Parker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Jimmy Turner, Marvin Parker, Pamela Crisp, Maria Cortes, Thomas Negrette, Angela Calhoun, Sandra Ford, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Frankie Joseph, James Johnston, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Carol Corpuz, Christopher Caldwell, Bernadette Garcia, Bart Smith, Robert Reiger, Anthony Spry, Ellsie Bentley, Cora Meredith, Susan Grippo, Shelly Morris, Michael Jones, Susan Burkett, Katherine Wilson, Steven Engsberg, Kathleen Strayer, John Farmer, Glen Miller, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Thomas Bennett, Alexis Miller, Daniel Vigil, Heike (I) Reagan, Michael Fotis, Arron Montgomery, Joseph Rankins, Curtiss Wood, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Mary Swope, Shannon Smith, Jesse Hopkins, Devon Bott, Etta Sigala, George Grisham, Thomas Dally, Amanda Mikschl, Michael Ballew, Charlene Miller, Julia (I) Pyatt, Angela Martinez, Donald Day, Sr., Carl Christian, Lesa McCulloh, Anthony Faria, Carl Crisp, Meagan Learned, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Raymond Smith, Christina Sjostrom, Melissa Babcock, Marilyn Bennett, Adele Gilliland, Craig Whisman, Leo Schafer, Joseph Martinez, Michael Babcock, Doctor Robert Williams, Tracy Clark, Denise (I) Woodworth, Georgina Montgomery, Pamela (I) Crisp, Floyd West, Suzan Bolinger, Joshua Gacnik, Sr., Jesse Davila, Matthew Calhoun, Robert Hoyt, Jr., Meagan (I) Learned, Amber (I) Salvador, Vera Smith, Heike Reagan, Jesse Bertsch, Gwen Joseph, Cynthia Smith, Jade Walker, Drue Wimmer, Soren Turner, Shelby Gacnik, Douglas Szklarski, Rose Forrest, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Scott Swope, Matthew Sjostrom, Danny Rodriguez, Robert Ehrie, Thomas Smith, William Lindsey, Jacob Jones, Stephanie Brunson, Robert Eley, Aeng Miller, Amanda (I) Mikschl, ONeil Levasseur, Jr., Sara Duford, Elsie West, Tracy (I) Clark, Jason Luce, Linda Bottcher, Anita Niter, William Mikschl, Christa Gokey, Shannon (I) Smith, Elizabeth Hoyt, Scott Abrahamsen, Linda Davila, Mary Vigil, Sarah Austin, Denise Woodworth, David Starcher, Kum Day, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Mariann Demonja, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Deandrea Thomas, Thomas Jent, Aaron Duford, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Annamaria Walker, Audrey Abrahamsen, Mark Duford, Amy (I) Nowlin, Steven Boneta, Rayven Irons, Olivia Valenzuela, Albert Espinoza, Patrick Austin, Jessie McElwee, Edward Zabriskie, Judith Eley, Amber Salvador, Joshua Babcock, Steven (I) Harris, Jeff Bertsch, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Michael Parker, Paul Pollard, Josiah Valenzuela, Alyssa Palomba, Glen Miller, Jr., Troy Reagan, Kendall Kullman, Gail Quinn, Christopher Parola, Sherri Szklarski, Jade (I) Walker, Adam Bertsch, Bryan Ford, Candy Ballew, Ashley Corpuz, Arturo Corpuz, Noah Rieger, Ferne Engsberg, Mitchel Bird, Starrlite Walker, Arthur Blazic, Jr., Rey Bray, Norman Brashers, Benjamin Davila, Caleb Turner, Cora (I) Meredith, Michael Spitzmiller, Julia Pyatt, Alisa Reagan, Naya Levasseur, Lucia Reaves, Jeffrey Warkocz, Ronald Miller, Steven Harris, Deborah Harris, Dylan Miller, Leon Reznick, Frank Strayer, Shirley Cooke, Deena Hritz-Susa, Jenea Lawrence, Linda Jent and Amy Nowlin
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., National Foam Inc, 3M Company, The and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03377
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01090, Parker et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03377-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01090. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01090 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Marilyn Bennett, Thomas Bennett, Ellsie Bentley, Adam Bertsch, Jeff Bertsch, Jesse Bertsch, Mitchel Bird, Arthur Blazic, Jr, Suzan Bolinger, Steven Boneta, Devon Bott, Linda Bottcher, Norman Brashers, Rey Bray, Stephanie Brunson, Susan Burkett, Christopher Caldwell, Angela Calhoun, Matthew Calhoun, Carl Christian, Tracy Clark, Tracy (I) Clark, Shirley Cooke, Arturo Corpuz, Ashley Corpuz, Carol Corpuz, Maria Cortes, Carl Crisp, Pamela Crisp, Pamela (I) Crisp, Thomas Dally, Benjamin Davila, Jesse Davila, Linda Davila, Donald Day, Sr, Kum Day, Mariann Demonja, Aaron Duford, Mark Duford, Sara Duford, Robert Ehrie, Judith Eley, Robert Eley, Ferne Engsberg, Steven Engsberg, Albert Espinoza, Anthony Faria, John Farmer, Bryan Ford, Sandra Ford, Rose Forrest, Michael Fotis, Joshua Gacnik, Sr, Shelby Gacnik, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Bernadette Garcia, Adele Gilliland, Christa Gokey, Susan Grippo, George Grisham, Deborah Harris, Steven Harris, Steven (I) Harris, Jesse Hopkins, Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Elizabeth Hoyt, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Robert Hoyt, Jr, Deena Hritz-Susa, Rayven Irons, Linda Jent, Thomas Jent, James Johnston, Jacob Jones, Michael Jones, Frankie Joseph, Gwen Joseph, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Kendall Kullman, Jenea Lawrence, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Meagan Learned, Meagan (I) Learned, Naya Levasseur, ONeil