Thomas et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Kentrail Walker, Bonnie Riner, Catherine Salazar, Darryl Davis, Michelle Nutter, Samantha (I) Caron, Margaret Kozloski, Angela Cash, Wayne Hall, Kristie (I) Moore, Joyce Stafford, Linda Hunter, Christopher Van Sickle, Ruben Montano, Lynterra Osborn, Jason Esslinger, Heather (I) Melendez, Lynsey Huey, Lisa Cremeans, Kristie Wise Miller, John Dowdy, Phillip Schuler, Celena Mendiola, Elisabeth Jaqua, Donald Mitchell, William Smith, Robert Bell, John Perea, Margot Singer, Mark Siemen, Anthony (I) Dilworth, Lisa Bartlett, Cortnee Jaramillo, David Stewart, Sandra Way, Carolyn Brown, George Peterson, Mark Bassett, Damaris Acevedo, Frederico Segura, Lisa Williams, Margie Crow, Michael Dumon, Anneliese Haskins, John Bennett, Stephen Way, Aurora Santos, William Mohrenweiser, Jr., Dawn Cooper, Raeann (I) Brown, Harvey Reeder, Valerie Clayborn, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Ray Compton, Reggie Peck, Lma Segura, Robert Cremeans, Anthony Dilworth, Alexis Hall, Terri Bell, Margaretta Dykes, Cinthia Stewart, Yvonne Bynum, Gabriel Gonzalez, Angelika Mayo, Patricia Perea, Jordan Booker, Tiffanie Martin, Amanda Caron, Clark Deatherage, Mike Colemon, Raeann Brown, William Huey, Jeremiah Stafford, Justin Clayborn, Katherine Deatherage, Sam Davis, James Frazee, Alan Schwarzman, Paul Sims, Bettejean Bennett, Scherelle Westbrook, Douglas (I) Smith, Conrado Sims, Jr., Lawrence Holmes, Rhonda Joell, Ivory Stewart, Kimberly Jaramillo, Pamela Delaney, Samantha Caron, Raymond Morris, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Katie Stephens, Amanda (I) Caraon, Stephen Samuels, Michelle Searcy, John (I) Dowdy, Jose Colon, Stuart Schwarzman, Angelia Hamilton, Ruth Schwarzman, Sky Walker, Stacey Burciago, Irene Meeks, Kristie Moore, Victor Montano, Monique Marquez, Lisa Frazee, Thomas Randle, Leon Salazar, Nichole Dowling, Sedrick Walker, Herbert Mabie, Anita Church, Angelika List, Myra Montano, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, Raffaella Lamora, Elizabeth Knapp, Brande Nicole Sims, Heather Melendez, Luis Pinales, Michael (I) Booker, Bobby Holmes, Kathie Watson, Tayler Jaramillo, Quenton Riner, Ruth Walker, Jamie Hilsabeck, James Jaramillo, Robin Settle, Mischa Smith, Lisa Archuleta, Roger Singer, Martha Thomas, Amelita Pinales, Michelle (I) Nutter, Ernest Dykes, Thomas Vallejo, Irene Piluso, James Acevedo, Joann Young, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr., Kimberly Price, Shunika (I) Williams, Douglas Smith, William Brown, Michael Booker, Maria Martinez, Jesse Schuler, Deborah Myers, Roxanne Prine, Kenneth Cash, Katie (I) Stephens, Martavus Westbrook, Tyler Brown, Judy Crenshaw, Lisa (I) Bartlett, William Mohrenweiser, Sr., Malyk Williams, Kathy Clark, Kedrick Thomas, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr., Eric Knapp, Annatasha List, Kennedy Pullem, Kathy Weber, Richard Shevock, Karin Ballard, Laurie Vallejo, Ruth (I) Walker, Steven Ealey, Nicholas Moore, Cina Laney, Jennifer Peterson, Joseph Jackson, Dorine Davis, Stacey (I) Burciago, John Morse, Gary Vargo, Robert Mendiola, Shunika Williams, Beverly Vargo, Kristen Belcher, Dave Crenshaw, Brian Prine, Michele Terry, Loretta Wood, Frank Wilmoth, Tony Settle, Shirley Montano, Christy Ott and Diana Russell
Defendant: Chemguard, Kidde PLC, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and 3M Company, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv03389
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01156, Thomas et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03389-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01156. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01156 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivit
June 22, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Kozloski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Kozloski(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raffaella Lamora(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raffaella Lamora(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cina Laney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cina Laney(p
June 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 22, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Kozloski(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Kozloski(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raffaella Lamora(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raffaella Lamora(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cina Laney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cina Laney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelika List(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelika List(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annatasha List(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annatasha List(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monique Marquez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monique Marquez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffanie Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffanie Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maria Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael (I) Booker (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raeann (I) Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stacey (I) Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Caraon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samantha (I) Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony (I) Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John (I) Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tayler Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Joell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party
May 17, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael (I) Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann (I) Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey (I) Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda (I) Caraon, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha (I) Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony (I) Dilworth, John Dowdy, John (I) Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather (I) Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa (I) Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie (I) Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle (I) Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado (I) Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Douglas (I) Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie (I) Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie (I) Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth (I) Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika (I) Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Kristie (I) Wise Miller, Loretta Wood, Joann Young.(Longo, Stephen) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 3 ERRATA re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Damaris Acevedo, James Acevedo, Lisa Archuleta, Karin Ballard, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa Bartlett, Lisa Bartlett, Mark Bassett, Kristen Belcher, Robert Bell, Terri Bell, Bettejean Bennett, John Bennett, Jordan Booker, Michael Booker, Michael Booker, Carolyn Brown, Raeann Brown, Raeann Brown, Tyler Brown, William Brown, Stacey Burciago, Stacey Burciago, Yvonne Bynum, Amanda Caron, Amanda Caron, Samantha Caron, Samantha Caron, Angela Cash, Kenneth Cash, Anita Church, Kathy Clark, Justin Clayborn, Valerie Clayborn, Mike Colemon, Jose Colon, Ray Compton, Dawn Cooper, Lisa Cremeans, Robert Cremeans, Dave Crenshaw, Judy Crenshaw, Margie Crow, Darryl Davis, Dorine Davis, Sam Davis, Clark Deatherage, Katherine Deatherage, Pamela Delaney, Anthony Dilworth, Anthony Dilworth, John Dowdy, John Dowdy, Nichole Dowling, Michael Dumon, Ernest Dykes, Margaretta Dykes, Steven Ealey, Jason Esslinger, James Frazee, Lisa Frazee, Gabriel Gonzalez, Alexis Hall, Wayne Hall, Angelia Hamilton, Anneliese Haskins, Jamie Hilsabeck, Bobby Holmes, Lawrence Holmes, Lynsey Huey, William Huey, Linda Hunter, Joseph Jackson, Elisabeth Jaqua, Cortnee Jaramillo, James Jaramillo, Kimberly Jaramillo, Tayler Jaramillo, Rhonda Joell, Elizabeth Knapp, Eric Knapp, Margaret Kozloski, Raffaella Lamora, Cina Laney, Angelika List, Annatasha List, Herbert Mabie, Monique Marquez, Tiffanie Martin, Maria Martinez, Angelika Mayo, Irene Meeks, Heather Melendez, Heather Melendez, Celena Mendiola, Robert Mendiola, Kristie Wise Miller, Kristie Wise Miller, Kristie Wise Miller, Kristie Wise Miller, Donald Mitchell, William Mohrenweiser, Sr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, William Mohrenweiser, Jr, Myra Montano, Ruben Montano, Shirley Montano, Victor Montano, Kristie Moore, Kristie Moore, Nicholas Moore, Raymond Morris, Phyllis Morris-Samuels, John Morse, Deborah Myers, Michelle Nutter, Michelle Nutter, Michelle Nutter, Lynterra Osborn, Christy Ott, Reggie Peck, John Perea, Patricia Perea, George Peterson, Jennifer Peterson, Irene Piluso, Amelita Pinales, Luis Pinales, Kimberly Price, Brian Prine, Roxanne Prine, Kennedy Pullem, Thomas Randle, Harvey Reeder, Bonnie Riner, Quenton Riner, Diana Russell, Catherine Salazar, Leon Salazar, Stephen Samuels, Aurora Santos, Jesse Schuler, Phillip Schuler, Alan Schwarzman, Ruth Schwarzman, Stuart Schwarzman, Michelle Searcy, Frederico Segura, Lma Segura, Robin Settle, Tony Settle, Richard Shevock, Mark Siemen, Brande Nicole Sims, Conrado Sims, Jr, Conrado Sims, Jr, Paul Sims, Margot Singer, Roger Singer, Douglas Smith, Douglas Smith, Mischa Smith, William Smith, Jeremiah Stafford, Joyce Stafford, Katie Stephens, Katie Stephens, Katie Stephens, Katie Stephens, Cinthia Stewart, David Stewart, Ivory Stewart, Michele Terry, Kedrick Thomas, Martha Thomas, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie Vallejo, Laurie Vallejo, Thomas Vallejo, Christopher Van Sickle, Beverly Vargo, Gary Vargo, Kentrail Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth Walker, Ruth Walker, Sedrick Walker, Sky Walker, Kathie Watson, Sandra Way, Stephen Way, Kathy Weber, Martavus Westbrook, Scherelle Westbrook, Lisa Williams, Malyk Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika Williams, Shunika Williams, Frank Wilmoth, Loretta Wood, Joann Young. (Longo, Stephen) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6100456)Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Damaris Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Damaris Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Karin Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Karin Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Mark Bassett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Mark Bassett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kristen Belcher(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kristen Belcher(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Robert Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Robert Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Terri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Bettejean Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jordan Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Booker(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Carolyn Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Raeann Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Tyler Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party William Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Stacey Burciago(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Yvonne Bynum(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Amanda Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Samantha Caron(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Angela Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kenneth Cash(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anita Church(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kathy Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Justin Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Valerie Clayborn(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Mike Colemon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jose Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Ray Compton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Robert Cremeans(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dave Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Judy Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Margie Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Darryl Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Dorine Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Sam Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Clark Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Katherine Deatherage(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Pamela Delaney(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anthony Dilworth(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party John Dowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Nichole Dowling(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Michael Dumon(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Ernest Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Margaretta Dykes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Steven Ealey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jason Esslinger(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lisa Frazee(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Gabriel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Alexis Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Wayne Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Angelia Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Anneliese Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Jamie Hilsabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Bobby Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lawrence Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Lynsey Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party William Huey(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Linda Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Elisabeth Jaqua(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Cortnee Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party James Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kimberly Jaramillo(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen A. Longo added to party Kimberly Jar

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentrail Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Riner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Salazar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nutter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha (I) Caron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Kozloski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie (I) Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Stafford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hunter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Van Sickle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Montano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynterra Osborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Esslinger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather (I) Melendez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynsey Huey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Cremeans
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Wise Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dowdy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Schuler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celena Mendiola
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Jaqua
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Perea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margot Singer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Siemen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony (I) Dilworth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bartlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortnee Jaramillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stewart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Way
