Roderick et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Carla Haley, Berniece Robinson, Janeth Jones, Debra Ann Perricone, Shelley Haenze, Rebecca Roderick, Joanne Cooper, Julie Hawley-Solache, Amanda Tymensky, Carmen Cass, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr, Bernard Zimmerman, Kenneth Hickman, Samantha Stapleton, Manuel Ochoa, Jr, Karen Iudice, Delia Jimenez, Emily Hancock, Juanita Useman, Amber Nicole Sherban, Alyssa Hill, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Patricia Tippins, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Alexa Tymensky, Nathaniel Burklow, Daniel Robinson, Cheryl Barter, Benita Kalb, Vanessa McAlhaney, Ute Aiken, Cindy Jordan, Fawn Caffey, Daniel Hernandez, Joseph Aiken, William Haupt, Billy Anthony, Lewis Stoddard, Kelsey Patsky, Kacyee Simmons, Rusty Bower, Ethel Montgomery, Misty Beemon, Mary Staton, Emily Jackson, Brody Stegman, Kelly Kinoff, Robert Tarver, Ryan Adragna, Carolann Vigil, Angela Baldwin, Jessie Cortez, Tina Blount, Barbara Thompson, Sierra Colkmire-UTHE, Melanie Perez, Jessica Dolan, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Steve Stegman, Joe Pinter, Janida Rosado, Pamela Rucker, Shannon Anthony, John Bell, DeAmbra Patterson, Kimberly Jackson, Veronica Alvarado, Marilyn Watson, Benjamin Deis, Frauke Randles, Paul Travis, Darlene Salaza, Daishanae Moore, Donna K Johnson, Penny Cimino, Lawrence Jackson, Angela Polk, Santa Lausell, Brittany Yeager, Carol Green, Thomas Chisholm, Justin Campbell, Jessica Burklow, Santana Bell, Jose Cerda, Erin Scott, Judy Lyons, Jamie Huff, Raina Burns, Montana Wolthuis, Alina Mathews, Margaret King, Nichole Pentland, Bonnie Larscheid, Jason Griego, Emory Smith, Casey Fletcher, Linda Lorenzana, Aimee Carroll, Angelica Patterson, Michael Murphy, Warren Cays, Erin Hutchinson, Sarah Cerda, Theresa Robinson, Danielle Currie, Christine Cays, Lucy Wilson, Carlos Bowdre, Marita Sobotka, James Clark, Levi Braun, Ashley Dahlberg, William Villeneuve, Scott St. Onge, Michael Childers, Michael Staton, Barbara Lemay, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Erika Oehm, Shelly Snethen, Angelina Jaramillo, Adam Tymensky, Jr., Antoinee Benjamin, Fitz Bannister, Davina Price, Reann Berumen, Kelley Conners, Kenneth Wilson, Jason White, Prince Rogers, Freddie Lee Stoutmyre, Beverly Brown, Jennifer Stegman, Maria Rice, Eileen House, Lenyon Starks, Chief Charles Clarke, Joan Marie Nichols, Cassie Bernard, Adrian Armendano, Deanne Martinez, Jean Clark, Chiquita Stewart, Stephanie Pierce, Bobby Berry, William Toner, Daisy Hollender, George Gordon, Jr., Wendy Rash, Jane Chadima, Amy Bell, Rochelle Drinnon, Cashmyir Scott, Viola Bennett, Elzena Harris, Clifford Dufrain, Christina Trujillo, Betty Ochle, Rose Beam, James Andrews, Tyliah Harris, Eileen Avilez, Oscar Carrera, Janie Ives, Susan Smith, Daniel Bisping, Jeffrey Bell, Anthony Casaus, Karl Voehl, Mallory Cullen, Kevin Conners, Elizabeth Barrientes, Christopher McAlhaney, Charles Peterie, Jamie Soliz, Ginger Cordova, William Bergeron, Helen Negrette, Tracy Griego, Kelly Duncan-Marcum, Kenneth Chavez, Leilani Marchand, Adam Kleinfieldt, Amy Clements and Charles Rucker
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., National Foam Inc, 3M Company, The and Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03382
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01145, Roderick et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03382-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01145. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01145 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873, By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Eileen Avilez, Angela Baldwin, Fitz Bannister, Elizabeth Barrientes, Cheryl Barter, Rose Beam, Misty Beemon, Amy Bell, Jeffrey Bell, John Bell, Santana Bell, Antoinee Benjamin, Antoinee Benjamin, Viola Bennett, William Bergeron, Cassie Bernard, Bobby Berry, Reann Berumen, Daniel Bisping, Tina Blount, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Carlos Bowdre, Rusty Bower, Levi Braun, Beverly Brown, Jessica Burklow, Nathaniel Burklow, Raina Burns, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Oscar Carrera, Aimee Carroll, Anthony Casaus, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Jane Chadima, Kenneth Chavez, Michael Childers, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, James Clark, Jean Clark, Charles Clarke, Amy Clements, Sierra Colkmire-Uthe, Kelley Conners, Kevin Conners, Joanne Cooper, Ginger Cordova, Jessie Cortez, Mallory Cullen, Danielle Currie, Ashley Dahlberg, Benjamin Deis, Jessica Dolan, Rochelle Drinnon, Clifford Dufrain, Kelly Duncan-Marcum, Casey Fletcher, George Gordon, Jr., Carol Green, Jason Griego, Tracy Griego, Shelley Haenze, Carla Haley, Emily Hancock, Elzena Harris, Tyliah Harris, William Haupt, Julie Hawley-Solache, Daniel Hernandez, Kenneth Hickman, Alyssa Hill, Daisy Hollender, Eileen House, Jamie Huff, Erin Hutchinson, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Karen Iudice, Janie Ives, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Angelina Jaramillo, Delia Jimenez, Donna K Johnson, Janeth Jones, Cindy Jordan, Benita Kalb, Margaret King, Kelly Kinoff, Adam Kleinfieldt, Bonnie Larscheid, Santa Lausell, Barbara Lemay, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Linda Lorenzana, Judy Lyons, Leilani Marchand, Joan Marie Nichols, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr, Ryan Adragna, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Veronica Alvarado, James Andrews, Billy Anthony, Shannon Anthony, Adrian Armendano, Alina Mathews, Christopher McAlhaney, Vanessa McAlhaney, Ethel Montgomery, Daishanae Moore, Michael Murphy, Helen Negrette, Betty Ochle, Manuel Ochoa, Jr, Erika Oehm, Kelsey Patsky, Angelica Patterson, DeAmbra Patterson, Nichole Pentland, Melanie Perez, Debra Ann Perricone, Charles Peterie, Stephanie Pierce, Joe Pinter, Angela Polk, Davina Price, Frauke Randles, Wendy Rash, Maria Rice, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Theresa Robinson, Rebecca Roderick, Prince Rogers, Janida Rosado, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Darlene Salaza, Cashmyir Scott, Erin Scott, Amber Nicole Sherban, Kacyee Simmons, Emory Smith, Susan Smith, Shelly Snethen, Marita Sobotka, Jamie Soliz, Scott St. Onge, Samantha Stapleton, Lenyon Starks, Mary Staton, Michael Staton, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Chiquita Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Freddie Lee Stoutmyre, Robert Tarver, Barbara Thompson, Patricia Tippins, William Toner, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Alexa Tymensky, Amanda Tymensky, Adam Tymensky, Jr., Juanita Useman, Carolann Vigil, William Villeneuve, Karl Voehl, Marilyn Watson, Jason White, Kenneth Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Montana Wolthuis, Brittany Yeager, Bernard Zimmerman. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Eileen Avilez, Angela Baldwin, Fitz Bannister, Elizabeth Barrientes, Cheryl Barter, Rose Beam, Misty Beemon, Amy Bell, Jeffrey Bell, John Bell, Santana Bell, Antoinee Benjamin, Antoinee Benjamin, Viola Bennett, William Bergeron, Cassie Bernard, Bobby Berry, Reann Berumen, Daniel Bisping, Tina Blount, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Carlos Bowdre, Rusty Bower, Levi Braun, Beverly Brown, Jessica Burklow, Nathaniel Burklow, Raina Burns, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Oscar Carrera, Aimee Carroll, Anthony Casaus, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Jane Chadima, Kenneth Chavez, Michael Childers, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, James Clark, Jean Clark, Charles Clarke, Amy Clements, Sierra Colkmire-Uthe, Kelley Conners, Kevin Conners, Joanne Cooper, Ginger Cordova, Jessie Cortez, Mallory Cullen, Danielle Currie, Ashley Dahlberg, Benjamin Deis, Jessica Dolan, Rochelle Drinnon, Clifford Dufrain, Kelly Duncan-Marcum, Casey Fletcher, George Gordon, Jr., Carol Green, Jason Griego, Tracy Griego, Shelley Haenze, Carla Haley, Emily Hancock, Elzena Harris, Tyliah Harris, William Haupt, Julie Hawley-Solache, Daniel Hernandez, Kenneth Hickman, Alyssa Hill, Daisy Hollender, Eileen House, Jamie Huff, Erin Hutchinson, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Karen Iudice, Janie Ives, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Angelina Jaramillo, Delia Jimenez, Donna K Johnson, Janeth Jones, Cindy Jordan, Benita Kalb, Margaret King, Kelly Kinoff, Adam Kleinfieldt, Bonnie Larscheid, Santa Lausell, Barbara Lemay, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Linda Lorenzana, Judy Lyons, Leilani Marchand, Joan Marie Nichols, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr, Ryan Adragna, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Veronica Alvarado, James Andrews, Billy Anthony, Shannon Anthony, Adrian Armendano, Alina Mathews, Christopher McAlhaney, Vanessa McAlhaney, Ethel Montgomery, Daishanae Moore, Michael Murphy, Helen Negrette, Betty Ochle, Manuel Ochoa, Jr, Erika Oehm, Kelsey Patsky, Angelica Patterson, DeAmbra Patterson, Nichole Pentland, Melanie Perez, Debra Ann Perricone, Charles Peterie, Stephanie Pierce, Joe Pinter, Angela Polk, Davina Price, Frauke Randles, Wendy Rash, Maria Rice, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Theresa Robinson, Rebecca Roderick, Prince Rogers, Janida Rosado, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Darlene Salaza, Cashmyir Scott, Erin Scott, Amber Nicole Sherban, Kacyee Simmons, Emory Smith, Susan Smith, Shelly Snethen, Marita Sobotka, Jamie Soliz, Scott St. Onge, Samantha Stapleton, Lenyon Starks, Mary Staton, Michael Staton, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Chiquita Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Freddie Lee Stoutmyre, Robert Tarver, Barbara Thompson, Patricia Tippins, William Toner, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Alexa Tymensky, Amanda Tymensky, Adam Tymensky, Jr., Juanita Useman, Carolann Vigil, William Villeneuve, Karl Voehl, Marilyn Watson, Jason White, Kenneth Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Montana Wolthuis, Brittany Yeager, Bernard Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party S
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Mi
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daisy Hollender(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daisy Hollender(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eileen House(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eileen House(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Hutchinson(pty:pla),
June 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC by Plaintiffs Eileen Avilez, Angela Baldwin, Fitz Bannister, Elizabeth Barrientes, Cheryl Barter, Rose Beam, Misty Beemon, Amy Bell, Jeffrey Bell, John Bell, Santana Bell, Antoinee Benjamin, Antoinee Benjamin, Viola Bennett, William Bergeron, Cassie Bernard, Bobby Berry, Reann Berumen, Daniel Bisping, Tina Blount, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Carlos Bowdre, Rusty Bower, Levi Braun, Beverly Brown, Jessica Burklow, Nathaniel Burklow, Raina Burns, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Oscar Carrera, Aimee Carroll, Anthony Casaus, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Jane Chadima, Kenneth Chavez, Michael Childers, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, James Clark, Jean Clark, Charles Clarke, Amy Clements, Sierra Colkmire-Uthe, Kelley Conners, Kevin Conners, Joanne Cooper, Ginger Cordova, Jessie Cortez, Mallory Cullen, Danielle Currie, Ashley Dahlberg, Benjamin Deis, Jessica Dolan, Rochelle Drinnon, Clifford Dufrain, Kelly Duncan-Marcum, Casey Fletcher, George Gordon, Jr., Carol Green, Jason Griego, Tracy Griego, Shelley Haenze, Carla Haley, Emily Hancock, Elzena Harris, Tyliah Harris, William Haupt, Julie Hawley-Solache, Daniel Hernandez, Kenneth Hickman, Alyssa Hill, Daisy Hollender, Eileen House, Jamie Huff, Erin Hutchinson, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Karen Iudice, Janie Ives, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Angelina Jaramillo, Delia Jimenez, Donna K Johnson, Janeth Jones, Cindy Jordan, Benita Kalb, Margaret King, Kelly Kinoff, Adam Kleinfieldt, Bonnie Larscheid, Santa Lausell, Barbara Lemay, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Linda Lorenzana, Judy Lyons, Leilani Marchand, Joan Marie Nichols, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr, Ryan Adragna, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Veronica Alvarado, James Andrews, Billy Anthony, Shannon Anthony, Adrian Armendano, Alina Mathews, Christopher McAlhaney, Vanessa McAlhaney, Ethel Montgomery, Daishanae Moore, Michael Murphy, Helen Negrette, Betty Ochle, Manuel Ochoa, Jr, Erika Oehm, Kelsey Patsky, Angelica Patterson, DeAmbra Patterson, Nichole Pentland, Melanie Perez, Debra Ann Perricone, Charles Peterie, Stephanie