Holliday et al v. Nissan Motor Co Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Gary Holliday and Soinya Holliday
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co Ltd and Nissan North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01503
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER The Court DENIES Defendant Calsonic Kansei North America, Inc.'s renewed motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Dkt. No. 52 ). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/26/2019.(sshe, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND OPINION The Court GRANTS Defendant CKNA's Motions to Seal (Dkt. No. 50 , 51 , 54 ). Defendant CKNA is DIRECTED to file under seal Exhibit B to their Motion to Dismiss and Exhibit A to their Reply to the Resp onse to their Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 53 ). The Motion is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiffs seek to file Exhibit 1, Greg Deibig's deposition, and certain refere nces to Deibig's testimony under seal. Plaintiffs are therefore DIRECTED to file under seal Exhibit 1 and may redact from the publicly filed Response all direct quotes from Deibig's deposition and the first four full sentences of the fin al paragraph of page 4 that continues onto page 5. An unredacted copy of the Response in Opposition should also be filed under seal. Plaintiffs' Motion is otherwise DENIED, and Plaintiffs must, within SEVEN (7) DAYS of this Order file the redacted Response in Opposition and Exhibits 2, 3 and 4 on the docket. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/24/2019.(sshe, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Confidentiality Order: The parties have stipulated that certain discovery material is and should be treated as confidential and have agreed to the terms of this order. Details regarding the designation and treatment of confidential materials are set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/8/2019.(vdru, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's request for jurisdictional discovery and denying as Moot with leave to refile 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/26/2018.(vdru, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliday et al v. Nissan Motor Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Holliday
Represented By: Kevin R Dean
Represented By: John David O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soinya Holliday
Represented By: Kevin R Dean
Represented By: John David O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?