Gutierres et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Paine, Samuel James, Jr., Jeffrey Chadwick, Detective Michael Patterson, Linda Jones, Heaven Rains, Erin Hutchinson, Albert Rice, Vickie Johnson, Abel Martiniez, Mary Martinez, Kristie Lee, Ira Bloodworth, Carolyn Mosley, John Cuellar, Annette Campbell, James Hall, Sonya Lopez, Marie Kornegay, Kayla Farris, Donna Yanson, Michelle Swinton, Amy Kinoff, Barbara Schara, Theodore Johnson, Michelle Greenlee, Denise Heitz, Brandy Harris, Chris Colburn, Angel Negron, Felicia Booth-Voris, Christopher Campbell, Paul Laird, John Campbell, Jr., Kathy Maximenko, George Jordan, Jr., James Marucci, Jr., Shandell Echols, Robert Jago, Charline Loewenstein, James Cook, Matthew Laws, Delores Stroh, Joseph Fische, Darren Brown, Michael Esler, Lori Longnecker, Myrna Perez, Monica Hull, Billy Cotton, Tina Glunt, Police Chief John Young, Brandon Herrera, Chastity Bunn, Melanie Perez, Rebecca Barnes, Tracy Budd, Heather Gorman, Timisha Reneau, Bobby Winfield, Kara Hicks, James Washington, Derante Williams, Corrie Studdard, Louis Kowalefski, Carl Brickell, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Gina Flickinger, Trapper Mathews, Crystal Hubbard, John Guttenberg, Sonmi Parsons, Hannah Quidachay, Argentina Perez, Frank Apodaca, Rita Landers, Miguel Cantu, Sarah Largent, Danielle Wojtowicz, Brian Kidwell, Harnek Sahota, Christiane Morrow, Vincent Harris, Nancy Markes, Jamie Huff, Tracey Esteve, Derek Brown, Randem Beckner, Debora Richard, Nicholas Villegas, Carrie Brown, Hyunkyung Chavez, Sami Griffin, Sylvia Walton, Carlos Machin, Gary Johnson, William Bloom, Valentina Wolfkill, Heather Didonato, Mary Jordan, Lionel Martinez, Rachael Waters, Alfonso Colon, Mary Mahon, John Lunger, Kayla Doughty, Thaddus Montgomery, James Chapman, Shannon Bresciani, Geraldine Martinez, Robert Hull, Rebecca Cooper, Irina Thomas, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Amber Dore, Bromlyn Hatton, Cynthia Towner, Jay Sanne, Denise Chapman, Marjorie Lopez, Antonio Ford, Jedadiah Pierce, James Glunt, April Cowley, Michael Shuck, Sabien Stapleton, Choral Yanson, Heather Sams, Sharon Carlos, Brenda Blvetta Brungardt, Alina Mathews, Patricia Gagnon, Frederick Johnson, Michael Grippo, Mary (I) Crawley, Steven Saleny, David Schara, Michael Howells, Becky Steeves, Tabitha Starks, Helen Kidwell, William Foy, Wanda Jones, Arthur Green, Kamas De Workman, Shera Gottlob, Robert Behrens, Dorothy Pierce, Maurice Harris, Janie Cumpston, Chevon Patrick, Chris Findlay, James Parsons, Edward Fink, Heidi Ray, Laura Jacobs, Gene Wilson, Cynthia (I) Towner, Kristen Port, Scott Koenig, Vivian Winfield, Harry Gutierres, Sherry Quinlivan, Michael James, Ryann Milam, Mary Crawley, Kathryn Higgins, Darren Hunt, Rita Machin, Trudy Tagstrom, George Lopez, Richard Cook, Randolph Jones, Amelia Rubio, Kory Lankford, Consepcion Hines, Gamal Lawrence, Rita Jeffries, Jennifer Howell, Michelle Norton, Bonnie Miller, Alina (I) Mathews, Keith Orcutt, Doris Guiliani, Melinda Fischer, Charles Wesley Peoples, Victor Wright, Alan Thein, Sarah Zamora Hill, Wendell Burnett, Peggy Puralewiski, Billie Frankland, Carmen Avila, John Esler, Ladocia Bloom, Timothy Mahon and Alicia Chavez
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc. and 3M Company, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv03381
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01140, Gutierres et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03381-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01140 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Carrie Brown, Darren Brown, Derek Brown, Brenda Blvetta Brungardt, Tracy Budd, Chastity Bunn, Wendell Burnett, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr, Miguel Cantu, Sharon Carlos, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Alicia Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Chris Colburn, Alfonso Colon, James Cook, Richard Cook, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, April Cowley, Mary Crawley, Mary (I) Crawley, John Cuellar, Janie Cumpston, Kamas De Workman, Heather Didonato, Amber Dore, Kayla Doughty, Shandell Echols, John Esler, Michael Esler, Tracey Esteve, Kayla Farris, Chris Findlay, Edward Fink, Joseph Fische, Melinda Fischer, Gina Flickinger, Antonio Ford, William Foy, Billie Frankland, Patricia Gagnon, James Glunt, Tina Glunt, Heather Gorman, Shera Gottlob, Arthur Green, Michelle Greenlee, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Doris Guiliani, Harry Gutierres, John Guttenberg, James Hall, Brandy Harris, Maurice Harris, Vincent Harris, Bromlyn Hatton, Denise Heitz, Brandon Herrera, Kara Hicks, Kathryn Higgins, Sarah Zamora Hill, Consepcion Hines, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Jennifer Howell, Michael Howells, Crystal Hubbard, Jamie Huff, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Darren Hunt, Erin Hutchinson, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Michael James, Samuel James, Jr, Rita Jeffries, Frederick Johnson, Gary Johnson, Theodore Johnson, Vickie Johnson, Linda Jones, Randolph Jones, Wanda Jones, George Jordan, Jr, Mary Jordan, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Scott Koenig, Marie Kornegay, Louis Kowalefski, Paul Laird, Rita Landers, Kory Lankford, Sarah Largent, Gamal Lawrence, Matthew Laws, Kristie Lee, Charline Loewenstein, Lori Longnecker, George Lopez, Marjorie Lopez, Sonya Lopez, John Lunger, Carlos Machin, Rita Machin, Mary Mahon, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Rebecca Barnes, Randem Beckner, Robert Behrens, Ira Bloodworth, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Felicia Booth-Voris, Timothy Mahon, Nancy Markes, Geraldine Martinez, Lionel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Abel Martiniez, James Marucci, Jr, Alina Mathews, Alina (I) Mathews, Trapper Mathews, Kathy Maximenko, Ryann Milam, Bonnie Miller, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Angel