Levasseur, Jr, William Lindsey, Jason Luce, Angela Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Lesa McCulloh, Jessie McElwee, Cora Meredith, Cora (I) Meredith, Amanda Mikschl, Amanda (I) Mikschl, Audrey Abrahamsen, Scott Abrahamsen, Patrick Austin, Sarah Austin, Joshua Babcock, Melissa Babcock, Michael Babcock, Candy Ballew, Michael Ballew, William Mikschl, Aeng Miller, Alexis Miller, Charlene Miller, Dylan Miller, Glen Miller, Glen Miller, Jr, Ronald Miller, Arron Montgomery, Georgina Montgomery, Shelly Morris, Thomas Negrette, Anita Niter, Amy Nowlin, Amy (I) Nowlin, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Alyssa Palomba, Marvin Parker, Michael Parker, Christopher Parola, Paul Pollard, Julia Pyatt, Julia (I) Pyatt, Gail Quinn, Joseph Rankins, Alisa Reagan, Heike Reagan, Heike (I) Reagan, Troy Reagan, Lucia Reaves, Robert Reiger, Leon Reznick, Noah Rieger, Danny Rodriguez, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Amber Salvador, Amber (I) Salvador, Leo Schafer, Etta Sigala, Christina Sjostrom, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Matthew Sjostrom, Bart Smith, Cynthia Smith, Raymond Smith, Shannon Smith, Thomas Smith, Vera Smith, Shannon (I) Smith, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Michael Spitzmiller, Anthony Spry, David Starcher, Frank Strayer, Kathleen Strayer, Mary Swope, Scott Swope, Douglas Szklarski, Sherri Szklarski, Deandrea Thomas, Caleb Turner, Jimmy Turner, Soren Turner, Josiah Valenzuela, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Olivia Valenzuela, Daniel Vigil, Mary Vigil, Annamaria Walker, Jade Walker, Jade (I) Walker, Starrlite Walker, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Jeffrey Warkocz, Elsie West, Floyd West, Craig Whisman, Robert Williams, Katherine Wilson, Drue Wimmer, Curtiss Wood, Denise Woodworth, Denise (I) Woodworth, Edward Zabriskie. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 3.2(b) and 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(b), and with the consent of the judges involved and my authority as Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Jackson to serve as the presiding Article III judge. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the Court's records to reflect Judge Jackson as the assigned Article III judge in this case. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/17/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Hyman is no longer counsel of record in this case. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/27/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Marilyn Bennett, Thomas Bennett, Ellsie Bentley, Adam Bertsch, Jeff Bertsch, Jesse Bertsch, Mitchel Bird, Arthur Blazic, Jr, Suzan Bolinger, Steven Boneta, Devon Bott, Linda Bottcher, Norman Brashers, Rey Bray, Stephanie Brunson, Susan Burkett, Christopher Caldwell, Angela Calhoun, Matthew Calhoun, Carl Christian, Tracy Clark, Tracy (I) Clark, Shirley Cooke, Arturo Corpuz, Ashley Corpuz, Carol Corpuz, Maria Cortes, Carl Crisp, Pamela Crisp, Pamela (I) Crisp, Thomas Dally, Benjamin Davila, Jesse Davila, Linda Davila, Donald Day, Sr, Kum Day, Mariann Demonja, Aaron Duford, Mark Duford, Sara Duford, Robert Ehrie, Judith Eley, Robert Eley, Ferne Engsberg, Steven Engsberg, Albert Espinoza, Anthony Faria, John Farmer, Bryan Ford, Sandra Ford, Rose Forrest, Michael Fotis, Joshua Gacnik, Sr, Shelby Gacnik, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Bernadette Garcia, Adele Gilliland, Christa Gokey, Susan Grippo, George Grisham, Deborah Harris, Steven Harris, Steven (I) Harris, Jesse Hopkins, Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Elizabeth Hoyt, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Robert Hoyt, Jr, Deena Hritz-Susa, Rayven Irons, Linda Jent, Thomas Jent, James Johnston, Jacob Jones, Michael Jones, Frankie Joseph, Gwen Joseph, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Kendall Kullman, Jenea Lawrence, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Meagan Learned, Meagan (I) Learned, Naya Levasseur, ONeil Levasseur, Jr, William Lindsey, Jason Luce, Angela Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Lesa McCulloh, Jessie McElwee, Cora Meredith, Cora (I) Meredith, Amanda Mikschl, Amanda (I) Mikschl, Audrey Abrahamsen, Scott Abrahamsen, Patrick Austin, Sarah Austin, Joshua Babcock, Melissa Babcock, Michael Babcock, Candy Ballew, Michael Ballew, William Mikschl, Aeng Miller, Alexis Miller, Charlene Miller, Dylan Miller, Glen Miller, Glen Miller, Jr, Ronald Miller, Arron Montgomery, Georgina Montgomery, Shelly Morris, Thomas Negrette, Anita Niter, Amy Nowlin, Amy (I) Nowlin, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Alyssa Palomba, Marvin Parker, Michael Parker, Christopher Parola, Paul Pollard, Julia Pyatt, Julia (I) Pyatt, Gail Quinn, Joseph Rankins, Alisa Reagan, Heike Reagan, Heike (I) Reagan, Troy Reagan, Lucia Reaves, Robert Reiger, Leon Reznick, Noah Rieger, Danny Rodriguez, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Amber Salvador, Amber (I) Salvador, Leo Schafer, Etta Sigala, Christina Sjostrom, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Matthew Sjostrom, Bart Smith, Cynthia Smith, Raymond Smith, Shannon Smith, Thomas Smith, Vera Smith, Shannon (I) Smith, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Michael Spitzmiller, Anthony Spry, David Starcher, Frank Strayer, Kathleen Strayer, Mary Swope, Scott Swope, Douglas Szklarski, Sherri Szklarski, Deandrea Thomas, Caleb Turner, Jimmy Turner, Soren Turner, Josiah Valenzuela, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Olivia Valenzuela, Daniel Vigil, Mary Vigil, Annamaria Walker, Jade Walker, Jade (I) Walker, Starrlite Walker, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Jeffrey Warkocz, Elsie West, Floyd West, Craig Whisman, Robert Williams, Katherine Wilson, Drue Wimmer, Curtiss Wood, Denise Woodworth, Denise (I) Woodworth, Edward Zabriskie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Hoyt(
