County of Dorchester, South Carolina et al v. Level 3 Communications LLC et al

Plaintiff: Town of Summerville, South Carolina and County of Dorchester, South Carolina
Defendant: Telcove Operations LLC, Bandwidth Inc, Level 3 Telecom of South Carolina LLC, Bandwidth.com CLEC LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC, Centurylink Communications LLC and Comcast IP Phone LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02891
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Oliver, Lance)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Town of Summerville, South Carolina, County of Dorchester, South Carolina. Bandwidth Inc waiver executed on 11/2/2018; Bandwidth.com CLEC LLC waiver executed on 11/2/2018; Comcast IP Phone LLC waiver executed on 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC and Bandwidth, Inc., #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons for Comcast IP Phone, LLC)(Oliver, Lance)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Town of Summerville, South Carolina.(sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by County of Dorchester, South Carolina.(sshe, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8073830.), filed by Town of Summerville, South Carolina, County of Dorchester, South Carolina. Service due by 1/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Town of Summerville 911 Ordinance)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Dorchester, South Carolina et al v. Level 3 Communications LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telcove Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandwidth Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Telecom of South Carolina LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandwidth.com CLEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurylink Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast IP Phone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Summerville, South Carolina
Represented By: Annie Elizabeth Kouba
Represented By: Marlon E Kimpson
Represented By: Lance V Oliver
Represented By: Max N Gruetzmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Dorchester, South Carolina
Represented By: Annie Elizabeth Kouba
Represented By: Marlon E Kimpson
Represented By: Lance V Oliver
Represented By: Max N Gruetzmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?