Negron, Michelle Norton, Keith Orcutt, Nicole Paine, James Parsons, Sonmi Parsons, Chevon Patrick, Michael Patterson, Charles Wesley Peoples, Argentina Perez, Melanie Perez, Myrna Perez, Dorothy Pierce, Jedadiah Pierce, Kristen Port, Peggy Puralewiski, Hannah Quidachay, Sherry Quinlivan, Heaven Rains, Heidi Ray, Timisha Reneau, Albert Rice, Debora Richard, Amelia Rubio, Harnek Sahota, Steven Saleny, Heather Sams, Jay Sanne, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Michael Shuck, Sabien Stapleton, Tabitha Starks, Becky Steeves, Delores Stroh, Corrie Studdard, Michelle Swinton, Trudy Tagstrom, Alan Thein, Irina Thomas, Cynthia Towner, Cynthia (I) Towner, Nicholas Villegas, Sylvia Walton, James Washington, Rachael Waters, Derante Williams, Gene Wilson, Bobby Winfield, Vivian Winfield, Danielle Wojtowicz, Valentina Wolfkill, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, John Young. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Carrie Brown, Darren Brown, Derek Brown, Brenda Blvetta Brungardt, Tracy Budd, Chastity Bunn, Wendell Burnett, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr, Miguel Cantu, Sharon Carlos, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Alicia Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Chris Colburn, Alfonso Colon, James Cook, Richard Cook, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, April Cowley, Mary Crawley, Mary (I) Crawley, John Cuellar, Janie Cumpston, Kamas De Workman, Heather Didonato, Amber Dore, Kayla Doughty, Shandell Echols, John Esler, Michael Esler, Tracey Esteve, Kayla Farris, Chris Findlay, Edward Fink, Joseph Fische, Melinda Fischer, Gina Flickinger, Antonio Ford, William Foy, Billie Frankland, Patricia Gagnon, James Glunt, Tina Glunt, Heather Gorman, Shera Gottlob, Arthur Green, Michelle Greenlee, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Doris Guiliani, Harry Gutierres, John Guttenberg, James Hall, Brandy Harris, Maurice Harris, Vincent Harris, Bromlyn Hatton, Denise Heitz, Brandon Herrera, Kara Hicks, Kathryn Higgins, Sarah Zamora Hill, Consepcion Hines, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Jennifer Howell, Michael Howells, Crystal Hubbard, Jamie Huff, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Darren Hunt, Erin Hutchinson, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Michael James, Samuel James, Jr, Rita Jeffries, Frederick Johnson, Gary Johnson, Theodore Johnson, Vickie Johnson, Linda Jones, Randolph Jones, Wanda Jones, George Jordan, Jr, Mary Jordan, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Scott Koenig, Marie Kornegay, Louis Kowalefski, Paul Laird, Rita Landers, Kory Lankford, Sarah Largent, Gamal Lawrence, Matthew Laws, Kristie Lee, Charline Loewenstein, Lori Longnecker, George Lopez, Marjorie Lopez, Sonya Lopez, John Lunger, Carlos Machin, Rita Machin, Mary Mahon, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Rebecca Barnes, Randem Beckner, Robert Behrens, Ira Bloodworth, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Felicia Booth-Voris, Timothy Mahon, Nancy Markes, Geraldine Martinez, Lionel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Abel Martiniez, James Marucci, Jr, Alina Mathews, Alina (I) Mathews, Trapper Mathews, Kathy Maximenko, Ryann Milam, Bonnie Miller, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Angel Negron, Michelle Norton, Keith Orcutt, Nicole Paine, James Parsons, Sonmi Parsons, Chevon Patrick, Michael Patterson, Charles Wesley Peoples, Argentina Perez, Melanie Perez, Myrna Perez, Dorothy Pierce, Jedadiah Pierce, Kristen Port, Peggy Puralewiski, Hannah Quidachay, Sherry Quinlivan, Heaven Rains, Heidi Ray, Timisha Reneau, Albert Rice, Debora Richard, Amelia Rubio, Harnek Sahota, Steven Saleny, Heather Sams, Jay Sanne, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Michael Shuck, Sabien Stapleton, Tabitha Starks, Becky Steeves, Delores Stroh, Corrie Studdard, Michelle Swinton, Trudy Tagstrom, Alan Thein, Irina Thomas, Cynthia Towner, Cynthia (I) Towner, Nicholas Villegas, Sylvia Walton, James Washington, Rachael Waters, Derante Williams, Gene Wilson, Bobby Winfield, Vivian Winfield, Danielle Wojtowicz, Valentina Wolfkill, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, John Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Crystal Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Crystal Hubba
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Crystal Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Crystal Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darren Hunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darren Hunt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Jacobs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Jacobs(pt
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Carrie Brown, Darren Brown, Derek Brown, Brenda Blvetta Brungardt, Tracy Budd, Chastity Bunn, Wendell Burnett, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr, Miguel Cantu, Sharon Carlos, Jeffrey Chadwick, Denise Chapman, James Chapman, Alicia Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Chris Colburn, Alfonso Colon, James Cook, Richard Cook, Rebecca Cooper, Billy Cotton, April Cowley, Mary Crawley, Mary (I) Crawley, John Cuellar, Janie Cumpston, Kamas De Workman, Heather Didonato, Amber Dore, Kayla Doughty, Shandell Echols, John Esler, Michael Esler, Tracey Esteve, Kayla Farris, Chris Findlay, Edward Fink, Joseph Fische, Melinda Fischer, Gina Flickinger, Antonio Ford, William Foy, Billie Frankland, Patricia Gagnon, James Glunt, Tina Glunt, Heather Gorman, Shera Gottlob, Arthur Green, Michelle Greenlee, Sami Griffin, Michael Grippo, Doris Guiliani, Harry Gutierres, John Guttenberg, James Hall, Brandy Harris, Maurice Harris, Vincent Harris, Bromlyn Hatton, Denise Heitz, Brandon Herrera, Kara Hicks, Kathryn Higgins, Sarah Zamora Hill, Consepcion Hines, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Jennifer Howell, Michael Howells, Crystal Hubbard, Jamie