Rice et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Micheal Moody, Sherri Igou, Amanda Przymus, Ray Espinoza, Alvin Sanchez, Michael Delmonico, Gwendolyn Hays, Heather M. Bovey, Daycee R. Martinez, Heiko Seiffert, Frank Gatta, Darren Westberg, Jr., Ruthann Patterson, Pearl Carter, Troy McGregor, Jodi Henley, Leonel Ramirez, Rabiab Cleckley, Brett Taylor, Joseph Gettler, Karen Marshall, Amanda Holman, Edward Reyes, Gabriele Palmer, Ashley J. Marquardt, Marie Chavis, Deanna Gatta, Charles Singbiel, Pamela Griebel, Adam Przymus, Theresa Hickman, Adam (I) Przymus, Julia (I) Madden, Monica Lester, Valerie Johnson, Joseph Henderson, Isaac Kimbrough, Peggy Arias, Steven (I) Mock, Kenneth Willard, Nancy Reyes, Felix Betancourt, Kimberly Lopez, Jennifer Collins, Eric Herman, Robert Colorado, Sheila Thomas, Jordan Bovey, Daniel Miller, Marivick Lastrella, Darryl Thomas, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Collin Yearsley, Harriet Credier, Nelda Higley, Rebecca Youngs, Peggy (I) Arias, Amanda (I) Holman, Debra Dusack, Franky Reyes, Shannen Morra, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Doreen Sargema, Jerry Rice, Lee Jones, Jarrell Horn, Cynthia Whyte, Elizabeth Garcia, Daurie Westberg, Nelysette Sanchez, Yvette Morrison, Sean (I) Agurkis, Tracey Schetlizki, Jomarion Clark, Jessica Lessard, Katharina Budeshefsky, Donna Price, Nelda Velez, Marie Wickham, Austin Collins, Michael Kane, Dominic Sanchez, Richard Moore, Laura Michael, Eva Haynie, Katherine Lyall, Charlene Moody, Edward Paker, Ina King, Tonya Obermuller, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Robert Robinson, Julia Madden, Bradley Marquardt, Thomas Phillips, Kimberly Bays, David Main, Annabel Jacox, Sara Igyarto, James McCann, Jaqueline Decker, Gregory Iverson, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Arie Jackson, Dana Miller, Gregory (I) Iverson, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Robert Henley, Charles Hickam, Claudia Bell, Lia Howard, Dan Edwards, Constance Robinson, Janine Palmer, Johnathon Costello, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Brian Helm, Tammy Maltais, Tonia Robinson, Jacob Whiteman, Edita Bernado, Steven Mock, Judy Hamilton, Jean Tipton, Lisa McCarty, Justin Arias, Michael Manaois, Ollie Price, Mildred Ann Price, Richard Youngs, Fidel Gutierrez, Thomas Stephens, Jamie Gallegos, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Nora Elefante, Kimberly Ethridge, Yvette Breden, Marshall Patterson, Anthony Harrison, Justin Lee, Amelina Robles, Sean Agurkis, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Kameron Hambly, Jesus Lopez, Bethany Crane, Anthony Morra, Tabitha Bertrand, Robert Mayville, Lynette Ross, Rebecca (I) Rains, Nancy Willard, David Sargema, Sophia Victor, Earlie Morrison, Kimberly Westberg, Judith Johnson, Kathy Howell, Yang Rice, Jennifer (I) Velasco, John Maltais, Kristin McIrvin, Steven Smith, Dirk Howard, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Hollie Hambly, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Jill Jeffries, Leonard Cleckley, Mark Bovey, Lisa Trujillo, Jennifer Velasco, Sylvia Whiteman, Flossia Flournoy, Malarie Bovey, Glenda Stephens, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Brianna Flournoy, Mary Trujillo, Samuelle Holton, Gladys Brown, Roberta Vigil, Chiemi Paker, Candi Jones, Yolanda Ceja, Hope Agurkis, Donavian Lorio, Emiliano Lastrella, Rebecca Rains, Ursula Horn, Jason Hambly, Philip Houston, Cody Hickam, Flossia (I) Flournoy and Jean Gatta
Defendant: Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde PLC, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam Inc and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03397
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01190, Rice et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-3397-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (cpeg, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01190. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01190 GBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Claudia Bell, Edita Bernado, Tabitha Bertrand, Felix Betancourt, Heather M. Bovey, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Jordan Bovey, Malarie Bovey, Mark Bovey, Yvette Breden, Gladys Brown, Katharina Budeshefsky, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Pearl Carter, Yolanda Ceja, Marie Chavis, Jomarion Clark, Leonard Cleckley, Rabiab Cleckley, Austin Collins, Jennifer Collins, Robert Colorado, Johnathon Costello, Bethany Crane, Harriet Credier, Jaqueline Decker, Michael Delmonico, Debra Dusack, Dan Edwards, Nora Elefante, Ray Espinoza, Kimberly Ethridge, Brianna Flournoy, Flossia Flournoy, Flossia (I) Flournoy, Jamie Gallegos, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Elizabeth Garcia, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Deanna Gatta, Frank Gatta, Jean Gatta, Joseph Gettler, Pamela Griebel, Fidel Gutierrez, Hollie Hambly, Jason Hambly, Kameron Hambly, Judy Hamilton, Anthony Harrison, Eva Haynie, Gwendolyn Hays, Brian Helm, Joseph Henderson, Jodi Henley, Robert Henley, Eric Herman, Charles Hickam, Cody Hickam, Theresa Hickman, Nelda Higley, Amanda Holman, Amanda (I) Holman, Samuelle Holton, Jarrell Horn, Ursula Horn, Philip Houston, Dirk Howard, Lia Howard, Kathy Howell, Sherri Igou, Sara Igyarto, Gregory Iverson, Gregory (I) Iverson, Arie