Reed et al v. Big Water Resort LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Reed, Donna Reed, Bonnie Youmans, Jane Yates and Phillip Caulder
Defendant: Big Water Resort LLC, TLC Holdings LLC, Richard Clark, James Thigpen, Jimmy Lovell and Ocoee LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01583
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 302 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Honorable David C Norton on October 6, 2017.(span, )
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 270 Report and Recommendation.; denying 179 Motion for Sanctions; granting 183 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 228 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/20/16.(elim, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice. The parties have 90 days from the issuance of this order to engage in discovery limited to the statute of limitations issue. At the close of discovery, if appropriate, plaintiffs may re-file their motion to certify class under Rule 23(b)(3). Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/21/15.(akob, )
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 39 Motion to Certify Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/10/15.(akob, )
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Certify Question to South Carolina Supreme Court Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/30/14.(akob, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Big Water Resort LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reed
Represented By: Harry L Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: William R Padget
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Represented By: Brady Ryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Reed
Represented By: Harry L Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: William R Padget
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Represented By: Brady Ryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Youmans
Represented By: Harry L Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: William R Padget
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Represented By: Brady Ryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Yates
Represented By: Harry L Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: William R Padget
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Represented By: Brady Ryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Caulder
Represented By: Harry L Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher James Moore
Represented By: William R Padget
Represented By: Terry Edward Richardson, Jr
Represented By: Brady Ryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Water Resort LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocoee LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?