June 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hoyt, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hoyt, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deena Hritz-Susa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deena Hritz-Susa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rayven Irons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rayven Irons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Jent(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Jent(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Jent(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Jent(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to par
June 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Marilyn Bennett, Thomas Bennett, Ellsie Bentley, Adam Bertsch, Jeff Bertsch, Jesse Bertsch, Mitchel Bird, Arthur Blazic, Jr, Suzan Bolinger, Steven Boneta, Devon Bott, Linda Bottcher, Norman Brashers, Rey Bray, Stephanie Brunson, Susan Burkett, Christopher Caldwell, Angela Calhoun, Matthew Calhoun, Carl Christian, Tracy Clark, Tracy (I) Clark, Shirley Cooke, Arturo Corpuz, Ashley Corpuz, Carol Corpuz, Maria Cortes, Carl Crisp, Pamela Crisp, Pamela (I) Crisp, Thomas Dally, Benjamin Davila, Jesse Davila, Linda Davila, Donald Day, Sr, Kum Day, Mariann Demonja, Aaron Duford, Mark Duford, Sara Duford, Robert Ehrie, Judith Eley, Robert Eley, Ferne Engsberg, Steven Engsberg, Albert Espinoza, Anthony Faria, John Farmer, Bryan Ford, Sandra Ford, Rose Forrest, Michael Fotis, Joshua Gacnik, Sr, Shelby Gacnik, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Bernadette Garcia, Adele Gilliland, Christa Gokey, Susan Grippo, George Grisham, Deborah Harris, Steven Harris, Steven (I) Harris, Jesse Hopkins, Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Elizabeth Hoyt, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Robert Hoyt, Jr, Deena Hritz-Susa, Rayven Irons, Linda Jent, Thomas Jent, James Johnston, Jacob Jones, Michael Jones, Frankie Joseph, Gwen Joseph, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Kendall Kullman, Jenea Lawrence, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Meagan Learned, Meagan (I) Learned, Naya Levasseur, ONeil Levasseur, Jr, William Lindsey, Jason Luce, Angela Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Lesa McCulloh, Jessie McElwee, Cora Meredith, Cora (I) Meredith, Amanda Mikschl, Amanda (I) Mikschl, Audrey Abrahamsen, Scott Abrahamsen, Patrick Austin, Sarah Austin, Joshua Babcock, Melissa Babcock, Michael Babcock, Candy Ballew, Michael Ballew, William Mikschl, Aeng Miller, Alexis Miller, Charlene Miller, Dylan Miller, Glen Miller, Glen Miller, Jr, Ronald Miller, Arron Montgomery, Georgina Montgomery, Shelly Morris, Thomas Negrette, Anita Niter, Amy Nowlin, Amy (I) Nowlin, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Alyssa Palomba, Marvin Parker, Michael Parker, Christopher Parola, Paul Pollard, Julia Pyatt, Julia (I) Pyatt, Gail Quinn, Joseph Rankins, Alisa Reagan, Heike Reagan, Heike (I) Reagan, Troy Reagan, Lucia Reaves, Robert Reiger, Leon Reznick, Noah Rieger, Danny Rodriguez, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Amber Salvador, Amber (I) Salvador, Leo Schafer, Etta Sigala, Christina Sjostrom, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Matthew Sjostrom, Bart Smith, Cynthia Smith, Raymond Smith, Shannon Smith, Thomas Smith, Vera Smith, Shannon (I) Smith, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Michael Spitzmiller, Anthony Spry, David Starcher, Frank Strayer, Kathleen Strayer, Mary Swope, Scott Swope, Douglas Szklarski, Sherri Szklarski, Deandrea Thomas, Caleb Turner, Jimmy Turner, Soren Turner, Josiah Valenzuela, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Olivia Valenzuela, Daniel Vigil, Mary Vigil, Annamaria Walker, Jade Walker, Jade (I) Walker, Starrlite Walker, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Jeffrey Warkocz, Elsie West, Floyd West, Craig Whisman, Robert Williams, Katherine Wilson, Drue Wimmer, Curtiss Wood, Denise Woodworth, Denise (I) Woodworth, Edward Zabriskie. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Marilyn Bennett, Thomas Bennett, Ellsie Bentley, Adam Bertsch, Jeff Bertsch, Jesse Bertsch, Mitchel Bird, Arthur Blazic, Jr, Suzan Bolinger, Steven Boneta, Devon Bott, Linda Bottcher, Norman Brashers, Rey Bray, Stephanie Brunson, Susan Burkett, Christopher Caldwell, Angela Calhoun, Matthew Calhoun, Carl Christian, Tracy Clark, Tracy (I) Clark, Shirley Cooke, Arturo Corpuz, Ashley Corpuz, Carol Corpuz, Maria Cortes, Carl Crisp, Pamela Crisp, Pamela (I) Crisp, Thomas Dally, Benjamin Davila, Jesse Davila, Linda Davila, Donald Day, Sr, Kum Day, Mariann Demonja, Aaron Duford, Mark Duford, Sara Duford, Robert Ehrie, Judith Eley, Robert Eley, Ferne Engsberg, Steven Engsberg, Albert Espinoza, Anthony Faria, John Farmer, Bryan Ford, Sandra Ford, Rose Forrest, Michael Fotis, Joshua Gacnik, Sr, Shelby Gacnik, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Bernadette Garcia, Adele Gilliland, Christa Gokey, Susan Grippo, George Grisham, Deborah Harris, Steven Harris, Steven (I) Harris, Jesse Hopkins, Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Elizabeth Hoyt, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Robert Hoyt, Jr, Deena Hritz-Susa, Rayven Irons, Linda Jent, Thomas Jent, James Johnston, Jacob Jones, Michael Jones, Frankie Joseph, Gwen Joseph, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Kendall Kullman, Jenea Lawrence, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Meagan Learned, Meagan (I) Learned, Naya Levasseur, ONeil Levasseur, Jr, William Lindsey, Jason Luce, Angela Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Lesa McCulloh, Jessie McElwee, Cora Meredith, Cora (I) Meredith, Amanda Mikschl, Amanda (I) Mikschl, Audrey Abrahamsen, Scott Abrahamsen, Patrick Austin, Sarah Austin, Joshua Babcock, Melissa Babcock, Michael Babcock, Candy Ballew, Michael Ballew, William Mikschl, Aeng Miller, Alexis Miller, Charlene Miller, Dylan Miller, Glen Miller, Glen Miller, Jr, Ronald Miller, Arron Montgomery, Georgina Montgomery, Shelly Morris, Thomas Negrette, Anita Niter, Amy Nowlin, Amy (I) Nowlin, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Alyssa Palomba, Marvin Parker, Michael Parker, Christopher Parola, Paul Pollard, Julia Pyatt, Julia (I) Pyatt, Gail Quinn, Joseph Rankins, Alisa Reagan, Heike Reagan, Heike (I) Reagan, Troy Reagan, Lucia Reaves, Robert Reiger, Leon Reznick, Noah Rieger, Danny Rodriguez, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Amber Salvador, Amber (I) Salvador, Leo Schafer, Etta Sigala, Christina Sjostrom, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Matthew Sjostrom, Bart Smith, Cynthia Smith, Raymond Smith, Shannon Smith, Thomas Smith, Vera Smith, Shannon (I) Smith, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Michael Spitzmiller, Anthony Spry, David Starcher, Frank Strayer, Kathleen Strayer, Mary Swope, Scott Swope, Douglas Szklarski, Sherri Szklarski, Deandrea Thomas, Caleb Turner, Jimmy Turner, Soren Turner, Josiah Valenzuela, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Olivia Valenzuela, Daniel Vigil, Mary Vigil, Annamaria Walker, Jade Walker, Jade (I) Walker, Starrlite Walker, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Jeffrey Warkocz, Elsie West, Floyd West, Craig Whisman, Robert Williams, Katherine Wilson, Drue Wimmer, Curtiss Wood, Denise Woodworth, Denise (I) Woodworth, Edward Zabriskie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy (I) Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela (I) Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelby (I) Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven (I) Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth (I) Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth (I) Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hoyt, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hoyt, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deena Hritz-Susa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deena Hritz-Susa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rayven Irons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rayven Irons(pty:pla), Attorney
May 16, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Marilyn Bennett, Thomas Bennett, Ellsie Bentley, Adam Bertsch, Jeff Bertsch, Jesse Bertsch, Mitchel Bird, Mitchel (I) Bird, Arthur Blazic, Jr, Suzan Bolinger, Suzan (I) Bolinger, Steven Boneta, Devon Bott, Linda Bottcher, Norman Brashers, Rey Bray, Stephanie Brunson, Susan Burkett, Christopher Caldwell, Angela Calhoun, Matthew Calhoun, Carl Christian, Tracy Clark, Tracy (I) Clark, Shirley Cooke, Arturo Corpuz, Ashley Corpuz, Carol Corpuz, Maria Cortes, Carl Crisp, Pamela Crisp, Pamela (I) Crisp, Thomas Dally, Benjamin Davila, Jesse Davila, Linda Davila, Donald Day, Sr, Kum Day, Mariann Demonja, Aaron Duford, Mark Duford, Sara Duford, Robert Ehrie, Judith Eley, Robert Eley, Ferne Engsberg, Steven Engsberg, Albert Espinoza, Anthony Faria, John Farmer, Bryan Ford, Sandra Ford, Rose Forrest, Michael Fotis, Joshua Gacnik, Sr, Shelby Gacnik, Shelby (I) Gacnik, Bernadette Garcia, Adele Gilliland, Christa Gokey, Susan Grippo, George Grisham, Deborah Harris, Deborah (I) Harris, Steven Harris, Steven (I) Harris, Jesse Hopkins, Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan, Elizabeth Hoyt, Elizabeth (I) Hoyt, Robert Hoyt, Jr, Deena Hritz-Susa, Rayven Irons, Linda Jent, Thomas Jent, James Johnston, Jacob Jones, Michael Jones, Frankie Joseph, Gwen Joseph, Keyada Knoten-Hickerson, Kendall Kullman, Jenea Lawrence, Jenea (I) Lawrence, Meagan Learned, Meagan (I) Learned, Naya Levasseur, ONeil Levasseur, Jr, William Lindsey, Jason Luce, Angela Martinez, Joseph Martinez, Lesa