Fogarty et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Plaintiff: Michael Laurino, Joy Johnson, Octavius Fraser, Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, David Freeman, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Fontes Lamb, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Demetrius Jackson, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Charles Lamoureux, Charise Jamroz, Owen Fraser, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Alice Freeman, Basil Lembhard, Jason Laracuente, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack, Joan Hutlock, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Conell Harris and Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Tyco Fire Products LP and The 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv03354
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 71 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:17-cv-07134, Fogarty et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03354-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 69 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:17-cv-07134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 68 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/7/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 67 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew J. Calica dated December 10, 2018 re: Order Advising the Court of the JPML Transfer Order. Document filed by The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Transfer Order)(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #65 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 12/20/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 65 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (61 in 7:17-cv-07136-KMK) Letter, filed by Karen Sheehan and Timothy Sheehan, Jeffrey Orsino, Rosemary Reeves, Zina E. Woody, Desiree Sampson, Milton Webster, Tanysha Newman, Sandra Pason and Kevin Pason Sr., Mark Presutti, Jessica Sheehan, Felton Melvin, Sarah Vinson, Gina Sidoli, Wilfredo Rivera, Caitlyn P. Orphal, Brian Palomino, Previn Pearson, Scott Wilkinson, Sharon Orphal and Alan Orphal, Sifia Smith, Gerald T. Walker, Joseph Schoenleber, Heather McKnight, Louise Melick, William Patrick, William Pulliam, Robert C. Schupner, James Pittman, Nancy Melendez, Nancy Valley, Sharlene Robinson, Tammy Wright, Sherman Smith, Linda Ramos, Maurice Miller, Tyrone Williams, Alicia Yeagley, Jamie Melvin, Adrianne Pietras, (62 in 7:17-cv-07134-KMK) Letter, filed by Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Demetrius Jackson, Octavius Fraser, Michael Laurino, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Alice Freeman, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Basil Lembhard, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack, Charise Jamroz, Jason Laracuente, Joy Johnson, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Owen Fraser, Conell Harris, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, David Freeman, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, (60 in 7:17-cv-07131-KMK) Letter, filed by Jethro Black, John Frontera, Jennifer Desantis, Bruce Cohen, Elizabeth Adamo, Nancy Colas, Maybell Gay, Nancy Frontera, Giovanni Frontera, Melissa Cunningham, Monique Bentley, Christopher Compton, Dorothy Black, Monifah Bentley, James Faison, Veronica Black, Michael Gorenstein, Joseph Biello, Rose Gorenstein, Tina Coughlin, T'Laya Burden, Mark Gorenstein, Tracy Gayle, Andreniki Backus, Rosanna Rosi, Robert Farlow, Kermit Melendez, Lisa Chritian, Audretta Blue, Charles Brown, Dante Desantis, Robert Cole-Schupner, Georgetta Boykin, Gianna Frontera, Rachel Critelli, Tina Coughlin and William Coughlin III, Yvonne Garriques, Franklin Critelli, Devine Earth, Clyde Edward Coston, Virginia Hayes, Danah Edwards, Carl Aiello, Elizabeth Barry, Cory Compton. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will stay discovery in these cases until 12/10/18. The parties are to advise the Court by then about the status of the MDL motion SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/9/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kathleen Gill Miller, Esq. dated October 9, 2018 re: Late Filing of Position Letter due to ECF System Unavailability on October 5, 2018. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 The Port Authority's Position Letter on 3M/Tyco's Pre-Motion Letter)(Miller, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated October 4, 2018 re: Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 61 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 2, 2018. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Nicholas Mino dated 9/27/2018 re: Position on Consolidation. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.(Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated September 27, 2018 re: Consolidation. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack.(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated September 27, 2018 re: Consolidation of Adamo/Fogarty/Miller Actions. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Remand to State Court. Counsel are reminded that there is a strict page limit, which will be extended only in extreme circumstances. The Parties should inform the Court via letter by September 27, 2018 if they have any objections to the Court consolidating the three cases. The Parties should inform the Court via letter by October 4, 2018 whether they have agreed to set a discovery schedule, or wish to litigate whether the discovery deadlines found in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure should be stayed until the date the Motion is decided.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending Motions. (Dkt. No. 28 (No. 17-CV-7131 ); Dkt. No. 29 (No. 17-CV-7134); Dkt. No. 29 (No. 17-CV-7136).) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Oral Argument held on 9/20/2018 re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . filed by Charise Jamroz, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Jason Laracuente, Demetrius Jackson, Octavius Fraser, Joy Johnson, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Michael Laurino, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Alice Freeman, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Conell Harris, Owen Fraser, Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Basil Lembhard, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, David Freeman, Joan Hutlock, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Court Reporter Christina Arends-Dieck) Tate James Kunkle and Paul Joseph Napoli appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Kathleen Gill Miller and Nicholas Mino appeared on behalf of Defendants The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Andrew Calica and Daniel Stein appeared on behalf of Defendant The 3M Company. Douglas Flemming appeared on behalf of Defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. Christina Arends-Dieck served as court reporter. The Court denied Plaintiffs Motion To Remand and adopted a briefing schedule for the Motion To Dismiss. See Order. (AN) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Stein on behalf of The 3M Company. (Stein, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #54 Motion for J. Liat Rome to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/28/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for J. Liat Rome to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15492729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for J. Liat Rome to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15492729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rome, Jacqueline) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 9/20/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #52 Letter granting #50 Letter Motion for Oral Argument; granting #51 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. ENDORSEMENT: Oral argument will happen on 9/20/18, at 11 am. This will not be moved back. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/30/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated July 18, 2018 re: No Conflict for July 20, 2018 Hearing at 11 a.m.. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack.(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 51 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument To Be Rescheduled addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated July 13, 2018. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack.(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 50 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument To Be Rescheduled addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kathleen Gill Miller dated 7/11/2018. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.(Miller, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 49 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned actions have been scheduled for oral argument on all pending motions before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Friday, July 20, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 521, U.S. District Court, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing, at least five business days beforehand. ( Oral Argument set for 7/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/5/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David S. Weinraub on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. New Address: Dechert LLP, Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY, United States 10036, 2126983500. (Weinraub, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Douglas E. Fleming, III on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. New Address: Dechert LLP, Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY, United States 10036, 2126983500. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Steven Cheffo on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. New Address: Dechert LLP, Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY, United States 10036, 2126983500. (Cheffo, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sheila L. Birnbaum on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. New Address: Dechert LLP, Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY, United States 10036, 2126983500. (Birnbaum, Sheila) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Weinraub on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Weinraub, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion and ORDERS that: 1. Maxwell D. Herman and Stephanie L. Gase are hereby withdrawn as counsel to Defendant 3M Company ("3M"). 2. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the association of Maxwell D. Herman and Stephanie L. Gase with 3M in the CM/ECF system. By The Court. (Attorney Stephanie Leeann Gase and Maxwell D. Herman terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/28/18) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 42 JOINT MOTION for MAXWELL D. HERMAN and STEPHANIE L. GASE to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of The 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jordan David Sagalowsky on behalf of The 3M Company. New Address: Mayer Brown LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10020, (212) 506-2500. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan David Sagalowsky on behalf of The 3M Company. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Maxwell D. Herman in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Herman, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by The 3M Company. (Herman, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company.(Herman, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Douglas E. Fleming III in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Tate J. Kunkle in Support re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Tate James Kunkle to RE-FILE Document #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Declaration of Tate J. Kunkle, #3 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- Summons and Complaint vs. City of Newburgh, #5 Exhibit C- Vink, Orange County Profile, #6 Exhibit D- Neuhaus, Orange County by the Numbers, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Kunkle, Tate) Modified on 1/2/2018 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated November 14, 2017 re: Consolidation. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Cheffo, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated November 14, 2017 re: Consolidation. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack.(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Upon review of the complaints and other papers filed with the Court in connection with the three cases captioned above, the Court finds the complaints describe the same or substantially related underlying events arising out of the same or substantially related operative facts, and assert the same or substantially related causes of action against the same defendants. The Parties should inform the Court via letter by November 14, 2014 if they have any objections to the Court consolidating the three cases. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/7/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file their motion to remand by no later than December 8, 2017. Defendants shall file opposition papers by no later than January 12, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply papers by no later than February 2, 2018. Sur-reply papers will not be accepted unless prior permission of the Court is given. Counsel are reminded that there is a strict page limit, which will be extended only in extreme circumstances. Any pending deadlines found in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or in any applicable statute, including discovery deadlines, are hereby stayed until the date the Motion is decided. If oral argument is requested, it may be scheduled by the Court. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/3/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/3/2017. Tate James Kunkle and Paul Joseph Napoli appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Kathleen Gill Miller and Nicholas Mino appeared on behalf of Defendant The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Maxwell D. Herman appeared on behalf of Defendant The 3M Company. Douglas Flemming appeared on behalf of Defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. No court reporter served. The Court adopted a briefing schedule. See Order. (AN) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Joseph Napoli on behalf of Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Maxwell Dane Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/2/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 2, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Maxwell Dane Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14315855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Leeann Gase on behalf of The 3M Company. (Gase, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Maxwell Dane Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14315855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (17 in 7:17-cv-07131-KMK) Letter, filed by Jethro Black, John Frontera, Jennifer Desantis, Bruce Cohen, Elizabeth Adamo, Nancy Colas, Maybell Gay, Nancy Frontera, Giovanni Frontera, Melissa Cunningham, Monique Bentley, Christopher Compton, Monifah Bentley, Dorothy Black, James Faison, Veronica Black, Michael Gorenstein, Joseph Biello, Rose Gorenstein, Tina Coughlin, T'Laya Burden, Mark Gorenstein, Tracy Gayle, Andreniki Backus, Rosanna Rosi, Robert Farlow, Lisa Chritian, Kermit Melendez, Audretta Blue, Charles Brown, Dante Desantis, Georgetta Boykin, Robert Cole-Schupner, Gianna Frontera, Rachel Critelli, Tina Coughlin and William Coughlin III, Yvonne Garriques, Franklin Critelli, Devine Earth, Virginia Hayes, Clyde Edward Coston, Danah Edwards, Elizabeth Barry, Carl Aiello, Cory Compton, (18 in 7:17-cv-07136-KMK) Letter, filed by Karen Sheehan and Timothy Sheehan, Jeffrey Orsino, Rosemary Reeves, Zina E. Woody, Desiree Sampson, Tanysha Newman, Milton Webster, Sandra Pason and Kevin Pason Sr., Mark Presutti, Jessica Sheehan, Felton Melvin, Sarah Vinson, Gina Sidoli, Caitlyn P. Orphal, Wilfredo Rivera, Brian Palomino, Previn Pearson, Scott Wilkinson, Gerald T. Walker, Sifia Smith, Sharon Orphal and Alan Orphal, Joseph Schoenleber, Heather McKnight, Louise Melick, William Patrick, Robert C. Schupner, William Pulliam, James Pittman, Nancy Melendez, Nancy Valley, Tammy Wright, Sharlene Robinson, Sherman Smith, Linda Ramos, Maurice Miller, Tyrone Williams, Alicia Yeagley, Jamie Melvin, Adrianne Pietras, (18 in 7:17-cv-07134-KMK) Letter, filed by Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Demetrius Jackson, Octavius Fraser, Michael Laurino, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Alice Freeman, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Basil Lembhard, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack, Charise Jamroz, Jason Laracuente, Joy Johnson, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Owen Fraser, Conell Harris, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, David Freeman, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference on November 3, 2017, at 11:30 to dismiss the putative remand motions. SO ORDERED. (Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/26/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated October 25, 2017 re: Premotion Conference for Motion to Remand. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reeves v. City of Newburgh)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (15 in 7:17-cv-07131-KMK) Letter filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., (16 in 7:17-cv-07136-KMK) Letter filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., (16 in 7:17-cv-07134-KMK) Letter filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs are to respond to this letter by 10/25/2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/20/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 20, 2017 re: Plaintiffs' October 12, 2017 Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (13 in 7:17-cv-07131-KMK) Letter filed by Jethro Black, John Frontera, Jennifer Desantis, Bruce Cohen, Elizabeth Adamo, Nancy Colas, Maybell Gay, Nancy Frontera, Giovanni Frontera, Melissa Cunningham, Monique Bentley, Christopher Compton, Monifah Bentley, Dorothy Black, James Faison, Veronica Black, Michael Gorenstein, Joseph Biello, Rose Gorenstein, Tina Coughlin, T'Laya Burden, Mark Gorenstein, Tracy Gayle, Andreniki Backus, Rosanna Rosi, Robert Farlow, Lisa Chritian, Kermit Melendez, Audretta Blue, Charles Brown, Dante Desantis, Georgetta Boykin, Robert Cole-Schupner, Gianna Frontera, Rachel Critelli, Tina Coughlin and William Coughlin III, Yvonne Garriques, Franklin Critelli, Devine Earth, Virginia Hayes, Clyde Edward Coston, Danah Edwards, Elizabeth Barry, Carl Aiello, Cory Compton, (14 in 7:17-cv-07136-KMK) Letter filed by Karen Sheehan and Timothy Sheehan, Jeffrey Orsino, Rosemary Reeves, Zina E. Woody, Desiree Sampson, Tanysha Newman, Milton Webster, Sandra Pason and Kevin Pason Sr., Mark Presutti, Jessica Sheehan, Felton Melvin, Sarah Vinson, Gina Sidoli, Caitlyn P. Orphal, Wilfredo Rivera, Brian Palomino, Previn Pearson, Scott Wilkinson, Gerald T. Walker, Sifia Smith, Sharon Orphal and Alan Orphal, Joseph Schoenleber, Heather McKnight, Louise Melick, William Patrick, Robert C. Schupner, William Pulliam, James Pittman, Nancy Melendez, Nancy Valley, Tammy Wright, Sharlene Robinson, Sherman Smith, Linda Ramos, Maurice Miller, Tyrone Williams, Alicia Yeagley, Jamie Melvin, Adrianne Pietras, (14 in 7:17-cv-07134-KMK) Letter filed by Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Demetrius Jackson, Octavius Fraser, Michael Laurino, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Alice Freeman, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Basil Lembhard, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack, Charise Jamroz, Jason Laracuente, Joy Johnson, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Owen Fraser, Conell Harris, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, David Freeman, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are to respond to this letter by 10/20/2017. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/16/2017) (ras) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Tate J. Kunkle dated October 12, 2017 re: Premotion Conference. Document filed by Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack.(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tate James Kunkle on behalf of Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie, Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Octavius Fraser, Owen Fraser, Alice Freeman, David Freeman, Conell Harris, Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris, Evan Hayes-Cohen, Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank, Joan Hutlock, Demetrius Jackson, Charise Jamroz, Joy Johnson, Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones, Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones, Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski, Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares, Fontes Lamb, Charles Lamoureux, Jason Laracuente, Michael Laurino, Basil Lembhard, Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella, Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack. (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint with Individual Claims and Demand for Jury Trial shall be extended to and include the 30th day after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/2017) (ap) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Gill Miller on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Miller, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Mino on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 9 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 17-cv-7131 and declined by Judge Alison J. Nathan and returned to wheel for assignment. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-07131. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Birnbaum, Sheila) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 17-cv-7131. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly; party text entered incorrectly. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas E. Fleming, III on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Steven Cheffo on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Cheffo, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila L. Birnbaum on behalf of Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Birnbaum, Sheila) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company.(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme, County of Orange. Case Number: EF006539-2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14146779).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Stipulation)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogarty et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Laurino
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Johnson
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavius Fraser
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Johnson and Larry Brodie
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Freeman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Harris and Julius Harris
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fontes Lamb
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Hayes and Alfred Brown
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Jackson
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell Richards and Rosaria Macchiarella
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lamoureux
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charise Jamroz
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Fraser
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dialix Lagares and Manuel Lagares
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ketchum and Margaret Jones
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Freeman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basil Lembhard
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Laracuente
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Kuczynski and Peter Kuczynski
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mack and Anthony Mack
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Hutlock
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnosh Jones and Glen Jones
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Hayes-Cohen
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conell Harris
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hebrank and Ronald Hebrank
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Represented By: Nicholas Mino
Represented By: Kathleen Gill Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Sheila L Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Jordan David Sagalowsky
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?