Jackson, Annabel Jacox, Jill Jeffries, Judith Johnson, Valerie Johnson, Candi Jones, Lee Jones, Michael Kane, Isaac Kimbrough, Ina King, Emiliano Lastrella, Marivick Lastrella, Justin Lee, Jessica Lessard, Monica Lester, Jesus Lopez, Kimberly Lopez, Donavian Lorio, Katherine Lyall, Julia Madden, Julia (I) Madden, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Hope Agurkis, Sean Agurkis, Sean (I) Agurkis, Justin Arias, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Kimberly Bays, David Main, John Maltais, Tammy Maltais, Michael Manaois, Ashley J. Marquardt, Bradley Marquardt, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Karen Marshall, Daycee R. Martinez, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Robert Mayville, James McCann, Lisa McCarty, Troy McGregor, Kristin McIrvin, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Laura Michael, Dana Miller, Daniel Miller, Steven Mock, Steven (I) Mock, Charlene Moody, Micheal Moody, Richard Moore, Anthony Morra, Shannen Morra, Earlie Morrison, Yvette Morrison, Tonya Obermuller, Chiemi Paker, Edward Paker, Gabriele Palmer, Janine Palmer, Marshall Patterson, Ruthann Patterson, Thomas Phillips, Donna Price, Mildred Ann Price, Ollie Price, Adam Przymus, Amanda Przymus, Adam (I) Przymus, Rebecca Rains, Rebecca (I) Rains, Leonel Ramirez, Edward Reyes, Franky Reyes, Nancy Reyes, Jerry Rice, Yang Rice, Constance Robinson, Robert Robinson, Tonia Robinson, Amelina Robles, Lynette Ross, Alvin Sanchez, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, David Sargema, Doreen Sargema, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Tracey Schetlizki, Heiko Seiffert, Charles Singbiel, Steven Smith, Glenda Stephens, Thomas Stephens, Brett Taylor, Darryl Thomas, Sheila Thomas, Jean Tipton, Lisa Trujillo, Mary Trujillo, Jennifer Velasco, Jennifer (I) Velasco, Nelda Velez, Sophia Victor, Roberta Vigil, Darren Westberg, Darren Westberg, Jr, Daurie Westberg, Kimberly Westberg, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Jacob Whiteman, Sylvia Whiteman, Cynthia Whyte, Marie Wickham, Kenneth Willard, Nancy Willard, Collin Yearsley, Rebecca Youngs, Richard Youngs. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Transferring Case pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and with the approval of Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and the consent of Judge R. Brooke Jackson, the Clerk shall transfer this case to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/17/2018. (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman filed by Gladys Brown, Nelda Velez, Gwendolyn Hays, Marie Wickham, Daniel Miller, Steven Mock, Lisa Trujillo, Tabitha Bertrand, Lynette Ross, Daurie Westberg, Justin Arias, Flossia Flournoy, Tracey Schetlizki, Jamie Gallegos, Katharina Budeshefsky, Mary Trujillo, Lia Howard, Nancy Reyes, Mark Bovey, Nora Elefante, Yang Rice, James McCann, Anthony Morra, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Flossia (I) Flournoy, Troy McGregor, Judith Johnson, Marshall Patterson, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Darren Westberg, Jr., Nancy Willard, Sheila Thomas, Ina King, Emiliano Lastrella, Dan Edwards, Debra Dusack, Edward Reyes, Richard Youngs, Austin Collins, Hollie Hambly, Rebecca Rains, David Main, Annabel Jacox, Arie Jackson, Jacob Whiteman, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Malarie Bovey, Charles Singbiel, Charles Hickam, Dirk Howard, Peggy (I) Arias, Dana Miller, Jerry Rice, Sara Igyarto, Sean (I) Agurkis, Heiko Seiffert, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Ollie Price, Frank Gatta, Charlene Moody, Philip Houston, Collin Yearsley, Marie Chavis, Michael Kane, Ruthann Patterson, Leonard Cleckley, Amelina Robles, Valerie Johnson, Marivick Lastrella, Fidel Gutierrez, Kathy Howell, Jean Tipton, Deanna Gatta, Sylvia Whiteman, Kimberly Lopez, Julia Madden, Gregory Iverson, Yvette Breden, Tonya Obermuller, Karen Marshall, Lee Jones, Alvin Sanchez, Doreen Sargema, Steven Smith, Joseph Henderson, Joseph Gettler, Yolanda Ceja, Eric Herman, Robert Mayville, Leonel Ramirez, Bradley Marquardt, Kimberly Westberg, Adam Przymus, Tammy Maltais, Micheal Moody, Thomas Phillips, Jodi Henley, Edward Paker, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Jomarion Clark, Michael Delmonico, Justin Lee, Theresa Hickman, Dominic Sanchez, Sophia Victor, Samuelle Holton, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Nelysette Sanchez, Lisa McCarty, Chiemi Paker, Jaqueline Decker, Jill Jeffries, Shannen Morra, Peggy Arias, Kenneth Willard, Darryl Thomas, Monica Lester, Glenda Stephens, Claudia Bell, Kimberly Ethridge, Amanda (I) Holman, Brett Taylor, John Maltais, Ray Espinoza, Jordan Bovey, Eva Haynie, Jean Gatta, Jarrell Horn, Sean Agurkis, Rebecca Youngs, Kameron Hambly, David Sargema, Steven (I) Mock, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Cody Hickam, Pearl Carter, Candi Jones, Amanda Holman, Nelda Higley, Donavian Lorio, Brianna Flournoy, Jesus Lopez, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Laura Michael, Yvette Morrison, Jason Hambly, Michael Manaois, Brian Helm, Isaac Kimbrough, Bethany Crane, Tonia Robinson, Richard Moore, Robert Henley, Mildred Ann Price, Constance Robinson, Johnathon Costello, Robert Robinson, Jessica Lessard, Heather M. Bovey, Amanda Przymus, Ashley J. Marquardt, Pamela Griebel, Anthony Harrison, Rebecca (I) Rains, Sherri Igou, Kimberly Bays, Jennifer Collins, Donna Price, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Cynthia Whyte, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Daycee R. Martinez, Judy Hamilton, Gregory (I) Iverson, Jennifer Velasco, Katherine Lyall, Earlie Morrison, Franky Reyes, Robert Colorado, Harriet Credier, Darren Westberg, Ursula Horn, Janine Palmer, Elizabeth Garcia, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Jennifer (I) Velasco, Edita Bernado, Hope Agurkis, Julia (I) Madden, Felix Betancourt, Gabriele Palmer, Adam (I) Przymus, Thomas Stephens, Kristin McIrvin, Rabiab Cleckley, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Roberta Vigil. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/27/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Claudia Bell, Edita Bernado, Tabitha Bertrand, Felix Betancourt, Heather M. Bovey, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Jordan Bovey, Malarie Bovey, Mark Bovey, Yvette Breden, Gladys Brown, Katharina Budeshefsky, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Pearl Carter, Yolanda Ceja, Marie Chavis, Jomarion Clark, Leonard Cleckley, Rabiab Cleckley, Austin Collins, Jennifer Collins, Robert Colorado, Johnathon Costello, Bethany Crane, Harriet Credier, Jaqueline Decker, Michael Delmonico, Debra Dusack, Dan Edwards, Nora Elefante, Ray Espinoza, Kimberly Ethridge, Brianna Flournoy, Flossia Flournoy, Flossia (I) Flournoy, Jamie Gallegos, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Elizabeth Garcia, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Deanna Gatta, Frank Gatta, Jean Gatta, Joseph Gettler, Pamela Griebel, Fidel Gutierrez, Hollie Hambly, Jason Hambly, Kameron Hambly, Judy Hamilton, Anthony Harrison, Eva Haynie, Gwendolyn Hays, Brian Helm, Joseph Henderson, Jodi Henley, Robert Henley, Eric Herman, Charles Hickam, Cody Hickam, Theresa Hickman, Nelda Higley, Amanda Holman, Amanda (I) Holman, Samuelle Holton, Jarrell Horn, Ursula Horn, Philip Houston, Dirk Howard, Lia Howard, Kathy Howell, Sherri Igou, Sara Igyarto, Gregory Iverson, Gregory (I) Iverson, Arie Jackson, Annabel Jacox, Jill Jeffries, Judith Johnson, Valerie Johnson, Candi Jones, Lee Jones, Michael Kane, Isaac Kimbrough, Ina King, Emiliano Lastrella, Marivick Lastrella, Justin Lee, Jessica Lessard, Monica Lester, Jesus Lopez, Kimberly Lopez, Donavian Lorio, Katherine Lyall, Julia Madden, Julia (I) Madden, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Hope Agurkis, Sean Agurkis, Sean (I) Agurkis, Justin Arias, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Kimberly Bays, David Main, John Maltais, Tammy Maltais, Michael Manaois, Ashley J. Marquardt, Bradley Marquardt, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Karen Marshall, Daycee R. Martinez, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Robert Mayville, James McCann, Lisa McCarty, Troy McGregor, Kristin McIrvin, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Laura Michael, Dana Miller, Daniel Miller, Steven Mock, Steven (I) Mock, Charlene Moody, Micheal Moody, Richard Moore, Anthony Morra, Shannen Morra, Earlie Morrison, Yvette Morrison, Tonya Obermuller, Chiemi Paker, Edward Paker, Gabriele Palmer, Janine Palmer, Marshall Patterson, Ruthann Patterson, Thomas Phillips, Donna Price, Mildred Ann Price, Ollie Price, Adam Przymus, Amanda Przymus, Adam (I) Przymus, Rebecca Rains, Rebecca (I) Rains, Leonel Ramirez, Edward Reyes, Franky Reyes, Nancy Reyes, Jerry Rice, Yang Rice, Constance Robinson, Robert Robinson, Tonia Robinson, Amelina Robles, Lynette Ross, Alvin Sanchez, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, David Sargema, Doreen Sargema, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Tracey Schetlizki, Heiko Seiffert, Charles Singbiel, Steven Smith, Glenda Stephens, Thomas Stephens, Brett Taylor, Darryl Thomas, Sheila Thomas, Jean Tipton, Lisa Trujillo, Mary Trujillo, Jennifer Velasco, Jennifer (I) Velasco, Nelda Velez, Sophia Victor, Roberta Vigil, Darren Westberg, Darren Westberg, Jr, Daurie Westberg, Kimberly Westberg, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Jacob Whiteman, Sylvia Whiteman, Cynthia Whyte, Marie Wickham, Kenneth Willard, Nancy Willard, Collin Yearsley, Rebecca Youngs, Richard Youngs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric M
June 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory (I) Iverson(pty:pla), Attor
June 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory (I) Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory (I) Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annabel Jacox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annabel Jacox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jill Jeffries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jill Jeffries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judith Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Judith Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Can