McCulloh, Jessie McElwee, Cora Meredith, Audrey Abrahamsen, Scott Abrahamsen, Patrick Austin, Sarah Austin, Joshua Babcock, Melissa Babcock, Michael Babcock, Candy Ballew, Michael Ballew, Cora (I) Meredith, Amanda Mikschl, Amanda (I) Mikschl, William Mikschl, Aeng Miller, Alexis Miller, Charlene Miller, Dylan Miller, Glen Miller, Glen Miller, Jr, Ronald Miller, Arron Montgomery, Georgina Montgomery, Shelly Morris, Thomas Negrette, Anita Niter, Amy Nowlin, Amy (I) Nowlin, Stephanie Orchid Ehrie, Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie, Alyssa Palomba, Marvin Parker, Michael Parker, Christopher Parola, Paul Pollard, Julia Pyatt, Julia (I) Pyatt, Gail Quinn, Joseph Rankins, Alisa Reagan, Heike Reagan, Heike (I) Reagan, Troy Reagan, Lucia Reaves, Robert Reiger, Leon Reznick, Noah Rieger, Danny Rodriguez, Danny (I) Rodriguez, Amber Salvador, Amber (I) Salvador, Leo Schafer, Etta Sigala, Christina Sjostrom, Christina (I) Sjostrom, Matthew Sjostrom, Bart Smith, Cynthia Smith, Raymond Smith, Shannon Smith, Thomas Smith, Vera Smith, Shannon (I) Smith, Gwendolyn Spitzmiller, Michael Spitzmiller, Anthony Spry, David Starcher, Frank Strayer, Kathleen Strayer, Mary Swope, Scott Swope, Douglas Szklarski, Sherri Szklarski, Deandrea Thomas, Caleb Turner, Jimmy Turner, Soren Turner, Josiah Valenzuela, Josiah (I) Valenzuela, Olivia Valenzuela, Daniel Vigil, Mary Vigil, Annamaria Walker, Jade Walker, Jade (I) Walker, Starrlite Walker, Karen Walker Sparkmann, Jeffrey Warkocz, Elsie West, Floyd West, Craig Whisman, Robert Williams, Katherine Wilson, Drue Wimmer, Curtiss Wood, Denise Woodworth, Denise (I) Woodworth, Edward Zabriskie.(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/8/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1) Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2) ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3) Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/08/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01090-MSK. (Text Only Entry) (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge Richard P. Matsch. (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6089844)Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audrey Abrahamsen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audrey Abrahamsen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Abrahamsen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Abrahamsen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Candy Ballew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Candy Ballew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Ballew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Ballew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ellsie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeff Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Bertsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchel Bird(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Blazic, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzan Bolinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Boneta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Devon Bott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Bottcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Norman Brashers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rey Bray(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephanie Brunson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Burkett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Calhoun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Cooke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arturo Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Corpuz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Cortes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Crisp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Dally(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Day, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kum Day(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mariann Demonja(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aaron Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sara Duford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Ehrie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judith Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Eley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ferne Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Engsberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Albert Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Faria(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Farmer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Forrest(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Fotis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Gacnik, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelby Gacnik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernadette Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adele Gilliland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Grisham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jesse Hopkins(pty:pla),