Pierce, Joe Pinter, Angela Polk, Davina Price, Frauke Randles, Wendy Rash, Maria Rice, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Theresa Robinson, Rebecca Roderick, Prince Rogers, Janida Rosado, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Darlene Salaza, Cashmyir Scott, Erin Scott, Amber Nicole Sherban, Kacyee Simmons, Emory Smith, Susan Smith, Shelly Snethen, Marita Sobotka, Jamie Soliz, Scott St. Onge, Samantha Stapleton, Lenyon Starks, Mary Staton, Michael Staton, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Chiquita Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Freddie Lee Stoutmyre, Robert Tarver, Barbara Thompson, Patricia Tippins, William Toner, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Alexa Tymensky, Amanda Tymensky, Adam Tymensky, Jr., Juanita Useman, Carolann Vigil, William Villeneuve, Karl Voehl, Marilyn Watson, Jason White, Kenneth Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Montana Wolthuis, Brittany Yeager, Bernard Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Eileen Avilez, Angela Baldwin, Fitz Bannister, Elizabeth Barrientes, Cheryl Barter, Rose Beam, Misty Beemon, Amy Bell, Jeffrey Bell, John Bell, Santana Bell, Antoinee Benjamin, Antoinee Benjamin, Viola Bennett, William Bergeron, Cassie Bernard, Bobby Berry, Reann Berumen, Daniel Bisping, Tina Blount, Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi, Carlos Bowdre, Rusty Bower, Levi Braun, Beverly Brown, Jessica Burklow, Nathaniel Burklow, Raina Burns, Fawn Caffey, Justin Campbell, Oscar Carrera, Aimee Carroll, Anthony Casaus, Carmen Cass, Christine Cays, Warren Cays, Jose Cerda, Sarah Cerda, Jane Chadima, Kenneth Chavez, Michael Childers, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, James Clark, Jean Clark, Charles Clarke, Amy Clements, Sierra Colkmire-Uthe, Kelley Conners, Kevin Conners, Joanne Cooper, Ginger Cordova, Jessie Cortez, Mallory Cullen, Danielle Currie, Ashley Dahlberg, Benjamin Deis, Jessica Dolan, Rochelle Drinnon, Clifford Dufrain, Kelly Duncan-Marcum, Casey Fletcher, George Gordon, Jr., Carol Green, Jason Griego, Tracy Griego, Shelley Haenze, Carla Haley, Emily Hancock, Elzena Harris, Tyliah Harris, William Haupt, Julie Hawley-Solache, Daniel Hernandez, Kenneth Hickman, Alyssa Hill, Daisy Hollender, Eileen House, Jamie Huff, Erin Hutchinson, Judith Iredale-Boyd, Karen Iudice, Janie Ives, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Angelina Jaramillo, Delia Jimenez, Donna K Johnson, Janeth Jones, Cindy Jordan, Benita Kalb, Margaret King, Kelly Kinoff, Adam Kleinfieldt, Bonnie Larscheid, Santa Lausell, Barbara Lemay, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Linda Lorenzana, Judy Lyons, Leilani Marchand, Joan Marie Nichols, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr, Ryan Adragna, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Veronica Alvarado, James Andrews, Billy Anthony, Shannon Anthony, Adrian Armendano, Alina Mathews, Christopher McAlhaney, Vanessa McAlhaney, Ethel Montgomery, Daishanae Moore, Michael Murphy, Helen Negrette, Betty Ochle, Manuel Ochoa, Jr, Erika Oehm, Kelsey Patsky, Angelica Patterson, DeAmbra Patterson, Nichole Pentland, Melanie Perez, Debra Ann Perricone, Charles Peterie, Stephanie Pierce, Joe Pinter, Angela Polk, Davina Price, Frauke Randles, Wendy Rash, Maria Rice, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Theresa Robinson, Rebecca Roderick, Prince Rogers, Janida Rosado, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Darlene Salaza, Cashmyir Scott, Erin Scott, Amber Nicole Sherban, Kacyee Simmons, Emory Smith, Susan Smith, Shelly Snethen, Marita Sobotka, Jamie Soliz, Scott St. Onge, Samantha Stapleton, Lenyon Starks, Mary Staton, Michael Staton, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Chiquita Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Freddie Lee Stoutmyre, Robert Tarver, Barbara Thompson, Patricia Tippins, William Toner, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Alexa Tymensky, Amanda Tymensky, Adam Tymensky, Jr., Juanita Useman, Carolann Vigil, William Villeneuve, Karl Voehl, Marilyn Watson, Jason White, Kenneth Wilson, Lucy Wilson, Montana Wolthuis, Brittany Yeager, Bernard Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard National Foam, Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sierra Colkmire-Uthe (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Cortez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Benjamin Deis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Duncan-Marcum(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Casey Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carol Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelley Haenze(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Hancock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elzena Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyliah Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Haupt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daisy Hollender(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daisy Hollender(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen House(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eileen House(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorn
May 11, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 4 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01145-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD, FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR***. ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik and Tate James Kunkle. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) Modified to reflect incorrect docket entry on 5/11/2018 (cmadr, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/14/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Jessie Cortez, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Helen Negrette, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6099794)Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Adragna(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Adragna(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Alvarado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Alvarado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Anthony(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Anthony(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Anthony(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Anthony(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eileen Avilez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party A, B.