June 19, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Claudia Bell, Edita Bernado, Tabitha Bertrand, Felix Betancourt, Heather M. Bovey, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Jordan Bovey, Malarie Bovey, Mark Bovey, Yvette Breden, Gladys Brown, Katharina Budeshefsky, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Pearl Carter, Yolanda Ceja, Marie Chavis, Jomarion Clark, Leonard Cleckley, Rabiab Cleckley, Austin Collins, Jennifer Collins, Robert Colorado, Johnathon Costello, Bethany Crane, Harriet Credier, Jaqueline Decker, Michael Delmonico, Debra Dusack, Dan Edwards, Nora Elefante, Ray Espinoza, Kimberly Ethridge, Brianna Flournoy, Flossia Flournoy, Flossia (I) Flournoy, Jamie Gallegos, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Elizabeth Garcia, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Deanna Gatta, Frank Gatta, Jean Gatta, Joseph Gettler, Pamela Griebel, Fidel Gutierrez, Hollie Hambly, Jason Hambly, Kameron Hambly, Judy Hamilton, Anthony Harrison, Eva Haynie, Gwendolyn Hays, Brian Helm, Joseph Henderson, Jodi Henley, Robert Henley, Eric Herman, Charles Hickam, Cody Hickam, Theresa Hickman, Nelda Higley, Amanda Holman, Amanda (I) Holman, Samuelle Holton, Jarrell Horn, Ursula Horn, Philip Houston, Dirk Howard, Lia Howard, Kathy Howell, Sherri Igou, Sara Igyarto, Gregory Iverson, Gregory (I) Iverson, Arie Jackson, Annabel Jacox, Jill Jeffries, Judith Johnson, Valerie Johnson, Candi Jones, Lee Jones, Michael Kane, Isaac Kimbrough, Ina King, Emiliano Lastrella, Marivick Lastrella, Justin Lee, Jessica Lessard, Monica Lester, Jesus Lopez, Kimberly Lopez, Donavian Lorio, Katherine Lyall, Julia Madden, Julia (I) Madden, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Hope Agurkis, Sean Agurkis, Sean (I) Agurkis, Justin Arias, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Kimberly Bays, David Main, John Maltais, Tammy Maltais, Michael Manaois, Ashley J. Marquardt, Bradley Marquardt, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Karen Marshall, Daycee R. Martinez, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Robert Mayville, James McCann, Lisa McCarty, Troy McGregor, Kristin McIrvin, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Laura Michael, Dana Miller, Daniel Miller, Steven Mock, Steven (I) Mock, Charlene Moody, Micheal Moody, Richard Moore, Anthony Morra, Shannen Morra, Earlie Morrison, Yvette Morrison, Tonya Obermuller, Chiemi Paker, Edward Paker, Gabriele Palmer, Janine Palmer, Marshall Patterson, Ruthann Patterson, Thomas Phillips, Donna Price, Mildred Ann Price, Ollie Price, Adam Przymus, Amanda Przymus, Adam (I) Przymus, Rebecca Rains, Rebecca (I) Rains, Leonel Ramirez, Edward Reyes, Franky Reyes, Nancy Reyes, Jerry Rice, Yang Rice, Constance Robinson, Robert Robinson, Tonia Robinson, Amelina Robles, Lynette Ross, Alvin Sanchez, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, David Sargema, Doreen Sargema, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Tracey Schetlizki, Heiko Seiffert, Charles Singbiel, Steven Smith, Glenda Stephens, Thomas Stephens, Brett Taylor, Darryl Thomas, Sheila Thomas, Jean Tipton, Lisa Trujillo, Mary Trujillo, Jennifer Velasco, Jennifer (I) Velasco, Nelda Velez, Sophia Victor, Roberta Vigil, Darren Westberg, Darren Westberg, Jr, Daurie Westberg, Kimberly Westberg, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Jacob Whiteman, Sylvia Whiteman, Cynthia Whyte, Marie Wickham, Kenneth Willard, Nancy Willard, Collin Yearsley, Rebecca Youngs, Richard Youngs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 Administrative Notice re: #10 Summons Request. Summonses will not be issues due to incomplete case caption. The summonses need to list all parties, both plaintiffs and defendants, in the case caption on any summons requesting to be issued. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Claudia Bell, Edita Bernado, Tabitha Bertrand, Felix Betancourt, Heather M. Bovey, Heather (I) M. Bovey, Jordan Bovey, Malarie Bovey, Mark Bovey, Yvette Breden, Gladys Brown, Katharina Budeshefsky, Katharina (I) Budeshefsky, Pearl Carter, Yolanda Ceja, Marie Chavis, Jomarion Clark, Leonard Cleckley, Rabiab Cleckley, Austin Collins, Jennifer Collins, Robert Colorado, Johnathon Costello, Bethany Crane, Harriet Credier, Jaqueline Decker, Michael Delmonico, Debra Dusack, Dan Edwards, Nora Elefante, Ray Espinoza, Kimberly Ethridge, Brianna Flournoy, Flossia Flournoy, Flossia (I) Flournoy, Jamie Gallegos, Jamie (I) Gallegos, Elizabeth Garcia, Elizabeth (I) Garcia, Deanna Gatta, Frank Gatta, Jean Gatta, Joseph Gettler, Pamela Griebel, Fidel Gutierrez, Hollie Hambly, Jason Hambly, Kameron Hambly, Judy Hamilton, Anthony Harrison, Eva Haynie, Gwendolyn Hays, Brian Helm, Joseph Henderson, Jodi Henley, Robert Henley, Eric Herman, Charles Hickam, Cody Hickam, Theresa Hickman, Nelda Higley, Amanda Holman, Amanda (I) Holman, Samuelle Holton, Jarrell Horn, Ursula Horn, Philip Houston, Dirk Howard, Lia Howard, Kathy Howell, Sherri Igou, Sara Igyarto, Gregory Iverson, Gregory (I) Iverson, Arie Jackson, Annabel Jacox, Jill Jeffries, Judith Johnson, Valerie Johnson, Candi Jones, Lee Jones, Michael Kane, Isaac Kimbrough, Ina King, Emiliano Lastrella, Marivick Lastrella, Justin Lee, Jessica Lessard, Monica Lester, Jesus Lopez, Kimberly Lopez, Donavian Lorio, Katherine Lyall, Julia Madden, Julia (I) Madden, Aria Ramirez Actouka, Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka, Hope Agurkis, Sean Agurkis, Sean (I) Agurkis, Justin Arias, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Kimberly Bays, David Main, John Maltais, Tammy Maltais, Michael Manaois, Ashley J. Marquardt, Bradley Marquardt, Ashley (I) J. Marquardt, Karen Marshall, Daycee R. Martinez, Daycee (I) R. Martinez, Robert Mayville, James McCann, Lisa McCarty, Troy McGregor, Kristin McIrvin, Kristin (I) McIrvin, Laura Michael, Dana Miller, Daniel Miller, Steven Mock, Steven (I) Mock, Charlene Moody, Micheal Moody, Richard Moore, Anthony Morra, Shannen Morra, Earlie Morrison, Yvette Morrison, Tonya Obermuller, Chiemi Paker, Edward Paker, Gabriele Palmer, Janine Palmer, Marshall Patterson, Ruthann Patterson, Thomas Phillips, Donna Price, Mildred Ann Price, Ollie Price, Adam Przymus, Amanda Przymus, Adam (I) Przymus, Rebecca Rains, Rebecca (I) Rains, Leonel Ramirez, Edward Reyes, Franky Reyes, Nancy Reyes, Jerry Rice, Yang Rice, Constance Robinson, Robert Robinson, Tonia Robinson, Amelina Robles, Lynette Ross, Alvin Sanchez, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, David Sargema, Doreen Sargema, Vonda Schat-Wilk, Tracey Schetlizki, Heiko Seiffert, Charles Singbiel, Steven Smith, Glenda Stephens, Thomas Stephens, Brett Taylor, Darryl Thomas, Sheila Thomas, Jean Tipton, Lisa Trujillo, Mary Trujillo, Jennifer Velasco, Jennifer (I) Velasco, Nelda Velez, Sophia Victor, Roberta Vigil, Darren Westberg, Darren Westberg, Jr, Daurie Westberg, Kimberly Westberg, Kimberly (I) Westberg, Jacob Whiteman, Sylvia Whiteman, Cynthia Whyte, Marie Wickham, Kenneth Willard, Nancy Willard, Collin Yearsley, Rebecca Youngs, Richard Youngs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathy Howell(pt
May 23, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment CO., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, INC, Kidde PLC, INC, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, 3M Company, The, National Foam, INC, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, INC Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Heather (I) M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Katharina (I) Budeshefsky (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Flossia (I) Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie (I) Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidel Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eva Haynie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Holman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Holman (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuelle Holton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jarrell Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ursula Horn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Philip Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dirk Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lia Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathy Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherri Igou(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sara Igyarto(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory (I) Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory (I) Iverson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annabel Jacox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annabel Jacox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jill Jeffries(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jill Jeffries(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judith Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Judith Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/16/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/16/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01190-RM. (Text Only Entry) (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge Richard P. Matsch. (ktera) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6105389)Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Aria Ramirez Actouka(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Hope Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Hope Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Sean Agurkis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Justin Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Justin Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kimberly Bays(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kimberly Bays(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Claudia Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Edita Bernado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Tabitha Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Felix Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Heather M. Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jordan Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Malarie Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Mark Bovey(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Yvette Breden(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gladys Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Katharina Budeshefsky(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pearl Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Yolanda Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Marie Chavis(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jomarion Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Leonard Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Rabiab Cleckley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Austin Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jennifer Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Robert Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Johnathon