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hoskinson-Jordan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Turner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Parker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Crisp
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cortes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Negrette
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Calhoun
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ford
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby (I) Gacnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Joseph
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnston
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyada Knoten-Hickerson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Orchid Ehrie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Corpuz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Caldwell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Garcia
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reiger
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Spry
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellsie Bentley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Meredith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Grippo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Morris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Burkett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Engsberg
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Strayer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farmer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie (I) Orchid Ehrie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bennett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Vigil
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heike (I) Reagan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fotis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Montgomery
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rankins
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtiss Wood
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenea (I) Lawrence
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Swope
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Hopkins
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Bott
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Sigala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Grisham
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dally
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mikschl
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ballew
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia (I) Pyatt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Day, Sr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Christian
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa McCulloh
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Faria
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Crisp
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Learned
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny (I) Rodriguez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Sjostrom
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Babcock
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bennett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adele Gilliland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Whisman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Schafer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Babcock
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor Robert Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Clark
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise (I) Woodworth
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Montgomery
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela (I) Crisp
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd West
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzan Bolinger
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gacnik, Sr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Davila
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Calhoun
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hoyt, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan (I) Learned
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber (I) Salvador
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heike Reagan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Bertsch
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Joseph
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Walker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drue Wimmer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soren Turner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Gacnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Szklarski
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Forrest
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth (I) Hoyt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Swope
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sjostrom
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Rodriguez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ehrie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lindsey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Jones
