Williams v. Reynolds
Petitioner: Darrell Williams
Respondent: Cecilia Reynolds
Case Number: 2:2016cv02835
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER denying 63 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Appeal. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of entry of this order to file his notice of appeal with this court. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/20/2018.(ssam, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER adopting except as to ground two 35 Report and Recommendation; granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/14/2017.(ssam, )
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER granting 50 Motion for Relief on the Pleadings; vacating 43 Order. Petitioner will have an opportunity to file his objections to the Report by October 6, 2017. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/5/2017.(ssam, )
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 35 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker; granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/12/2017.(ssam, )
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER declining to adopt 9 Report and Recommendation. The case will proceed. This action is re-referred to the Magistrate Judge for pretrial matters. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/9/2016. (ssam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cecilia Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?