Gross v. M/V Fish Hawk et al
Plaintiff: Andy Gross
Defendant: M/V Fish Hawk and David Warford
Undetermined: Bryan Gulski
Case Number: 2:2018cv02999
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andy Gross (Bluestein, S)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy Gross. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bluestein, S)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF VESSEL granting #12 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Vessel be released from arrest and the United States Marshal is hereby directed to perform all such acts as are necessary to release the Vessel. The Substitute Custodian is hereby relieved of all further duties in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/16/2018.(sshe, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Order Releasing Vessel from Warrant of Arrest by Andy Gross. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Release of Vessel)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DESIGNATING NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION granting #7 Motion for Service by Publication. Notice of this action and arrest shall be published in The Post and Courier for two (2) successive days. This notice shall identify the action and arrest and shall specify that all interested parties shall file a verified statement of right or interest within fourteen (14) days after publication of the notice of arrest and answers to the complaint within twenty-one (21) days after the claims are filed. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/14/2018.(sshe, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian Bryan Gulski appointed. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/14/2018.(sshe, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM ISSUED (sshe, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/14/2018.(sshe, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by Andy Gross. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Newspaper Ad, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Andy Gross. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Andy Gross. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant of Arrest)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to M/V Fish Hawk, David Warford. (sshe, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andy Gross.(sshe, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8093607.), filed by Andy Gross. Service due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. M/V Fish Hawk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Fish Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Warford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Gross
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Bryan Gulski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?