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Brunson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Eley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aeng Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Mikschl
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONeil Levasseur, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Duford
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie West
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy (I) Clark
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Luce
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bottcher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Niter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mikschl
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Gokey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon (I) Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hoyt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Abrahamsen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davila
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Vigil
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Austin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Woodworth
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Starcher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kum Day
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Spitzmiller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariann Demonja
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Walker Sparkmann
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandrea Thomas
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jent
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Duford
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina (I) Sjostrom
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamaria Walker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Abrahamsen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Duford
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy (I) Nowlin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Boneta
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayven Irons
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Valenzuela
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Espinoza
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Austin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie McElwee
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Zabriskie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Eley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Salvador
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Babcock
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven (I) Harris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bertsch
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah (I) Valenzuela
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Parker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pollard
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah Valenzuela
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Palomba
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Reagan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Kullman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Quinn
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Parola
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Szklarski
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade (I) Walker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bertsch
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ford
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Ballew
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Corpuz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Corpuz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Rieger
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferne Engsberg
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchel Bird
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starrlite Walker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Blazic, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rey Bray
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Brashers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davila
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Turner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora (I) Meredith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spitzmiller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Pyatt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Reagan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naya Levasseur
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Reaves
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Warkocz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Reznick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Strayer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Cooke
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Hritz-Susa
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenea Lawrence
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jent
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Nowlin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?