(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party A, B.(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party I. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party I. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party J. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fitz Bannister(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rose Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Beemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinee Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Viola Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bobby Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reann Berumen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Levi Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nathaniel Burklow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raina Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party I. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party I. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party L. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party L. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fawn Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benita Calb(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benita Calb(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Oscar Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Cass(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Warren Cays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jane Chadima(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pet), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sierra Colkmire-UTHE(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sierra Colkmire-UTHE(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelley Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Conners(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eneida Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eneida Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ginger Cordova(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mallory Cullen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roderick et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Haley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berniece Robinson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeth Jones
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Perricone
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Haenze
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Roderick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Cooper
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hawley-Solache
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Tymensky
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cass
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Jr
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Zimmerman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hickman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Stapleton
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ochoa, Jr
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Iudice
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Jimenez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Hancock
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Useman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Nicole Sherban
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Hill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Iredale-Boyd
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tippins
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Alberts-Broch
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Tymensky
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Burklow
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Robinson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Barter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Kalb
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa McAlhaney
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Aiken
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Jordan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fawn Caffey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Aiken
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Haupt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Anthony
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Stoddard
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Patsky
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacyee Simmons
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Bower
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Montgomery
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Beemon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Staton
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brody Stegman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kinoff
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tarver
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Adragna
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolann Vigil
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Baldwin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Cortez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Blount
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Thompson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Colkmire-UTHE
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Perez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Dolan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Linan-Yurivilca
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Stegman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Pinter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janida Rosado
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rucker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Anthony
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAmbra Patterson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Alvarado
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Watson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Deis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frauke Randles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Travis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Salaza
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daishanae Moore