Costello(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Bethany Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Harriet Credier(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jaqueline Decker(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Michael Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Debra Dusack(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Dan Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nora Elefante(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Ray Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kimberly Ethridge(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brianna Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Flossia Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jamie Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Elizabeth Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Deanna Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Frank Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jean Gatta(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joseph Gettler(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Fidel Guetuerrez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Fidel Guetuerrez(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Hollie Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jason Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Judy Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Anthony Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Eva Hayne(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Eva Hayne(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Gwendolyn Hays(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Brian Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Joseph Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Jodi Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Robert Henley(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Eric Herman(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Charles Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Cody Hickam(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Theresa Hickman(pty:pla), Attorney Durant D. Davidson added to party Nelda Higley(pty:pla), Attorney Dura

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Moody
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Igou
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Przymus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Delmonico
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Hays
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M. Bovey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daycee R. Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heiko Seiffert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gatta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Westberg, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthann Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy McGregor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Henley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Ramirez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabiab Cleckley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gettler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Marshall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Holman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Reyes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele Palmer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley J. Marquardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Chavis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Gatta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Singbiel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Griebel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Przymus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hickman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam (I) Przymus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia (I) Madden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Lester
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Henderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Kimbrough
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven (I) Mock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Willard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Reyes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Betancourt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Collins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Herman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Colorado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Bovey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marivick Lastrella
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelysette (I) Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collin Yearsley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Credier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda Higley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Youngs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy (I) Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Holman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Dusack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franky Reyes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannen Morra
