Barker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez, Anthony Reyes, Benny Wilkerson, Holly Meacham, Raymond Gibbons, Rosalyn Griswold, Michael Degennaro, Edward Wheeler, Erin Lair-Douchinsky, Naomi Decker Montoya, David Chaney, Sarah McKinney, Myron Kastner, Jr, Steven Jackson, Randy Menegatti, Delano Martinez, Debra Noller, Sonja Jarvis, Alexander Clements, Todd Orr, Garnet Fisher, James Marucci, Christina Perez-Giordano, Allen Watters, Jennifer Carrick, Pornprasong Bergman, Loretta Griffiths, April Kubik, Brain McIntyre, Quinda Smith, Richard Rocha, Ralph Kamsch, Devin Joy, Kelsey Patsky, George Garner, III, Richard Lopez, Rose Machuca, Aubrey Bell, Stephen Urbany, Elisa Aguirre, Tammi Blanscet, James (I) Marucci, Raymond Gorman II, Krystal Fortner, Daniel Johnson, Ceder Steen, Rosalie Thompson, Jonathan Allen, Jason Kubik, Elfriede Geiger, Phillip Langvardt, Gisella Cansino, Kimberly Hale, Wesley Sueverkruebbe, Pamela Langvardt, Robert Moore, George Frazier, Michael Schlafer, Charles Smith, Suzanne Bolden, Phyllis Philip, John Geiger, Jeri Howells, Denitas Frye, William Brooks, Debi Fuquea, Raymundo Valdez, Jr, Jared Mines, Anita Morrison, Cedric Brown, Sonya Jones, Roosevelt Hines Jr., Shannon Shrewsbury, Louane Brooks, Dennis Joy, Christopher Sharpnack, LuAnn Braun, Stephen Carter, Natalie Bazilewich, Patricia Chaney, Cathryn Lopez, Joleen Gorman, Jamika Green, Julian James, Mervyn Mallicote, Michelle McClary, Alfred Horton, Judy Gervais, Billy Latham, Sylvia Smith, Rhonda Gershmel, Omar Jones, Miranda Deloach, Patsy Urbany, Derek Powell, Sharon Clements, Jessie Dillon, Charles Valenzuela, Sr., Rosemarie Igou, Jason White, Ariana Klemick, Joette Dill, Chris Clements, Robert Norton, Steve Noller, Lucinda Mallicote, Augistine Perez, Michael Selix, Ute Craft, Douglas Hirdler, David Conley, Carl Williams, Zelda Morris, Bernadino Ibanez, Paul Baker, Steve Lyman, Mario Herrera, Marvine Mascotti, Tammi (I) Blanscet, Wendy Fortner, Orian Flournoy, Jona Martin, Jennifer (I) Carrick, Derella Lenz, David Titze, Brian Crocker, Christopher Martin, Dana Sharpnack, Judith Sharpnack, William Bell, Mikel Yarmon, Karen Sandvik, Amanda Dematto, Selena Jones, Gabrielle Barker, Joe Baca, Gabriele Luedeke, Gerald Boothroyd, Lori Williams, Rebecca Rains, Jewell Hardesty, Ryan Carlson, Kelvin Mathis and Delbert Fleetwood
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, National Foam Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03392
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01161, Barker et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03392-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01161. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01161 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Pornprasong Bergman, Tammi Blanscet, Tammi (I) Blanscet, Suzanne Bolden, Gerald Boothroyd, LuAnn Braun, Louane Brooks, William Brooks, Cedric Brown, Gisella Cansino, Ryan Carlson, Jennifer Carrick, Jennifer (I) Carrick, Stephen Carter, David Chaney, Patricia Chaney, Alexander Clements, Chris Clements, Sharon Clements, David Conley, Ute Craft, Brian Crocker, Naomi Decker Montoya, Michael Degennaro, Miranda Deloach, Amanda Dematto, Joette Dill, Jessie Dillon, Garnet Fisher, Delbert Fleetwood, Orian Flournoy, Krystal Fortner, Wendy Fortner, George Frazier, Denitas Frye, Debi Fuquea, George Garner, III, Elfriede Geiger, John Geiger, Rhonda Gershmel, Judy Gervais, Raymond Gibbons, Joleen Gorman, Raymond Gorman II, Jamika Green, Loretta Griffiths, Rosalyn Griswold, Kimberly Hale, Jewell Hardesty, Mario Herrera, Roosevelt Hines Jr., Douglas Hirdler, Alfred Horton, Jeri Howells, Bernadino Ibanez, Rosemarie Igou, Steven Jackson, Julian James, Sonja Jarvis, Daniel Johnson, Omar Jones, Selena Jones, Sonya Jones, Dennis Joy, Devin Joy, Ralph Kamsch, Myron Kastner, Jr, Ariana Klemick, April Kubik, Jason Kubik, Erin Lair-Douchinsky, Pamela Langvardt, Phillip Langvardt, Billy Latham, Derella Lenz, Cathryn Lopez, Richard Lopez, Gabriele Luedeke, Steve Lyman, Rose Machuca, Lucinda Mallicote, Mervyn Mallicote, Christopher Martin, Jona Martin, Delano Martinez, Elisa Aguirre, Jonathan Allen, Joe Baca, Paul Baker, Gabrielle Barker, Natalie Bazilewich, Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez, Aubrey Bell, William Bell, James Marucci, James (I) Marucci, Marvine Mascotti, Kelvin Mathis, Michelle McClary, Brain McIntyre, Sarah McKinney, Holly Meacham, Randy Menegatti, Jared Mines, Robert Moore, Zelda Morris, Anita Morrison, Debra Noller, Steve Noller, Robert Norton, Todd Orr, Kelsey Patsky, Augistine Perez, Christina Perez-Giordano, Phyllis Philip, Derek Powell, Rebecca Rains, Anthony Reyes, Richard Rocha, Karen Sandvik, Michael Schlafer, Michael Selix, Christopher Sharpnack, Dana Sharpnack, Judith Sharpnack, Shannon Shrewsbury, Charles Smith, Quinda Smith, Sylvia Smith, Ceder Steen, Wesley Sueverkruebbe, Rosalie Thompson, David Titze, Patsy Urbany, Stephen Urbany, Raymundo Valdez, Jr, Charles Valenzuela, Sr, Allen Watters, Edward Wheeler, Jason White, Benny Wilkerson, Carl Williams, Lori Williams, Mikel Yarmon. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Pornprasong Bergman, Tammi Blanscet, Tammi (I) Blanscet, Suzanne Bolden, Gerald Boothroyd, LuAnn Braun, Louane Brooks, William Brooks, Cedric Brown, Gisella Cansino, Ryan Carlson, Jennifer Carrick, Jennifer (I) Carrick, Stephen Carter, David Chaney, Patricia Chaney, Alexander Clements, Chris Clements, Sharon Clements, David Conley, Ute Craft, Brian Crocker, Naomi Decker Montoya, Michael Degennaro, Miranda Deloach, Amanda Dematto, Joette Dill, Jessie Dillon, Garnet Fisher, Delbert Fleetwood, Orian Flournoy, Krystal Fortner, Wendy Fortner, George Frazier, Denitas Frye, Debi Fuquea, George Garner, III, Elfriede Geiger, John Geiger, Rhonda Gershmel, Judy Gervais, Raymond Gibbons, Joleen Gorman, Raymond Gorman II, Jamika Green, Loretta Griffiths, Rosalyn Griswold, Kimberly Hale, Jewell Hardesty, Mario Herrera, Roosevelt Hines Jr., Douglas Hirdler, Alfred Horton, Jeri Howells, Bernadino Ibanez, Rosemarie Igou, Steven Jackson, Julian James, Sonja Jarvis, Daniel Johnson, Omar Jones, Selena Jones, Sonya Jones, Dennis Joy, Devin Joy, Ralph Kamsch, Myron Kastner, Jr, Ariana Klemick, April Kubik, Jason Kubik, Erin Lair-Douchinsky, Pamela Langvardt, Phillip Langvardt, Billy Latham, Derella Lenz, Cathryn Lopez, Richard Lopez, Gabriele Luedeke, Steve Lyman, Rose Machuca, Lucinda Mallicote, Mervyn Mallicote, Christopher Martin, Jona Martin, Delano Martinez, Elisa Aguirre, Jonathan Allen, Joe Baca, Paul Baker, Gabrielle Barker, Natalie Bazilewich, Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez, Aubrey Bell, William Bell, James Marucci, James (I) Marucci, Marvine Mascotti, Kelvin Mathis, Michelle McClary, Brain McIntyre, Sarah McKinney, Holly Meacham, Randy Menegatti, Jared Mines, Robert Moore, Zelda Morris, Anita Morrison, Debra Noller, Steve Noller, Robert Norton, Todd Orr, Kelsey Patsky, Augistine Perez, Christina Perez-Giordano, Phyllis Philip, Derek Powell, Rebecca Rains, Anthony Reyes, Richard Rocha, Karen Sandvik, Michael Schlafer, Michael Selix, Christopher Sharpnack, Dana Sharpnack, Judith Sharpnack, Shannon Shrewsbury, Charles Smith, Quinda Smith, Sylvia Smith, Ceder Steen, Wesley Sueverkruebbe, Rosalie Thompson, David Titze, Patsy Urbany, Stephen Urbany, Raymundo Valdez, Jr, Charles Valenzuela, Sr, Allen Watters, Edward Wheeler, Jason White, Benny Wilkerson, Carl Williams, Lori Williams, Mikel Yarmon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ralph Kamsch(p
June 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Latham(pty:pla), Attorn
June 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Latham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Billy Latham(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derella Lenz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derella Lenz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cathryn Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cathryn Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriele Luedeke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriele Luedeke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Lyman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rose Machuca(pt
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC by Plaintiffs Pornprasong Bergman, Tammi Blanscet, Tammi (I) Blanscet, Suzanne Bolden, Gerald Boothroyd, LuAnn Braun, Louane Brooks, William Brooks, Cedric Brown, Gisella Cansino, Ryan Carlson, Jennifer Carrick, Jennifer (I) Carrick, Stephen Carter, David Chaney, Patricia Chaney, Alexander Clements, Chris Clements, Sharon Clements, David Conley, Ute Craft, Brian Crocker, Naomi Decker Montoya, Michael Degennaro, Miranda Deloach, Amanda Dematto, Joette Dill, Jessie Dillon, Garnet Fisher, Delbert Fleetwood, Orian Flournoy, Krystal Fortner, Wendy Fortner, George Frazier, Denitas Frye, Debi Fuquea, George Garner, III, Elfriede Geiger, John Geiger, Rhonda Gershmel, Judy Gervais, Raymond Gibbons, Joleen Gorman, Raymond Gorman II, Jamika Green, Loretta Griffiths, Rosalyn Griswold, Kimberly Hale, Jewell Hardesty, Mario Herrera, Roosevelt Hines Jr., Douglas Hirdler, Alfred Horton, Jeri Howells, Bernadino Ibanez, Rosemarie Igou, Steven Jackson, Julian James, Sonja Jarvis, Daniel Johnson, Omar Jones, Selena Jones, Sonya Jones, Dennis Joy, Devin Joy, Ralph Kamsch, Myron Kastner, Jr, Ariana Klemick, April Kubik, Jason Kubik, Erin Lair-Douchinsky, Pamela Langvardt, Phillip Langvardt, Billy Latham, Derella Lenz, Cathryn Lopez, Richard Lopez, Gabriele Luedeke, Steve Lyman, Rose Machuca, Lucinda Mallicote, Mervyn Mallicote, Christopher Martin, Jona Martin, Delano Martinez, Elisa Aguirre, Jonathan Allen, Joe Baca, Paul Baker, Gabrielle Barker, Natalie Bazilewich, Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez, Aubrey Bell, William Bell, James Marucci, James (I) Marucci, Marvine Mascotti, Kelvin Mathis, Michelle McClary, Brain McIntyre, Sarah McKinney, Holly Meacham, Randy Menegatti, Jared Mines, Robert Moore, Zelda Morris, Anita Morrison, Debra Noller, Steve Noller, Robert Norton, Todd Orr, Kelsey Patsky, Augistine Perez, Christina Perez-Giordano, Phyllis Philip, Derek Powell, Rebecca Rains, Anthony Reyes, Richard Rocha, Karen Sandvik, Michael Schlafer, Michael Selix, Christopher Sharpnack, Dana Sharpnack, Judith Sharpnack, Shannon Shrewsbury, Charles Smith, Quinda Smith, Sylvia Smith, Ceder Steen, Wesley Sueverkruebbe, Rosalie Thompson, David Titze, Patsy Urbany, Stephen Urbany, Raymundo Valdez, Jr, Charles Valenzuela, Sr, Allen Watters, Edward Wheeler, Jason White, Benny Wilkerson, Carl Williams, Lori Williams, Mikel Yarmon. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patric
June 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiffs Pornprasong Bergman, Tammi Blanscet, Tammi (I) Blanscet, Suzanne Bolden, Gerald Boothroyd, LuAnn Braun, Louane Brooks, William Brooks, Cedric Brown, Gisella Cansino, Ryan Carlson, Jennifer Carrick, Jennifer (I) Carrick, Stephen Carter, David Chaney, Patricia Chaney, Alexander Clements, Chris Clements, Sharon Clements, David Conley, Ute Craft, Brian Crocker, Naomi Decker Montoya, Michael Degennaro, Miranda Deloach, Amanda Dematto, Joette Dill, Jessie Dillon, Garnet Fisher, Delbert Fleetwood, Orian Flournoy, Krystal Fortner, Wendy Fortner, George Frazier, Denitas Frye, Debi Fuquea, George Garner, III, Elfriede Geiger, John Geiger, Rhonda Gershmel, Judy Gervais, Raymond Gibbons, Joleen Gorman, Raymond Gorman II, Jamika Green, Loretta Griffiths, Rosalyn Griswold, Kimberly Hale, Jewell Hardesty, Mario Herrera, Roosevelt Hines Jr., Douglas Hirdler, Alfred Horton, Jeri Howells, Bernadino Ibanez, Rosemarie Igou, Steven Jackson, Julian James, Sonja Jarvis, Daniel Johnson, Omar Jones, Selena Jones, Sonya Jones, Dennis Joy, Devin Joy, Ralph Kamsch, Myron Kastner, Jr, Ariana Klemick, April Kubik, Jason Kubik, Erin Lair-Douchinsky, Pamela Langvardt, Phillip Langvardt, Billy Latham, Derella Lenz, Cathryn Lopez, Richard Lopez, Gabriele Luedeke, Steve Lyman, Rose Machuca, Lucinda Mallicote, Mervyn Mallicote, Christopher Martin, Jona Martin, Delano Martinez, Elisa Aguirre, Jonathan Allen, Joe Baca, Paul Baker, Gabrielle Barker, Natalie Bazilewich, Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez, Aubrey Bell, William Bell, James Marucci, James (I) Marucci, Marvine Mascotti, Kelvin Mathis, Michelle McClary, Brain McIntyre, Sarah McKinney, Holly Meacham, Randy Menegatti, Jared Mines, Robert Moore, Zelda Morris, Anita Morrison, Debra Noller, Steve Noller, Robert Norton, Todd Orr, Kelsey Patsky, Augistine Perez, Christina Perez-Giordano, Phyllis Philip, Derek Powell, Rebecca Rains, Anthony Reyes, Richard Rocha, Karen Sandvik, Michael Schlafer, Michael Selix, Christopher Sharpnack, Dana Sharpnack, Judith Sharpnack, Shannon Shrewsbury, Charles Smith, Quinda Smith, Sylvia Smith, Ceder Steen, Wesley Sueverkruebbe, Rosalie Thompson, David Titze, Patsy Urbany, Stephen Urbany, Raymundo Valdez, Jr, Charles Valenzuela, Sr, Allen Watters, Edward Wheeler, Jason White, Benny Wilkerson, Carl Williams, Lori Williams, Mikel Yarmon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard National Foam Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammi (I) Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer (I) Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Naomi Decker Montoya(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosemarie Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Omar Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Selena Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sonya Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dennis Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Devin Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ralph Kamsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Myron Kastner, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ariana Klemick(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erin Lair-Douchinsky(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Langvardt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Latham(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Latham(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derella Lenz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derella Lenz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cathryn Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cathryn Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gabriele Luedeke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gabriele Luedeke(pty:pl
May 15, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01161-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorneyPatrick J. Lanciotti, Hunter J. Shkolnik.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard National Foam Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIRE & SECURITY, kidde-fewnwal, INC., (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6100935)Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisa Aguirre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisa Aguirre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party T. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party T. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Baca(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Baca(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabrielle Barker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabrielle Barker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalie Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aubrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aubrey Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pornprasong Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammi Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Suzanne Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Boothroyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party LuAnn Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louane Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cedric Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gisella Cansino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Carrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Chaney(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexander Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ute Craft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Crocker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Naomi Decker (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Naomi Decker (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Degennaro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miranda Deloach(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Dematto(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joette Dill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garnet Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delbert Fleetwood(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Orian Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Krystal Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wendy Fortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denitas Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debi Fuquea(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party George Garner, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elfriede Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Gervais(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joleen Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Gorman II(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamika Green(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Loretta Griffiths(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jewell Hardesty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Roosevelt Hines Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hirdler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeri Howells(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernadino Ibanez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sonja Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domitilia Beatrice Ortiz-Valdez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Reyes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Meacham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Gibbons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Griswold
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Degennaro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Lair-Douchinsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Decker Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah McKinney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Kastner, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Menegatti
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delano Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Noller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Jarvis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Orr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnet Fisher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marucci
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perez-Giordano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Watters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Carrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pornprasong Bergman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Griffiths
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Kubik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brain McIntyre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinda Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Kamsch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Joy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Patsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Garner, III
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Machuca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Urbany
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Aguirre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi Blanscet
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James (I) Marucci
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Gorman II
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Fortner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceder Steen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Allen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kubik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elfriede Geiger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Langvardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisella Cansino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Sueverkruebbe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Langvardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Frazier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schlafer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Bolden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Philip
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Geiger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Howells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denitas Frye
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brooks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debi Fuquea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Valdez, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Mines
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Hines Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Shrewsbury
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louane Brooks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sharpnack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LuAnn Braun
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Bazilewich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathryn Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joleen Gorman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamika Green
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mervyn Mallicote
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McClary
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Horton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Gervais
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Latham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gershmel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Deloach
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Urbany
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Powell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Dillon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Valenzuela, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Igou
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Klemick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joette Dill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Norton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Noller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Mallicote
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augistine Perez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Selix
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Craft
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hirdler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelda Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadino Ibanez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Lyman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Herrera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvine Mascotti
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi (I) Blanscet
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Fortner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orian Flournoy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jona Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer (I) Carrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derella Lenz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Titze
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Crocker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Sharpnack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sharpnack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Yarmon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sandvik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Dematto
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Barker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Baca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele Luedeke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Boothroyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rains
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewell Hardesty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Carlson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Mathis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Fleetwood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?