Huff, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Darren Hunt, Erin Hutchinson, Laura Jacobs, Robert Jago, Michael James, Samuel James, Jr, Rita Jeffries, Frederick Johnson, Gary Johnson, Theodore Johnson, Vickie Johnson, Linda Jones, Randolph Jones, Wanda Jones, George Jordan, Jr, Mary Jordan, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Scott Koenig, Marie Kornegay, Louis Kowalefski, Paul Laird, Rita Landers, Kory Lankford, Sarah Largent, Gamal Lawrence, Matthew Laws, Kristie Lee, Charline Loewenstein, Lori Longnecker, George Lopez, Marjorie Lopez, Sonya Lopez, John Lunger, Carlos Machin, Rita Machin, Mary Mahon, Frank Apodaca, Carmen Avila, Rebecca Barnes, Randem Beckner, Robert Behrens, Ira Bloodworth, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Felicia Booth-Voris, Timothy Mahon, Nancy Markes, Geraldine Martinez, Lionel Martinez, Mary Martinez, Abel Martiniez, James Marucci, Jr, Alina Mathews, Alina (I) Mathews, Trapper Mathews, Kathy Maximenko, Ryann Milam, Bonnie Miller, Thaddus Montgomery, Christiane Morrow, Carolyn Mosley, Angel Negron, Michelle Norton, Keith Orcutt, Nicole Paine, James Parsons, Sonmi Parsons, Chevon Patrick, Michael Patterson, Charles Wesley Peoples, Argentina Perez, Melanie Perez, Myrna Perez, Dorothy Pierce, Jedadiah Pierce, Kristen Port, Peggy Puralewiski, Hannah Quidachay, Sherry Quinlivan, Heaven Rains, Heidi Ray, Timisha Reneau, Albert Rice, Debora Richard, Amelia Rubio, Harnek Sahota, Steven Saleny, Heather Sams, Jay Sanne, Barbara Schara, David Schara, Michael Shuck, Sabien Stapleton, Tabitha Starks, Becky Steeves, Delores Stroh, Corrie Studdard, Michelle Swinton, Trudy Tagstrom, Alan Thein, Irina Thomas, Cynthia Towner, Cynthia (I) Towner, Nicholas Villegas, Sylvia Walton, James Washington, Rachael Waters, Derante Williams, Gene Wilson, Bobby Winfield, Vivian Winfield, Danielle Wojtowicz, Valentina Wolfkill, Victor Wright, Monica Wright-Tafoya, Choral Yanson, Donna Yanson, John Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Consepcion Hines
May 23, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary (I) Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Fische(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Heitz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandon Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kara Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathryn Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Zamora Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Consepcion Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sudie-Pearl Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Crystal Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Crystal Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darren Hunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darren Hunt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erin Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Nap
May 11, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyHunter Jay Shkolnik and Tate James Kunkle. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam, Inc, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6099668)Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frank Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Frank Apodaca(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carmen Avila(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carmen Avila(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Randem Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ira Bloodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ira Bloodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Felicia Booth-Voris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carrie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Darren Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brenda Blvetta Brungardt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tracy Budd(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chastity Bunn(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wendell Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Campbell, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Miguel Cantu(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeffrey Chadwick(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Denise Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Chapman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alicia Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Richard Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Rebecca Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Billy Cotton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mary Crawley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kamas De Workman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party T. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party T. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shandell Echols(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tracey Esteve(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kayla Farris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Edward Fink(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Melinda Fischer(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gina Flickinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Billie Frankland(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Gagnon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tina Glunt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Heather Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shera Gottlob(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arthur Green(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sami Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michael Grippo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Doris Guiliani(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Harry Gutierres(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Guttenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brandy Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Maurice Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bromlyn Hatton(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Denise

