United States of America et al v. Beazer East Inc
Plaintiff: South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, South Carolina Department of Natural Resources and United States of America
Defendant: Beazer East Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03051
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT DECREE granting #6 Motion to enter Consent Decree; granting #7 Motion for Joinder. Details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix a, #2 Appendix b, #3 Appendix c)(jbry, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder in Motion for Entry of Consent Decree by Beazer East Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Shaw, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree re #2 Notice to Lodge by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Bowens, Barbara)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Shaw on behalf of Beazer East Inc (Shaw, Joshua)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #2 Notice to Lodge, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowens, Barbara)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO LODGE of Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Appendix A to Consent Decree, #3 Appendix B to Consent Decree, #4 Appendix C to Consent Decree)(sshe, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beazer East Inc, filed by United States of America, South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, South Carolina Department of Natural Resources. Service due by 2/7/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Beazer East Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control
Represented By: Susan A Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: Shannon Furr Bobertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?