Gokey et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Laura Knowles, Laura Wiesner, Darrell Bales, Ronald Morgan, Jr., Tara Dorety, Lucinda Lopez, Christine Brown, Michael Krause, Esther Rios, Theresa Wallace, Brandon Robertson, Brian Honneywell, Marsha Bastian, Shirley Anderson, Chelsea Helkey, Brian Ullom, Theresa Anderson, Deena Abeyta, Therese Shelleman, Brandon Reese, John Settles, Karla Honneywell, Crystal Zapien, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Daniel Hernandez, Gary Snipes, James Leach, Antonio Lopez, Regina Chambers, Shane Golliher, Donald Otto, James Williams, Jr, Vicki Ross, Flora Santillanes, Kevin Roberts, Kevin Towner, Arthur Hennessey, Dawn Vlascity, Robin Levy, Joe Cano, Debbie Otto, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Melody Leach, Stephen Dabelko, Genevieve Armstead, Mary Fernandez, Lt Reginald Cooper, Jose Abyeta, Gary Antonio, Bryan Heath, Minh Diep, Alex Leach, Darla Hotchkiss, Linda Slagle, Elizabeth Wimmer, Kristina Golliher, Kevin Williams, Terry Hotchkiss, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Renee Reese, Lois Poulson, Nicole Mages, Onica Beckner, Kierra Helkey, Steve Dixon, Beatrice Hernandez, Lindsey Weaver, Lana Chadbourne, Kaesha Helkey, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Angelita Marie Putnam, John Gokey, Marlene Gaster, Chad Sparks, Vickie Williams, Celco Chavira, Jeremiah Fisher, Jonas Gonzales, Paul Dorety, Erminio Martinez, Patricia Eaton, Rhonda Adams, David Adams, Randall Zortman, Ramsey Knowles, Joseph Welty, James Wooldridge, Donald Hill, Carmen Abyeta, Norma Zortman, Dawn Hill, Rondalynn Carlucci, Lucy Cano, John Simmons, Dorothy Brewington, Mike Honneywell, Cynthia Towner, Carolyn Walden, Curtis Cleveland, Ricky Beckner, Keith Bond, Robert George Putnam, Jessica Wooldridge, Crystal Williams, Harry Wallace, Laura Gibson, John Chadbourne, Sandra Weaver, Chasaity Peoples, Myra Kirkpatrick, Judge James Williams, Mica Ullom, Teresa Simmons, Eloy Santillanes, Ian Jewell, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, Cora Tacluyan, Bianca Bond, Donald Rollins, Brenda Dabelko, James Zajicek, Charlie Scott, James Weaver, Ashley Sparks, Randi Lucero, Kristen Honneywell, Amanda Alexandres, Julia Chavira, Hazel Wallace, Jacquelyn Conklin, Tenisha Williams, Patricia Roberson, Allen Cumm, Brittany Lopez, Adrian Snipes, Robert Anderson, Derrick Wise, Rosa Asencio, Helga Rollins, Eleanor Girnius, Angela Golliher, Betina Magee, Michael Rose, Cory Wooldridge, Sarah Hudler, Susan Graham, Debra Antonio, Gregory Barnes, Ruby Alire, Frank Zapien, Andresita Gonzales, Annamaria Hensley, Martha Snipes, Wayne Patterson, Celsa Morgan, Lisa Settles, Michael Magee, Kirk Vlascity, Ana Tracy and Elizabeth Vlascity
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, National Foam Inc, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03385
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01153, Gokey et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03385-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01153 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers, Regina Chambers, Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, James Williams, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers, Regina Chambers, Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, James Williams, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric
June 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers, Regina Chambers, Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, James Williams, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers(as next friend of D.C.), Regina Chambers(Individually and as), Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 22, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers, Regina Chambers, Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, James Williams, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Hudler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Hudler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ian Jewell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ian Jewell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Myra Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Myra Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Knowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Knowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ramsey Knowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ramsey Knowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Krause(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Krause(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alex Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alex Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Leach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robin Levy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robin Levy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lucin
June 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Hennessey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annamaria Hensley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beatrice Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karla Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristen Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Honneywell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darla Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Hudler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Hudler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ian Jewell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ian Jewell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Kirkpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party
May 17, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deena Abeyta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deena Abeyta(pty:pla), filed by Theresa Anderson, Debra Antonio, Gary Antonio, Genevieve Armstead, Rosa Asencio, Darrell Bales, Gregory Barnes, Marsha Bastian, Onica Beckner, Ricky Beckner, Bianca Bond, Keith Bond, Dorothy Brewington, Christine Brown, Joe Cano, Lucy Cano, Rondalynn Carlucci, Hanna Nicole Chadbourne, John Chadbourne, Kaitlyn Chadbourne, Lana Chadbourne, Regina Chambers(as next friend of D.C.), Regina Chambers(Individually and as), Celco Chavira, Julia Chavira, Curtis Cleveland, Jacquelyn Conklin, Reginald Cooper, Allen Cumm, Kathryn Cumm-Hall, Brenda Dabelko, Stephen Dabelko, Minh Diep, Steve Dixon, Paul Dorety, Tara Dorety, Patricia Eaton, Mary Fernandez, Jeremiah Fisher, Marlene Gaster, Laura Gibson, Eleanor Girnius, John Gokey, Angela Golliher, Kristina Golliher, Shane Golliher, Andresita Gonzales, Jonas Gonzales, Susan Graham, Christine Harbert-Martinez, Bryan Heath, Chelsea Helkey, Kaesha Helkey, Kierra Helkey, Arthur Hennessey, Annamaria Hensley, Beatrice Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Dawn Hill, Donald Hill, Brian Honneywell, Karla Honneywell, Kristen Honneywell, Mike Honneywell, Darla Hotchkiss, Terry Hotchkiss, Sarah Hudler, Ian Jewell, Dennis Kirkpatrick, Myra Kirkpatrick, Laura Knowles, Ramsey Knowles, Michael Krause, Alex Leach, James Leach, Melody Leach, Robin Levy, Antonio Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Lucinda Lopez, Randi Lucero, Betina Magee, Michael Magee, Nicole Mages, Erminio Martinez, Deena Abeyta, Carmen Abyeta, Jose Abyeta, David Adams, Rhonda Adams, Amanda Alexandres, Ruby Alire, Robert Anderson, Shirley Anderson, Celsa Morgan, Ronald Morgan, Jr, Debbie Otto, Donald Otto, Wayne Patterson, Chasaity Peoples, Lois Poulson, Angelita Marie Putnam, Robert George Putnam, Brandon Reese, Renee Reese, Esther Rios, Patricia Roberson, Kevin Roberts, Brandon Robertson, Donald Rollins, Helga Rollins, Michael Rose, Vicki Ross, Eloy Santillanes, Flora Santillanes, Charlie Scott, John Settles, Lisa Settles, Therese Shelleman, John Simmons, Teresa Simmons, Linda Slagle, Adrian Snipes, Gary Snipes, Martha Snipes, Ashley Sparks, Chad Sparks, Cora Tacluyan, Cynthia Towner, Kevin Towner, Ana Tracy, Brian Ullom, Mica Ullom, Dawn Vlascity, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kirk Vlascity, Carolyn Walden, Harry Wallace, Hazel Wallace, Theresa Wallace, James Weaver, Lindsey Weaver, Sandra Weaver, Joseph Welty, Laura Wiesner, Crystal Williams, James Williams, Jr, Kevin Williams, Tenisha Williams, Vickie Williams, Elizabeth Wimmer, Derrick Wise, Cory Wooldridge, James Wooldridge, Jessica Wooldridge, James Zajicek, Crystal Zapien, Frank Zapien, Norma Zortman, Randall Zortman.(McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6100432)Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Abyeta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Abyeta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Abyeta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Abyeta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Alexandres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Alexandres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Alexandres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Alexandres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Alire(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Alire(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Antonio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Armstead(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosa Asencio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marsha Bastian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Onica Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ricky Beckner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bianca Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorothy Brewington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lucy Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rondalynn Carlucci(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hanna Nicole Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaitlyn Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lana Chadbourne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Regina Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Celco Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julia Chavira(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Curtis Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacquelyn Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Reginald Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Allen Cumm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Cumm-Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Dabelko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Minh Diep(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steve Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tara Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Eaton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremiah Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marlene Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eleanor Girnius(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Gokey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristina Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shane Golliher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andresita Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonas Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Harbert-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chelsea Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaesha Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kierra Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Hennesse