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharina (I) Budeshefsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Sargema
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrell Horn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Whyte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daurie Westberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelysette Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean (I) Agurkis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Schetlizki
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jomarion Clark
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lessard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharina Budeshefsky
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda Velez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Collins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Michael
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Haynie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Lyall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Moody
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Paker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Obermuller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonda Schat-Wilk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Madden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Marquardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bays
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Main
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annabel Jacox
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Igyarto
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Decker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Iverson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aria (I) Ramirez Actouka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arie Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory (I) Iverson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aria Ramirez Actouka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hickam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lia Howard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Edwards
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Palmer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathon Costello
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly (I) Westberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Helm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Maltais
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Whiteman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edita Bernado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Tipton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manaois
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Ann Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Youngs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stephens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley (I) J. Marquardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Elefante
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ethridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Breden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelina Robles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Agurkis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daycee (I) R. Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie (I) Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameron Hambly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Crane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Morra
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Bertrand
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mayville
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Ross
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Rains
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Willard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sargema
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Victor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlie Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Westberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Howell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer (I) Velasco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maltais
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin McIrvin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Howard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin (I) McIrvin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollie Hambly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth (I) Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Jeffries
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Cleckley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bovey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Velasco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Whiteman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flossia Flournoy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malarie Bovey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Stephens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather (I) M. Bovey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Flournoy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuelle Holton
Represented By: