Allison et al v. McCabe Trotter & Beverly PC
Plaintiff: Mills K Allison and Caitlin M Barca
Defendant: McCabe Trotter & Beverly PC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01727
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Patrick Michael Duffy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider only insofar as to clarify that Defendant opened a file, prepared and signed a Notice of Lien on May 2, 2017, while the Notice of Lien was not recorded until May 10, 2017. (Dkt. No. 58 at 3, 3 n.2.) The motion to reconsider is otherwise DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/22/2018.(sshe, )
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND OPINION granting 42 Defendant McCabe, Trotter & Beverly, P.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. All other pending motions, 57 Motion to Amend/Correct; 31 Motion to Certify Class; 35 Motion for Reconsideration, are DENIED AS MOOT. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/9/2018.(sshe, )
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Compel; denying 13 Motion to Quash, but quashing subpoena under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(b)(2)(C); granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on December 12, 2017.(nkni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison et al v. McCabe Trotter & Beverly PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mills K Allison
Represented By: Mary Leigh Arnold
Represented By: Justin Simon Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin M Barca
Represented By: Mary Leigh Arnold
Represented By: Justin Simon Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe Trotter & Beverly PC
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Countryman
Represented By: Robert P Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?