Bonaldi v. Allison-Smith Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward Angelo Bonaldi
Defendant: Allison-Smith Company LLC and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 776
Case Number: 2:2015cv00344
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Presiding Judge: Patrick Michael Duffy
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER taxing costs. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 06/16/2017. (adeh, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 03/23/2017.(adeh, )
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RULING ON 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is ordered that defendant Allison-Smith Company LLC's 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied, and 47 Motion to Exclude is granted. It is ordered that the magistrate judge's report and recommendation is adopted as the order of this court and this case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 02/22/2016. (egra, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonaldi v. Allison-Smith Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Angelo Bonaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison-Smith Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 776
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?