No. 826-3), GRANTED IN PART as Ques tions 1, 9, and 10 set forth in Exhibit C-1, specifically, Dr. Austin is required to answer these questions to the extent any responsive communications took place prior to her formal retainer as an expert witness; and DENIED as to Questions 6, 7, and 8 set forth in Exhibit C-1. Dr. Austin is directed to answer the questions at issue to the extent any responsive communications took place prior to her formal retainer as an expert witness. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/12/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (903 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 646 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 862 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's R&R is incorporated into this order. For the reasons articulated by the Special Master, it is therefore ORDERED that the Wellin Children's motion for protective order is GRANTED as to Questions 1 and 5. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (643 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 859 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 900 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. ORDERED that the Estate's motion for protective or der is DENIED, and the legal memorandum at issue shall be produced along with the emails concerning the same subject matter. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/16/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (745 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 778 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 525 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED, and the motion for protective order is GRANTED. Both the Draft Letter and Peter Wellin's requirement to give deposition testimony in regards to the contents of the letter are protected from discovery by the attorney-client privilege. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (326 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 575 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 537 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Motion for Protective Order,,, filed by Friendship Management LLC, Peter J Wellin, Marjorie W K ing, Cynthia W Plum, (453 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 672 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 707 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED. Details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/12/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (884 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 847 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 630 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master,,, (662 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 698 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 444 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Motion to Compel,,, filed by Wendy Wellin. The Special Master's supplemental report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, and Wendy C.H. Wellin's motion to compel the production of twenty-two factual summaries prepared by various Wellin Children is DENIED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/6/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (872 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 835 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 618 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, and the Wellin Children's motion to compel the production of Exhibits 28 and 31 in their entirety is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/14/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (517 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 737 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 771 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master, The court has conducted a de novo review of the record, and concludes that the Special Master's R&R accurately summarizes this case and the applicable law. Accordingly, the Special master's R&R is incorporated into this order. Additional specific details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/25/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (764 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 543 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 798 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED, and the Estate's motion to amend the parties Rule 26(f) Report is DENIED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/4/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (733 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 513 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 767 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, the Wellin Children's motion to quash the 30(b)(6) deposition subpoena of Wellin & Co. (ECF No. 601 in C/A No. 2:13cv1831 DCN) is GRANTED, and a protective order is granted prohibiting the Estate from taking the 30(b)(6) deposition of Wellin & Co. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/22/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re (634) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. Wendy C.H. Wellin shall produce to the Wellin Children those documents identified on the Etri um Reports as "discoverable" in such form as is noted in the Special Master's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/6/2017.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(eric, )
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER granting (513) Motion ; granting (518) Motion in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (549) Motion ; granting (555) Motion in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (301) Motion ; granting (307) Motion in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN; and clarifying September 30, 2016 order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on August 23, 2017. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN (rweh, )
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER denying (434) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (465) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; denying (458) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re ( 500) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; denying (206) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (251) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/31/2017.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(eric, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (370) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (410) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting in part and denying in part (3 95) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (433) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting in part and denying in part (144) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (181) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 CONSENT ORDER adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re (389) Report and Recommendation.; granting (333) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (347) Motion for Protective Order; adopting a s modified Report and Recommendations re (412) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (102) Motion for Protective Order; adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re (160) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04 067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on September 26, 2016.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, ) (Main Document 498 replaced on 9/26/2016) (jbry, ). Modified on 9/26/2016 to replace incorrect document with correct document per chambers (jbry, ).
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 382 Report and Recommendation.; granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion to Compel (rweh, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (149 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 376 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 400 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's November 24, 2015 R&R is ADOP TED, and the service of the Subpoena and its response shall be governed by the method laid out in the R&R. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/11/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER ADOPTING CONSENT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (149 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 376 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 400 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/7/2015. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re (352) Report and Recommendation.; granting (299) Motion to Compel; granting (311) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re (330) Report and Recommendation.; adop ting Report and Recommendations re (336) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (292) Motion to Compel; granting (318) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re (344) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Rep ort and Recommendations re (350) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (374) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (61) Motion to Compel; granting (80) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Re commendations re (99) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (107) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (123) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and den ying in part 277 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 310 Report and Recommendation.; modifying and adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re 320 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9-30-2015.(rweh, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting (163) Sealed Motion; granting (168) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (113) Sealed Motion; granting (120) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/26/2015.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN(cahe, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting (140) Motion to Compel and granting (141) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (77) Motion to Compel and granting (79) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. The court DIRECTS Campbell Lane Hart and Kimerly Henry to produce all responsive documents in their native format and without redaction within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 07/14/2014. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. (gcle)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re 83 Response in Opposition to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, filed by South Dakota Trust Company, LLC. South Dakota Trust Company, LLC's request for costs and attorneys' fees, made pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(d), is premature and therefore is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 02/10/2014. (gcle, 2/10/14)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 94 Motion for leave to depose Keith Wellin. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 02/04/2014. (gcle, 2/4/14)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 59 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant South Dakota Trust Company is hereby dismissed from this case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 01/22/2014. (gcle, 1/22/14)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Compel a Mental Examination. Signed by Honorable David C. Norton on 12-12-2013. (gcle, 12/12/13)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Wellin and dissolving 6 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Norton on 11-22-2013. (gcle, 11/22/13)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellin v. Wellin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wellin
Represented By: Molly Agnes Hood Craig
Represented By: James B Hood
Represented By: Robert H Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Wellin
Represented By: Robert H Brunson
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia W Plum
Represented By: Robert H Brunson
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie W King
Represented By: Robert H Brunson
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dakota Trust Company LLC
Represented By: Nosizi Ralephata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendship Management LLC
Represented By: Robert H Brunson
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendship Partners LP
Represented By: Robert H Brunson
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?