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierres et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Paine
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel James, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Chadwick
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detective Michael Patterson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jones
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heaven Rains
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Hutchinson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Rice
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Martiniez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Martinez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Lee
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Bloodworth
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mosley
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cuellar
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Campbell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hall
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Lopez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kornegay
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Farris
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Yanson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Swinton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kinoff
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schara
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Greenlee
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Heitz
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Harris
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Colburn
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Negron
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Booth-Voris
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Laird
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Maximenko
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marucci, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandell Echols
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jago
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charline Loewenstein
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cook
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Laws
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Stroh
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fische
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Brown
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Esler
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Longnecker
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Perez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Hull
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Cotton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Glunt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Chief John Young
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Herrera
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity Bunn
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Perez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Barnes
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Budd
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Gorman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timisha Reneau
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Winfield
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Hicks
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Washington
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derante Williams
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrie Studdard
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Kowalefski
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Brickell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudie-Pearl Horton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Flickinger
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trapper Mathews
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hubbard
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Guttenberg
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonmi Parsons
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Quidachay
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argentina Perez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Apodaca
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Landers
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Cantu
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Largent
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Wojtowicz
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kidwell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harnek Sahota
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiane Morrow
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Harris
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Markes
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Huff
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Esteve
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Brown
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randem Beckner
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Richard
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Villegas
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Brown
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyunkyung Chavez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Griffin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Walton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Machin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bloom
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Wolfkill
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Didonato
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jordan
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Martinez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Waters
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Colon
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mahon
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lunger
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Doughty
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddus Montgomery
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chapman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Bresciani
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Martinez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hull
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Cooper
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Thomas
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Wright-Tafoya
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Dore
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bromlyn Hatton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Towner
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Sanne
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Chapman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lopez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ford
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jedadiah Pierce
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Glunt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Cowley
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shuck
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabien Stapleton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choral Yanson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Sams
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Carlos
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Blvetta Brungardt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina Mathews
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gagnon
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grippo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary (I) Crawley
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Saleny
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schara
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howells
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Steeves
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Starks
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Kidwell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Foy
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jones
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Green
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamas De Workman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shera Gottlob
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behrens
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Pierce
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Harris
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Cumpston
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevon Patrick
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Findlay
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Parsons
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fink
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Ray
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Jacobs
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Wilson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia (I) Towner
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Port
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Koenig
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Winfield
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Gutierres
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Quinlivan
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryann Milam
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Crawley
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Higgins
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Hunt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Machin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Tagstrom
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lopez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cook
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Jones
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Rubio
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Lankford
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consepcion Hines
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamal Lawrence
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Jeffries
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Howell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Norton
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Miller
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina (I) Mathews
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Orcutt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Guiliani
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Fischer
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wesley Peoples
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Wright
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Thein
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Zamora Hill
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Burnett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Puralewiski
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Frankland
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Avila
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Esler
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladocia Bloom
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mahon
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Chavez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?