GILLEN v. THE 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Madison Gillen
Defendant: Chemguard, Buckeye Fire Protection Company, The 3M Company, National Foam Inc and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv03359
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:18-cv-02037, Gillen v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03359-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (cpeg, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 11, 2018 Filing 30 Conditional Transfer Order THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH CAROLINA AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD M. GERGEL FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS; ETC. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until After a Decision by the Judicial Panel on MDL on Pending Motions for Transfer filed by BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY, CHEMGUARD, NATIONAL FOAM, INC., THE 3M COMPANY, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 10/9/2018 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand filed by NATIONAL FOAM, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, THE 3M COMPANY, CHEMGUARD, BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, KEITH) Modified on 9/25/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Support re #12 First MOTION to Remand filed by MADISON GILLEN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(COHAN, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO THE COURT REQUESTING AN EXTENSION TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO REMAND MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 9/19/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE #21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL L. CARPENTER AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DOUGLAS E. FLEMING, III ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/9/2018.8/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 8/13/2018 (fb). Modified on 8/13/2018 (kp, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL ENGAGE IN JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY PERTINENT TO NATIONAL FOAM, INC.'S PRINICPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS AND THAT ANY DISCOVERY SHALL CONCLUDE ON OR BEFORE 9/10/18. ANY SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO REMAND MUST BE SUBMITTED ON OR BEFORE 9/24/18. THIS MATTER SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH 18-2038, 18-2039, 18-2040, 18-2041 AND 18-2043 FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY PURPOSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/25/18. 7/25/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT ELLEN NUNNO CARBO, KATHERINE ARMSTRONG; DAVID WEINRAUB; RICHARD BULGER; LAURA HAMMARGEREN AND TYLER ALFERMANN ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR THE PENDENCY OF THIS MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/16/18. 7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas E. Fleming III by CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12931131.). (BLUM, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael Carpenter ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12923351.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY.Application, Sponsor's Statement, Motion, Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COLICCHIO, PHILIP) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tyler Alfermann ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12918114.) filed by THE 3M COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Laura Hammargren ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12918084.) filed by THE 3M COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard Bulger ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12918067.) filed by THE 3M COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Weinraub by CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLUM, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/11/2018 (jl, ). (FEE PAID ON 7/10/18) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Armstrong by CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLUM, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/11/2018 (jl, ). (FEE PAID ON 7/10/18) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT TO HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/9/2018. 7/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12905558.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY.Application, Sponsor's Statement, Motion, Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COLICCHIO, PHILIP) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand Memorandum of Law filed by NATIONAL FOAM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert Nelson)(SMITH, KEITH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand filed by MADISON GILLEN.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(COHAN, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 11 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 COMPLAINT)(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 7/3/2018. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY; CHEMGUARD; NATIONAL FOAM, INC.; THE 3M COMPANY; TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND, BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY 7/3/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/21/18. 5/21/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY Consent to Removal (ROBINSON, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ROBINSON, IV on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE PROTECTION COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF COURT OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/17/18. 5/17/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP of Consent to Removal (BLUM, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN P. LOUCKS on behalf of CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP with Certificate of Service(LOUCKS, ERIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of CHEMGUARD, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP with Certificate of Service(BLUM, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by THE 3M COMPANY of Consent to Removal (DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of THE 3M COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MADISON GILLEN, NATIONAL FOAM, INC.. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL FOAM, INC. from Common Pleas Montgomery, case number 2018-07196. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 178410)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLEN v. THE 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: ERIN P. LOUCKS
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Represented By: Joseph Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Protection Company
Represented By: Ellen N. Corbo
Represented By: Michael L Carpenter
Represented By: Philip M. Colicchio
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ROBINSON, IV
Represented By: Michael J Robinson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Laura R. Hammargren
Represented By: Tyler D. Alfermann
Represented By: Richard F. Bulger
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Represented By: Basil A Disipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: ERIN P. LOUCKS
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Represented By: Joseph Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Gillen
Represented By: LAWRENCE R. COHAN
Represented By: Lawrence R Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?