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bassett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Acevedo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederico Segura
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Crow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dumon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anneliese Haskins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bennett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Way
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Santos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mohrenweiser, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeann (I) Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Reeder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Clayborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie (I) Wise Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Compton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Peck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lma Segura
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cremeans
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dilworth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaretta Dykes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia Stewart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Bynum
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelika Mayo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Perea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Booker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Caron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Deatherage
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Colemon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeann Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Huey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Stafford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Clayborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Deatherage
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Frazee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Schwarzman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettejean Bennett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scherelle Westbrook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas (I) Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrado Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Holmes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Joell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivory Stewart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jaramillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Delaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Caron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie (I) Vallejo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Stephens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Caraon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Samuels
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Searcy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John (I) Dowdy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Colon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Schwarzman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Schwarzman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Burciago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Meeks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Montano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Marquez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Frazee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Randle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Salazar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Dowling
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedrick Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mabie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Church
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelika List
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Montano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Morris-Samuels
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffaella Lamora
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Knapp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brande Nicole Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Melendez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Pinales
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael (I) Booker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Holmes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathie Watson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayler Jaramillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quenton Riner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Hilsabeck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jaramillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Settle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mischa Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Archuleta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Singer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelita Pinales
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Nutter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Dykes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vallejo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Piluso
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Acevedo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Young
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William (I) Mohrenweiser, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shunika (I) Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Booker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Schuler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Myers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Prine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie (I) Stephens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martavus Westbrook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Crenshaw
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) Bartlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mohrenweiser, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malyk Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kedrick Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrado (I) Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Knapp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annatasha List
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Pullem
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Weber
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Shevock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Ballard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Vallejo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth (I) Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ealey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cina Laney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorine Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey (I) Burciago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morse
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Vargo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mendiola
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shunika Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Vargo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Belcher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Crenshaw
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Prine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Terry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Wood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Wilmoth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Settle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Montano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Ott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Russell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen A. Longo
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |