Hicks et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Petra Higgs, Regina (I) Hull, Wilfred Berthiaume, Emari Lambert, Rebecca (I) Wilson, Sylvia (I) Smith, Jennifer Osborn, Candace Kurth, Jerome (I) Depner, Carolyn Parker, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Daniel Hamilton, Cynthia Griffin, Adam Barela, Chevon (I) Patrick, Alexander Yu, Linda Craig, April Bowman, Rowena Scott, Lawrence Martinez, Robert Croft, Gregory A Nichols, LUCAS MARTINEZ, Anna Higgs, Laura Scott, Antoine Lambert, Carl (I) Brickell, Candace Avina Martinez, Terry (I) Rowland, Evelyn Davila, Theresa Martinez, Terry Rowland, Jerome Depner, Carol Ochoa, James Tuggle, Jennifer Jinkins, Timothy Scott, Julian (I) Soliz, Scott Mathison, Randall Hamilton, Kelsey Patsky, Robert Sauerbrey, Robert Czosnyka, Joshua Hicks, Mark Trujillo, Chong Frazier, Dawn Harris, Kristie (I) Barnes, Michael Rotondo, Marqual Lambert, Abby VanHouten, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Micahel Endres, Glenda Lux, Cassandra Gordon, Edward Vigil, Willie Gibbons, Rebecca Collier, David Lux, Frank Craig, Judy Campbell, Scott Gaster, Michelle Romero, Georgia Bates, Harold Hitt, Carl Brickell, Nicole (I) Lorenzana, Heather (I) Lindblad, Regina Hull, Jonathan Martinez, Steven Collier, Alejandro Franco, Kristie Valentino, Pok Rowland, Carrie Gordon, Silvia Vigil, Eleonore Berthiaume, Victoria Goodell, Joshua (I) Hicks, Cristina Perez-Giordano, Thomas Chisholm, Jessie Martin, Tina Kieselstein, Norma Van Buskirk, Gilford Sorens, Ricky VonSprecken, James VanHouten, Heather Lindblad, Heather Varano, Leonardo May, Cheri Strahan, Lafayette Brady, Bobby Tomlin, Debray Scott, Burton Evans, Raymond Phelps, Candace (I) Avina Martinez, Christopher (I) Varano, John Wick, Wayne Mazari, Avery Scott, Kimberly Rowland, Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano, Matthew (I) Erickson, Cathy Johnson, Brittney Hamilton, Ashley Findlay, Donald Vigil, Kelsey (I) Patsky, Diana Wing, Marjorie Tuggle, Barbara Newsom, Rebecca Wilson, Benjamin Frahm, Caron VonSprecken, Robert Christian, Linda Hargis, Providence Jaskar, Christine Uebel, Sylvia Smith, April Cowley, David Montoya, Susan Learned, Julia Craig, John Cryster, Ricky Tweed, Martha Taylor, Chris Pandolfi, Dominick Anderson, Frances Vigil, Nicole Anderson, Ellenlore Wick, Dora Fernandez, Natalia Erickson, Colin Quinn, Christopher Varano, Julian Soliz, Marie Lavasseur, Lei-Lani (I) Barela, Shurman Gardner, Oneil Lavasseur, Jacob Dunton, Terri Wisniewski, Dorthy Laster, Karen Martinez, Randi Lucero, Kevin Boyd, Gary Youtz, Chevon Patrick, Arlene Lambert, Chris Findlay, Jennifer (I) Jinkins, Rebecca (I) Collier, Ronald Wheeler, Candace Martinez, David Mondragon, Sr., Evelyn (I) Davila, Jacky Anderson, Skye Jaskar, Dora (I) Fernandez, Lei-Lani Barela, Un Suk Dufrain, Thomas (I) Chisholm, Kristie Barnes, Leona Hansen, Troy Romero, Harold Bates, Chris (I) Findlay, Natalia (I) Erickson, Chris (I) Pandolfi, Tony Korte, Tommy Barter, Bruce Gershmel, Thomas Hansen, Jeremy Giordano, Warren Pickerel, Robert Neuzil, Shanell (I) Thompson, Donald Bowman, Jr., Matthew Erickson, Joshua Pierce, Bryce Jaskar, Robyn Palmer, Derek Susa, Nicole Lorenzana, Emily Collier, Eva Hamilton, Shelly Fly, Mark (I) Trujillo, Dean Cimino, Maxine Hanline, April (I) Cowley, Shanell Thompson and Amy Clements
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The and Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03393
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 Any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to the AFFF MDL proceedings may file his or her case directly in the District of South Carolina, in accordance with Paragraphs 25 through 29 of CMO 3. The shell case number for cases related to the AFFF MDL is 2:19-av-55555. Please file the new complaint into this shell case and file as attachments Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories and a Summons (to be issued). The complaint will be assigned a new civil action number. Civil cover sheets need not be filed for cases directly filed in the AFFF MDL. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 63 et al (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Reason: Transcript will be refiled in master docket only per ECF technical issue re access Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Organization of Defendants' Counsel, Additional Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Committee Members, Rights and Privileges Preserved, Attorneys' Time and Expense Records, Monthly Status Conferences, Motions Practice, Status Conference on April 5, 2019 (see prior NOTICE at Dkt. No. 30), Other Matters. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG and spread in error to all member cases) Reason: Motion to appoint defense counsel removed and submitted to Chambers, per Chambers. Motion and all related deadlines to be removed from mn and all cv member cases. Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2019 (Response due date of original filing: 3/29/2019 terminated) Clerk's Notice Reminder: Per CMO No. 1, Filing, documents which relate to All Actions shall be filed and docketed in the master case only; when ECF prompts with the question, "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" counsel should choose "No." Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01163, Hicks et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03393-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01163. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01163 RBJ, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Georgia Bates, Harold Bates, Eleonore Berthiaume, Wilfred Berthiaume, April Bowman, Donald Bowman, Jr., Kevin Boyd, Lafayette Brady, Carl Brickell, Carl (I) Brickell, Judy Campbell, Thomas Chisholm, Thomas (I) Chisholm, Robert Christian, Dean Cimino, Amy Clements, Emily Collier, Rebecca Collier, Rebecca (I) Collier, Steven Collier, April Cowley, April (I) Cowley, Frank Craig, Julia Craig, Linda Craig, Robert Croft, John Cryster, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Robert Czosnyka, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jerome Depner, Jerome (I) Depner, Un Suk Dufrain, Jacob Dunton, Micahel Endres, Matthew Erickson, Natalia Erickson, Natalia (I) Erickson, Matthew (I) Erickson, Burton Evans, Dora Fernandez, Dora (I) Fernandez, Ashley Findlay, Chris Findlay, Chris (I) Findlay, Shelly Fly, Benjamin Frahm, Alejandro Franco, Chong Frazier, Shurman Gardner, Scott Gaster, Bruce Gershmel, Willie Gibbons, Jeremy Giordano, Victoria Goodell, Carrie Gordon, Cassandra Gordon, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Cynthia Griffin, Brittney Hamilton, Daniel Hamilton, Eva Hamilton, Randall Hamilton, Maxine Hanline, Leona Hansen, Thomas Hansen, Linda Hargis, Dawn Harris, Joshua Hicks, Joshua (I) Hicks, Anna Higgs, Petra Higgs, Harold Hitt, Regina Hull, Regina (I) Hull, Bryce Jaskar, Providence Jaskar, Skye Jaskar, Jennifer Jinkins, Jennifer (I) Jinkins, Cathy Johnson, Tina Kieselstein, Tony Korte, Candace Kurth, Antoine Lambert, Arlene Lambert, Emari Lambert, Marqual Lambert, Dorthy Laster, Marie Lavasseur, Oneil Lavasseur, Susan Learned, Heather Lindblad, Heather (I) Lindblad, Nicole Lorenzana, Nicole (I) Lorenzana, Randi Lucero, David Lux, Glenda Lux, Jessie Martin, Candace Avina Martinez, Candace Martinez, Candace (I) Avina Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Dominick Anderson, Jacky Anderson, Nicole Anderson, Adam Barela, Lei-Lani Barela, Lei-Lani (I) Barela, Kristie Barnes, Kristie (I) Barnes, Tommy Barter, Karen Martinez, Lawrence Martinez, Lucas Martinez, Theresa Martinez, Scott Mathison, Leonardo May, Wayne Mazari, David Mondragon, Sr., David Montoya, Robert Neuzil, Barbara Newsom, Gregory A Nichols, Carol Ochoa, Jennifer Osborn, Robyn Palmer, Chris Pandolfi, Chris (I) Pandolfi, Carolyn Parker, Chevon Patrick, Chevon (I) Patrick, Kelsey Patsky, Kelsey (I) Patsky, Cristina Perez-Giordano, Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano, Raymond Phelps, Warren Pickerel, Joshua Pierce, Colin Quinn, Michelle Romero, Troy Romero, Michael Rotondo, Kimberly Rowland, Pok Rowland, Terry Rowland, Terry (I) Rowland, Robert Sauerbrey, Avery Scott, Debray Scott, Laura Scott, Rowena Scott, Timothy Scott, Sylvia Smith, Sylvia (I) Smith, Julian Soliz, Julian (I) Soliz, Gilford Sorens, Cheri Strahan, Derek Susa, Martha Taylor, Shanell Thompson, Shanell (I) Thompson, Bobby Tomlin, Mark Trujillo, Mark (I) Trujillo, James Tuggle, Marjorie Tuggle, Ricky Tweed, Christine Uebel, Kristie Valentino, Norma Van Buskirk, Abby VanHouten, James VanHouten, Christopher Varano, Christopher (I) Varano, Heather Varano, Donald Vigil, Edward Vigil, Frances Vigil, Silvia Vigil, Caron VonSprecken, Ricky VonSprecken, Ronald Wheeler, Ellenlore Wick, John Wick, Rebecca Wilson, Rebecca (I) Wilson, Diana Wing, Terri Wisniewski, Gary Youtz, Alexander Yu. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/28/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Georgia Bates, Harold Bates, Eleonore Berthiaume, Wilfred Berthiaume, April Bowman, Donald Bowman, Jr., Kevin Boyd, Lafayette Brady, Carl Brickell, Carl (I) Brickell, Judy Campbell, Thomas Chisholm, Thomas (I) Chisholm, Robert Christian, Dean Cimino, Amy Clements, Emily Collier, Rebecca Collier, Rebecca (I) Collier, Steven Collier, April Cowley, April (I) Cowley, Frank Craig, Julia Craig, Linda Craig, Robert Croft, John Cryster, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Robert Czosnyka, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jerome Depner, Jerome (I) Depner, Un Suk Dufrain, Jacob Dunton, Micahel Endres, Matthew Erickson, Natalia Erickson, Natalia (I) Erickson, Matthew (I) Erickson, Burton Evans, Dora Fernandez, Dora (I) Fernandez, Ashley Findlay, Chris Findlay, Chris (I) Findlay, Shelly Fly, Benjamin Frahm, Alejandro Franco, Chong Frazier, Shurman Gardner, Scott Gaster, Bruce Gershmel, Willie Gibbons, Jeremy Giordano, Victoria Goodell, Carrie Gordon, Cassandra Gordon, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Cynthia Griffin, Brittney Hamilton, Daniel Hamilton, Eva Hamilton, Randall Hamilton, Maxine Hanline, Leona Hansen, Thomas Hansen, Linda Hargis, Dawn Harris, Joshua Hicks, Joshua (I) Hicks, Anna Higgs, Petra Higgs, Harold Hitt, Regina Hull, Regina (I) Hull, Bryce Jaskar, Providence Jaskar, Skye Jaskar, Jennifer Jinkins, Jennifer (I) Jinkins, Cathy Johnson, Tina Kieselstein, Tony Korte, Candace Kurth, Antoine Lambert, Arlene Lambert, Emari Lambert, Marqual Lambert, Dorthy Laster, Marie Lavasseur, Oneil Lavasseur, Susan Learned, Heather Lindblad, Heather (I) Lindblad, Nicole Lorenzana, Nicole (I) Lorenzana, Randi Lucero, David Lux, Glenda Lux, Jessie Martin, Candace Avina Martinez, Candace Martinez, Candace (I) Avina Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Dominick Anderson, Jacky Anderson, Nicole Anderson, Adam Barela, Lei-Lani Barela, Lei-Lani (I) Barela, Kristie Barnes, Kristie (I) Barnes, Tommy Barter, Karen Martinez, Lawrence Martinez, Lucas Martinez, Theresa Martinez, Scott Mathison, Leonardo May, Wayne Mazari, David Mondragon, Sr., David Montoya, Robert Neuzil, Barbara Newsom, Gregory A Nichols, Carol Ochoa, Jennifer Osborn, Robyn Palmer, Chris Pandolfi, Chris (I) Pandolfi, Carolyn Parker, Chevon Patrick, Chevon (I) Patrick, Kelsey Patsky, Kelsey (I) Patsky, Cristina Perez-Giordano, Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano, Raymond Phelps, Warren Pickerel, Joshua Pierce, Colin Quinn, Michelle Romero, Troy Romero, Michael Rotondo, Kimberly Rowland, Pok Rowland, Terry Rowland, Terry (I) Rowland, Robert Sauerbrey, Avery Scott, Debray Scott, Laura Scott, Rowena Scott, Timothy Scott, Sylvia Smith, Sylvia (I) Smith, Julian Soliz, Julian (I) Soliz, Gilford Sorens, Cheri Strahan, Derek Susa, Martha Taylor, Shanell Thompson, Shanell (I) Thompson, Bobby Tomlin, Mark Trujillo, Mark (I) Trujillo, James Tuggle, Marjorie Tuggle, Ricky Tweed, Christine Uebel, Kristie Valentino, Norma Van Buskirk, Abby VanHouten, James VanHouten, Christopher Varano, Christopher (I) Varano, Heather Varano, Donald Vigil, Edward Vigil, Frances Vigil, Silvia Vigil, Caron VonSprecken, Ricky VonSprecken, Ronald Wheeler, Ellenlore Wick, John Wick, Rebecca Wilson, Rebecca (I) Wilson, Diana Wing, Terri Wisniewski, Gary Youtz, Alexander Yu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leona H
June 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt adde
June 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harold Hitt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harold Hitt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina (I) Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Regina (I) Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryce Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryce Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Providence Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Providence Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skye Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Skye Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC by Plaintiffs Georgia Bates, Harold Bates, Eleonore Berthiaume, Wilfred Berthiaume, April Bowman, Donald Bowman, Jr., Kevin Boyd, Lafayette Brady, Carl Brickell, Carl (I) Brickell, Judy Campbell, Thomas Chisholm, Thomas (I) Chisholm, Robert Christian, Dean Cimino, Amy Clements, Emily Collier, Rebecca Collier, Rebecca (I) Collier, Steven Collier, April Cowley, April (I) Cowley, Frank Craig, Julia Craig, Linda Craig, Robert Croft, John Cryster, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Robert Czosnyka, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jerome Depner, Jerome (I) Depner, Un Suk Dufrain, Jacob Dunton, Micahel Endres, Matthew Erickson, Natalia Erickson, Natalia (I) Erickson, Matthew (I) Erickson, Burton Evans, Dora Fernandez, Dora (I) Fernandez, Ashley Findlay, Chris Findlay, Chris (I) Findlay, Shelly Fly, Benjamin Frahm, Alejandro Franco, Chong Frazier, Shurman Gardner, Scott Gaster, Bruce Gershmel, Willie Gibbons, Jeremy Giordano, Victoria Goodell, Carrie Gordon, Cassandra Gordon, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Cynthia Griffin, Brittney Hamilton, Daniel Hamilton, Eva Hamilton, Randall Hamilton, Maxine Hanline, Leona Hansen, Thomas Hansen, Linda Hargis, Dawn Harris, Joshua Hicks, Joshua (I) Hicks, Anna Higgs, Petra Higgs, Harold Hitt, Regina Hull, Regina (I) Hull, Bryce Jaskar, Providence Jaskar, Skye Jaskar, Jennifer Jinkins, Jennifer (I) Jinkins, Cathy Johnson, Tina Kieselstein, Tony Korte, Candace Kurth, Antoine Lambert, Arlene Lambert, Emari Lambert, Marqual Lambert, Dorthy Laster, Marie Lavasseur, Oneil Lavasseur, Susan Learned, Heather Lindblad, Heather (I) Lindblad, Nicole Lorenzana, Nicole (I) Lorenzana, Randi Lucero, David Lux, Glenda Lux, Jessie Martin, Candace Avina Martinez, Candace Martinez, Candace (I) Avina Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Dominick Anderson, Jacky Anderson, Nicole Anderson, Adam Barela, Lei-Lani Barela, Lei-Lani (I) Barela, Kristie Barnes, Kristie (I) Barnes, Tommy Barter, Karen Martinez, Lawrence Martinez, Lucas Martinez, Theresa Martinez, Scott Mathison, Leonardo May, Wayne Mazari, David Mondragon, Sr., David Montoya, Robert Neuzil, Barbara Newsom, Gregory A Nichols, Carol Ochoa, Jennifer Osborn, Robyn Palmer, Chris Pandolfi, Chris (I) Pandolfi, Carolyn Parker, Chevon Patrick, Chevon (I) Patrick, Kelsey Patsky, Kelsey (I) Patsky, Cristina Perez-Giordano, Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano, Raymond Phelps, Warren Pickerel, Joshua Pierce, Colin Quinn, Michelle Romero, Troy Romero, Michael Rotondo, Kimberly Rowland, Pok Rowland, Terry Rowland, Terry (I) Rowland, Robert Sauerbrey, Avery Scott, Debray Scott, Laura Scott, Rowena Scott, Timothy Scott, Sylvia Smith, Sylvia (I) Smith, Julian Soliz, Julian (I) Soliz, Gilford Sorens, Cheri Strahan, Derek Susa, Martha Taylor, Shanell Thompson, Shanell (I) Thompson, Bobby Tomlin, Mark Trujillo, Mark (I) Trujillo, James Tuggle, Marjorie Tuggle, Ricky Tweed, Christine Uebel, Kristie Valentino, Norma Van Buskirk, Abby VanHouten, James VanHouten, Christopher Varano, Christopher (I) Varano, Heather Varano, Donald Vigil, Edward Vigil, Frances Vigil, Silvia Vigil, Caron VonSprecken, Ricky VonSprecken, Ronald Wheeler, Ellenlore Wick, John Wick, Rebecca Wilson, Rebecca (I) Wilson, Diana Wing, Terri Wisniewski, Gary Youtz, Alexander Yu. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patric
June 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Georgia Bates, Harold Bates, Eleonore Berthiaume, Wilfred Berthiaume, April Bowman, Donald Bowman, Jr., Kevin Boyd, Lafayette Brady, Carl Brickell, Carl (I) Brickell, Judy Campbell, Thomas Chisholm, Thomas (I) Chisholm, Robert Christian, Dean Cimino, Amy Clements, Emily Collier, Rebecca Collier, Rebecca (I) Collier, Steven Collier, April Cowley, April (I) Cowley, Frank Craig, Julia Craig, Linda Craig, Robert Croft, John Cryster, Jacqueline Czosnyka, Robert Czosnyka, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jerome Depner, Jerome (I) Depner, Un Suk Dufrain, Jacob Dunton, Micahel Endres, Matthew Erickson, Natalia Erickson, Natalia (I) Erickson, Matthew (I) Erickson, Burton Evans, Dora Fernandez, Dora (I) Fernandez, Ashley Findlay, Chris Findlay, Chris (I) Findlay, Shelly Fly, Benjamin Frahm, Alejandro Franco, Chong Frazier, Shurman Gardner, Scott Gaster, Bruce Gershmel, Willie Gibbons, Jeremy Giordano, Victoria Goodell, Carrie Gordon, Cassandra Gordon, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Cynthia Griffin, Brittney Hamilton, Daniel Hamilton, Eva Hamilton, Randall Hamilton, Maxine Hanline, Leona Hansen, Thomas Hansen, Linda Hargis, Dawn Harris, Joshua Hicks, Joshua (I) Hicks, Anna Higgs, Petra Higgs, Harold Hitt, Regina Hull, Regina (I) Hull, Bryce Jaskar, Providence Jaskar, Skye Jaskar, Jennifer Jinkins, Jennifer (I) Jinkins, Cathy Johnson, Tina Kieselstein, Tony Korte, Candace Kurth, Antoine Lambert, Arlene Lambert, Emari Lambert, Marqual Lambert, Dorthy Laster, Marie Lavasseur, Oneil Lavasseur, Susan Learned, Heather Lindblad, Heather (I) Lindblad, Nicole Lorenzana, Nicole (I) Lorenzana, Randi Lucero, David Lux, Glenda Lux, Jessie Martin, Candace Avina Martinez, Candace Martinez, Candace (I) Avina Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Dominick Anderson, Jacky Anderson, Nicole Anderson, Adam Barela, Lei-Lani Barela, Lei-Lani (I) Barela, Kristie Barnes, Kristie (I) Barnes, Tommy Barter, Karen Martinez, Lawrence Martinez, Lucas Martinez, Theresa Martinez, Scott Mathison, Leonardo May, Wayne Mazari, David Mondragon, Sr., David Montoya, Robert Neuzil, Barbara Newsom, Gregory A Nichols, Carol Ochoa, Jennifer Osborn, Robyn Palmer, Chris Pandolfi, Chris (I) Pandolfi, Carolyn Parker, Chevon Patrick, Chevon (I) Patrick, Kelsey Patsky, Kelsey (I) Patsky, Cristina Perez-Giordano, Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano, Raymond Phelps, Warren Pickerel, Joshua Pierce, Colin Quinn, Michelle Romero, Troy Romero, Michael Rotondo, Kimberly Rowland, Pok Rowland, Terry Rowland, Terry (I) Rowland, Robert Sauerbrey, Avery Scott, Debray Scott, Laura Scott, Rowena Scott, Timothy Scott, Sylvia Smith, Sylvia (I) Smith, Julian Soliz, Julian (I) Soliz, Gilford Sorens, Cheri Strahan, Derek Susa, Martha Taylor, Shanell Thompson, Shanell (I) Thompson, Bobby Tomlin, Mark Trujillo, Mark (I) Trujillo, James Tuggle, Marjorie Tuggle, Ricky Tweed, Christine Uebel, Kristie Valentino, Norma Van Buskirk, Abby VanHouten, James VanHouten, Christopher Varano, Christopher (I) Varano, Heather Varano, Donald Vigil, Edward Vigil, Frances Vigil, Silvia Vigil, Caron VonSprecken, Ricky VonSprecken, Ronald Wheeler, Ellenlore Wick, John Wick, Rebecca Wilson, Rebecca (I) Wilson, Diana Wing, Terri Wisniewski, Gary Youtz, Alexander Yu (Attachments: #1 redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carl (I) Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas (I) Chisholm (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca (I) Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April (I) Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome (I) Depner (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Micahel Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Natalia (I) Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Matthew (I) Erickson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora (I) Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chris (I) Findlay (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ashley Findley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ashley Findley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cynthia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brittney Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eva Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maxine Hanline(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leona Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Thomas Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Hargis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dawn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua (I) Hicks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anna Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Petra Higgs(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harold Hitt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harold Hitt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Regina Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Regina Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Regina (I) Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Regina (I) Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bryce Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bryce Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Providence Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party
May 15, 2018 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01163-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge Richard P. Matsch. (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik and Louise Rita Caro.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6101181)Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. A,(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. A,(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dominick Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dominick Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacky Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacky Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nicole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nicole Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adam Barela(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Adam Barela(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lei-Lani Barela(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lei-Lani Barela(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kristie Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kristie Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tommy Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tommy Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Georgia Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Harold Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Eleonore Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party April Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Donald Bowman, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kevin Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party E. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party E. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party F. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party F. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. C.1(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A C.2(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Judy Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dean Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Emily Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rebecca Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steven Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party April Cowley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frank Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Julia Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Linda Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Croft(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Cryster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacqueline Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Czosnyka(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jerome Depner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Un Suk Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jacob Dunton(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party C. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party U. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party U. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Endres(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Matthew Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Natalia Erickson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Burton Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party J. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party M. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party M. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dora Fernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chris Findlay(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ashley Findley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ashley Findley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shelly Fly(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Benjamin Frahm(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alejandro Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chong Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party N. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party T. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shurman Gardner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Scott Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bruce Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Willie Gibbons(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeremy Giordano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Victoria Goodell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carrie Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassandra Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra Higgs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina (I) Hull
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Berthiaume
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emari Lambert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia (I) Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Osborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Kurth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome (I) Depner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Parker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Czosnyka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Griffin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Barela
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevon (I) Patrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Yu
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Craig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Bowman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Croft
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A Nichols
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCAS MARTINEZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Higgs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Lambert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl (I) Brickell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Avina Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry (I) Rowland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Rowland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Depner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ochoa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tuggle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jinkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian (I) Soliz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mathison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Patsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sauerbrey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Czosnyka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hicks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chong Frazier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie (I) Barnes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rotondo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marqual Lambert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby VanHouten
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shy-Anne Gramsch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micahel Endres
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Lux
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Gordon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gibbons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Collier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lux
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Craig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gaster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Romero
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Bates
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hitt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Brickell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole (I) Lorenzana
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather (I) Lindblad
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Hull
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Collier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Franco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Valentino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pok Rowland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Gordon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleonore Berthiaume
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Goodell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua (I) Hicks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Perez-Giordano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chisholm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Kieselstein
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Van Buskirk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilford Sorens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky VonSprecken
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James VanHouten
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lindblad
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Varano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo May
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Strahan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafayette Brady
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Tomlin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debray Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burton Evans
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Phelps
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace (I) Avina Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher (I) Varano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Mazari
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Rowland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina (I) Perez-Giordano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew (I) Erickson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Findlay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey (I) Patsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Wing
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Tuggle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Newsom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Frahm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron VonSprecken
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Christian
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hargis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Jaskar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Uebel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Cowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Learned
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Craig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cryster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Tweed
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Pandolfi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellenlore Wick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Fernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Erickson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Quinn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Varano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Soliz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lavasseur
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lei-Lani (I) Barela
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shurman Gardner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneil Lavasseur
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Dunton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Wisniewski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorthy Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Lucero
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Boyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Youtz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevon Patrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Lambert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Findlay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer (I) Jinkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Collier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mondragon, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn (I) Davila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacky Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skye Jaskar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora (I) Fernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lei-Lani Barela
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Un Suk Dufrain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (I) Chisholm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Barnes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Hansen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Romero
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Bates
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris (I) Findlay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia (I) Erickson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris (I) Pandolfi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Korte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Barter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Gershmel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hansen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Giordano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Pickerel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Neuzil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanell (I) Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bowman, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Erickson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Pierce
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Jaskar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Palmer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets</