County of Dorchester, South Carolina et al v. AT&T Corp et al

Plaintiff: Town of Summerville, South Carolina and County of Dorchester, South Carolina
Defendant: Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC and AT&T Corp
Case Number: 2:2018cv02890
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Oliver, Lance)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Town of Summerville, South Carolina, County of Dorchester, South Carolina. AT&T Corp waiver executed on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018; Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC waiver executed on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons for AT&T Corp. and Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC)(Oliver, Lance)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp, Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC. (sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Town of Summerville, South Carolina.(sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by County of Dorchester, South Carolina.(sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp, Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8073798.), filed by Town of Summerville, South Carolina, County of Dorchester, South Carolina. Service due by 1/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summerville 911 Ordinance)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Dorchester, South Carolina et al v. AT&T Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Summerville, South Carolina
Represented By: Annie Elizabeth Kouba
Represented By: Marlon E Kimpson
Represented By: Lance V Oliver
Represented By: Max N Gruetzmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Dorchester, South Carolina
Represented By: Annie Elizabeth Kouba
Represented By: Marlon E Kimpson
Represented By: Lance V Oliver
Represented By: Max N Gruetzmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?