Burgess v. BB&T Corporation

Plaintiff: Todd Samuel Burgess
Defendant: BB&T Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv03373
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/2/2019. (jbry, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order by Todd Samuel Burgess (Maxfield, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/17/2019.(jbry, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Thomas M. Cull) by BB&T Corporation. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cull, Thomas)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/23/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/7/2020, Fact Discovery due by 11/4/2019, Expert Witness Discovery due by 2/18/2020, Motion in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/13/2020, Pretrial Briefs due seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection, Bench Trial Deadline 4/13/2020, ADR Statement due by 1/8/2020, Mediation Due by 2/7/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/8/2019. (jbry, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by BB&T Corporation.(Hawk, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Todd Samuel Burgess.(Maxfield, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Todd Samuel Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Joint 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Maxfield, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 5/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Discovery due by 12/4/2019, Motion in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Bench Trial Deadline 2/2/2020, ADR Statement due by 12/31/2019, Mediation Due by 1/31/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/1/2019. (jbry, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by BB&T Corporation.(Hawk, John)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until March 29, 2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/6/2019.(jbry, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by BB&T Corporation. Response to Motion due by 3/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hawk, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER BB&T Corporation answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence Granting Extension)(Hawk, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Samuel Burgess. BB&T Corporation served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope BB&T)(Maxfield, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to BB&T Corporation. (jbry, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BB&T Corporation. (jbry, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Todd Samuel Burgess.(jbry, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BB&T Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8156120.), filed by Todd Samuel Burgess. Service due by 3/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Bankruptcy Schedule, #2 Exhibit B) 11-13-17 past due letter, #3 Exhibit C) 12.01.17 Credit Denial, #4 Exhibit D) 01.04.18 Acct Statement, #5 Exhibit E) Discharge Order, #6 Exhibit F) 02.05.18 Acct Statement, #7 Exhibit G) 02.28.18 Recovery Ltr, #8 Exhibit H) 03.12.18 Settlement Offer, #9 Exhibit I) 04.17.18 Equifax Reprort, Burgess, #10 Exhibit J) 05.04.18 First Point Collection Ltr)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. BB&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Michael Cull
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Samuel Burgess
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?