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna K Johnson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Cimino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jackson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Polk
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Lausell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Yeager
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Green
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chisholm
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Campbell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burklow
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Bell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cerda
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Scott
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lyons
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Huff
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raina Burns
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Wolthuis
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina Mathews
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret King
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Pentland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Larscheid
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Griego
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Fletcher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lorenzana
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Carroll
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Patterson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Cays
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Hutchinson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cerda
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Robinson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Currie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cays
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Bowdre
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marita Sobotka
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clark
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Braun
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dahlberg
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Villeneuve
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott St. Onge
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Childers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Staton
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lemay
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Bottcher-Putzi
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Oehm
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Snethen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Jaramillo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Tymensky, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinee Benjamin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitz Bannister
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Price
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reann Berumen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Conners
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason White
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Rogers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Lee Stoutmyre
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Brown
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stegman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rice
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen House
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenyon Starks
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Charles Clarke
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Marie Nichols
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Bernard
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Armendano
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Clark
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiquita Stewart
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pierce
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Berry
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Toner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Hollender
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gordon, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rash
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Chadima
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Drinnon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashmyir Scott
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Bennett
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elzena Harris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Dufrain
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Trujillo
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ochle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Beam
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Andrews
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyliah Harris
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Avilez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Carrera
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Ives
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bisping
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Casaus
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Voehl
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Cullen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Conners
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barrientes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McAlhaney
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Peterie
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Soliz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Cordova
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bergeron
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Negrette
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Griego
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Duncan-Marcum
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Chavez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Marchand
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Kleinfieldt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Clements
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rucker
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?