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gokey et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Knowles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wiesner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Dorety
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Lopez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brown
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Krause
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Rios
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Wallace
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Robertson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Honneywell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Bastian
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Anderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Helkey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ullom
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Anderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Abeyta
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Shelleman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Reese
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Settles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Honneywell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Zapien
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Snipes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leach
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lopez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Chambers
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Golliher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Otto
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williams, Jr
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Ross
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Santillanes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Roberts
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Towner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Hennessey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Vlascity
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Levy
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Cano
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Otto
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Chadbourne
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Leach
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dabelko
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Armstead
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Fernandez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lt Reginald Cooper
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Abyeta
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Antonio
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Heath
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minh Diep
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Leach
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Hotchkiss
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Slagle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wimmer
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Golliher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hotchkiss
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Harbert-Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Reese
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Poulson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Mages
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onica Beckner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kierra Helkey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Dixon
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Hernandez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Weaver
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Chadbourne
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaesha Helkey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Cumm-Hall
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita Marie Putnam
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gokey
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Gaster
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Sparks
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celco Chavira
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Fisher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Gonzales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dorety
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erminio Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Eaton
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Adams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Adams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Zortman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey Knowles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Welty
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wooldridge
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Abyeta
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Zortman
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hill
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondalynn Carlucci
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Cano
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Simmons
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Brewington
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Honneywell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Towner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Walden
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Cleveland
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Beckner
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bond
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert George Putnam
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Wooldridge
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Wallace
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gibson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Chadbourne
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Weaver
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasaity Peoples
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judge James Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mica Ullom
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Simmons
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Santillanes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Jewell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Nicole Chadbourne
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Tacluyan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Bond
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Rollins
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Dabelko
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Zajicek
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Scott
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weaver
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Sparks
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Lucero
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Honneywell
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Alexandres
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Chavira
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Wallace
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Conklin
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenisha Williams
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Roberson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Cumm
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Lopez
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Snipes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Wise
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Asencio
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helga Rollins
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Girnius
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Golliher
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betina Magee
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rose
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Wooldridge
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hudler
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Graham
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Antonio
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Barnes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Alire
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Zapien
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andresita Gonzales
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamaria Hensley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Snipes
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Patterson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celsa Morgan
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Settles
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Magee
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Vlascity
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Tracy
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Vlascity
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?