Py et al v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Py, Crystal Benavides and Brandon Py
Defendant: The 3M Company, National Foam, Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Protection Co., County of Suffolk and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03341
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 54 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern, 2:18-cv-03225, Py et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03341-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 11, 2018 Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent electronically. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 51 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: AQUEOUS FILM-FORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that transfer of the actions listed on Schedule B is denied. Signed by Lewis A. Kaplan, Acting Chair JPMDL. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 50 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Stay; The Moving Defendants are directed to file a status report within seven days of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the Motion for Transfer. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/15/2018. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #43 Notice of MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until after a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motions for Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (DellaUniversita, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance RE: MDL No.: 2873 IN RE: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams (AFFF). (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 46 Letter from Jed W. Glickstein dated 9/27/2018 enclosing a second motion for transfer of actions pending before the Judicial Panel on Mutidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 45 Letter From Megan E. Stride dated 9/26/2018 enclosing a motion for transfer of actions pending before the Judicial Panel on Mutidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of mailing received from the Law Offices of Williams & Connolly LLP enclosing a motion for transfer of actions pending before the Judicial Panel on Mutidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 43 Notice of MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until after a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motions for Transfer by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY in Support re #32 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Stay filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY in Support re #32 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Stay County of Suffolk's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by County of Suffolk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lacoff, Brian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re (76 in 2:17-cv-06962-JS-AYS) Letter filed by The 3M Company, (39 in 2:18-cv-03225-JS-AYS) Letter filed by The 3M Company, (74 in 2:17-cv-06982-JS-AYS) Letter filed by The 3M Company, (43 in 2:18-cv-01996-JS-AYS) Letter filed by The 3M Company, (89 in 2:17-cv-02566-JS-AYS) Letter filed by The 3M Company: The Court has reviewed the parties' proposed discovery schedule. The Court notes that its Order of 9/12/18 referred to the parties' inability to agree upon tiered discovery, and asked only that they confer and agree upon a non-tiered discovery schedule containing certain dates. While the proposed schedules submitted contain the end dates requested by the Court, they do not reflect a simplified agreed-upon discovery schedule. Instead, the proposed schedules include layers of tiered dates, including matters such as ESI and deposition protocols that are expected to be agreed upon by the parties without Court intervention. Upon review of the parties' submission, and in an effort to simplify this matter, the Court enters only the following discovery deadlines with respect to the Water Authority Actions: (1) Completion of Fact Discovery: 10/4/19; (2) Completion of Expert Discovery: 5/22/20; (3) Commencement of Dispositive Motion Practice: 6/22/20; and (4) Filing of Joint Pre-Trial Order: To be determined based upon the pendency of any dispositive motion practice. As to the Putative Class Actions, it appears from the parties' proposed schedule that they seek to delay any merits-based discovery until after their class certification motions are decided. The Court rejects that approach. Instead, while the parties may conduct expert-only class certification discovery, as set forth in their proposed schedule, they will also engage in fact and expert merits discovery. Accordingly, the Court enters the following deadlines with respect to the Putative Class Actions: (1) Completion of Expert-Only Class Certification Discovery: 6/26/19; (2) Deadline to Request a Pre-Motion Conference to Move for Class Certification: 7/15/19; (3) Completion of Fact Discovery: 12/31/19; (4) Completion of Merits Expert Discovery: 7/31/20; (5) Commencement of Dispositive Motion Practice: 8/31/20; and (6) Filing of Joint Pre-Trial Order: To be determined based on the pendency of any dispositive motion practice. For the foregoing reasons the Court rejects the proposed discovery schedules submitted by the parties and the schedule above constitutes the Court's discovery order in this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/28/2018. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Denny Adam Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Denny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 39 Letter Re Discovery Schedule by The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Schedule) (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (DellaUniversita, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #32 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service) (DellaUniversita, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re #36 Case Management Statement: As it appear the parties are unable to agree on a tiered discovery schedule, discovery in this action shall not proceed in tiers. Rather, all discovery will go forward in its entirety. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are directed to confer, and to submit for Court approval by September 26, 2018, a proposed discovery schedule containing the following dates: (1) completion of all fact discovery; (2) completion of all expert discovery; (3) commencement of dispositive motion practice; and (4) the filing of a joint pre-trial order. Defendant Suffolk County's request for a stay of discovery is DENIED. The parties are encouraged to work cooperatively to avoid duplicative discovery and the wasting of any resources. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/12/2018. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Tiered Discovery Plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix A) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Document #35 filed on 8/13/2018 by Attorney Andrew Kazin has been modified to reflect correct entry information. Document is a Declaration and NOT a Motion. All corrections have been entered. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File.Upon counsels' request, the deadline to submit the joint proposed discovery plan for this Court's review is EXTENDED to August 23, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/14/2018. (Demosthenous, Dina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly Re: #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Suffolk. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 35 Declaration Re: #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by County of Suffolk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service) (Kazin, Andrew) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct entry information. (Valle, Christine). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by County of Suffolk. (Kazin, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 33 DECLARATION re #32 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Stay by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Stay by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Manufacturing Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/30/2018. See Minute Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (FTR Log #3:22-3:44.) (Torres, Jasmine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joanna Seybert:Status Conference held on 7/30/2018. Two consolidated motions to dismiss, one against water district plaintiffs and one against individual plaintiffs, to be filed. Page limits are 35 for motions, 35 for responses, and 15 for replies. Motions to be filed by 8/13/2018; responses by 9/14/2018; replies by 9/28/2018. (Court Reporter PL) (Baran, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M Beriloff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Beriloff, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #17 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; denying #18 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; denying #19 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; denying #20 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; denying #21 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Because Green (17-CV-2566), Singer (17-CV-6962), Suffolk County Water Authority (17-CV-6982), Ayo (18-CV-0373), Hampton Bays Water District (18-CV-1996), Shipman (18-CV-2496), and Py (18-CV-3225) involve substantially similar factual allegations and legal issues, in the interest of efficiency, the Court will resolve the anticipated motions to dismiss in these cases on a consolidated basis. Accordingly, the requests for pre-motion conferences in Py and Singer are DENIED and the motions to dismiss in Suffolk County Water Authority and Shipman are TERMINATED pending resolution of the motions to remand in Singer, Ayo, and Shipman. Upon resolving the motions to remand, the Court will set a single briefing schedule for all motions to dismiss in each of the remaining actions. The parties will not be required to resubmit pre-motion conference requests. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/30/2018. (Torreblanca, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 27 Letter Joint Conference Statement by Crystal Benavides, Aimee Py, Brandon Py (DellaUniversita, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leon DellaUniversita on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (DellaUniversita, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Conference Statement) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Case Consolidated - Lead Case: 18cv3225(JS)(AYS); Member Case: 18cv3230(JS)(AYS). (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Lacoff on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lacoff, Brian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Stagg on behalf of County of Suffolk (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stagg, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Kazin on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kazin, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 21 First MOTION for pre motion conference by County of Suffolk. (Stagg, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss Buckeye's proposed motion to dismiss the Complaint by Buckeye Fire Protection Co.. (Nunno Corbo, Ellen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for pre motion conference by National Foam. (Smith, Keith) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by The 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss Tyco/Chemguard's proposed motion to dismiss the complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email by Katherine A. Armstrong (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 15 STATE COURT RECORD received from Judith Pascale, Suffolk County Clerk, Index No. 608013/18. Since the above mentioned case is E-filed, there are no hard copies of the documents listed on the Civil Court Minutes Report. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Mon. 7/30/2018 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert. (Baran, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants The 3M Company, Tyco, and National Foam's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED through July 9, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/21/2018. (Demosthenous, Dina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/20/2018. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 14 Letter regarding Related Case Determination by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan David Sagalowsky on behalf of The 3M Company (aty to be noticed) (Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Calica on behalf of The 3M Company (aty to be noticed) (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Fleming on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 13, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 7/12/2018 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email by David S. Weinraub (Weinraub, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weinraub, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Weinraub on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Weinraub, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 18cv3225. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Armstrong on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (notification declined or already on case) (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyco Fire Products L.P., Chemguard, Inc. from New York Supreme Court, Suffolk County, case number 608013/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0207-10476348) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service to Tyco Fire Products L.P., #3 Exhibit C - Service of Process to Chemguard, Inc.) (Armstrong, Katherine) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Py et al v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Py
Represented By: Zachary M Beriloff
Represented By: Sean Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Denny Adam Brown
Represented By: Michael Leon DellaUniversita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Benavides
Represented By: Zachary M Beriloff
Represented By: Sean Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Denny Adam Brown
Represented By: Michael Leon DellaUniversita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Py
Represented By: Zachary M Beriloff
Represented By: Sean Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Denny Adam Brown
Represented By: Michael Leon DellaUniversita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Jordan David Sagalowsky
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Represented By: Brian A. Lacoff
Represented By: Thomas Edward Stagg
Represented By: Andrew Scott Kazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?