Helm et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Tonee Kinnamon, Bernie March, Marly Laborde, Merrissere Lovett, Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson, Johnny Rowe, Keisha V Griffin, Jeffery Langford, David Lee, Mark Oldfather, Valerie Holub, Desirree Morfitt-Shumway, Eduardo Ayuso, Bernadette Trujillo, Michael Speck, Bruce Nelson, Geehae Mothershed, Daniel Regis, Matthew Schrank, John Hetzler, Susan Wilson, Sherri Burton, Donna Flores, Jordan Hoyle, Sarah Birks, Danny Lamotte, Roger Holabeck, Donna Paradis, Kenneth Vossler, Keisha (I) V. Griffin, Sharon Surrat, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Michelle Dziduch, William (I) S. Adams, Valentino Trujillo, Marcia Whittaker, Paula Powers-Schilhab, Dwight Hunnicutt, Edward Whittaker, Sandra Bicknell, Ruth Hambly, Mary Dills, Stuart Hetzler, Paula Langford, Lester Bost, Jami Grangruth, Mary Lamotte, Timothy Northern, Morris Maniscalco, Karl Nathaniel, Christina Thompson, Daniel Garcia, Lawrence Fogell, Jr., Travis Baker, Daniel Hambly, Patricia Pierce, Jeffery Halligan, Josefina Garcia, George Shell, Leonard Cahall, Robert Followell, Kevin (I) Jackson, James Nagel, Edward Garcia, Richard Flores, Danny Thompson, Nicole Oldfather, Justin Frizzell, Ian Whittaker, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Jason P Smith, Dakota Phillips, Catherine Lina, Erickalynn Donaldson, Tammy Fogell, Christine Lemere, Charles Gould, Bonnie Herman, Ella Bryant, Shelia Klaric, Lushanda Leverette, Janet Silvis, Cynthia Maniscalco, Megan Sours, Daniel (I) Regis, Maurice Delage, Christine McDonald, Donna FORNEY, Anne Strasner, Matthew Whittaker, Yanna Hunter, Luz Garcia, David (I) M. Phillips, Matthew Trujillo, Brenda Ferjak, Dolores Carlson, Stephen Garcia, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Iolanda Russell, Alfredo K Garcia, Gralyn Surratt, Jason (I) P. Smith, Alfredo (I) K. Garcia, Laura Garcia, Stephanie Wilson, Christine Kander, Delinda Borjas Soler, Ethylin Washington, Kelly Chambers, Lynn Watters, Patrick Humphrey, Julian Hall, Todd Abrahamson, David Cowles, MARILEE HELM, Evelyn Kocsis, Patricia Nelson, Marcia (I) Whittaker, Joyce Seaman, JUNE MOSES, Cheri Patton, Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson, Gregory Miller, Linda Espinoza, Damaris Wallace, Emily Hetzler, Michael Owens, Emmanuel Gbobi, Gianna Hermann, Krissandra Wright, Mark Laborde, Kevin Jackson, Charles Hoyle, Jr, James Moore, Jr., Watters Lynn, Rebecca Phillips, Kent Washington, Rhonda Haynes, Christine (I) McDonald, John Van Wyngaardan, Robert Newborn, Joel Jenkins, Laura Baezdiaz, Benny Rivera, Joseph Lemere, Margaret Darnell, Donna (I) Forney, Antoinette Dell'Aquila, Jaime Smith, Sherry Morfitt-Shumway, Elizabeth Hollingsworth, Michael (I) Owens, Tim Schrank, Michelle Frizzell-Thompson, Angela Espinoza, Gloria Ayuso, Jolene Smith, Beulah Dziduch, Angela Hoyle, Tom Silvis, Marlene Romero-Phillips, Jaimeson Jones, George Klaric, Nannette Gracin, Linda Shell, Erickalynn (I) Donaldson, Jane Hilton, Roberta Nagel, Sylvia Garcia, Angelika Rowe, Gerald Aganon, Nada Rocha, Wayne Rockensock, Valarie Harris, Ashley Marquardt, Christopher Wilson, William S Adams, Cheryl Oldfather, Sandra Vossler, Michael Brook, Sandra Rockensock, Vanessa Hazard, Timothy Morrison, Lawrence Rocha, Suzan Jenkins, Drake Ferjak, David M. Phillips, Richard Stuckey, Jr., John Marquardt, Esther Villarreal, Hermilia Escamilla, Glenn Carlson, Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel, Megan (I) Sours and Kayla Hermann
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Chemguard, The 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., National Foam Inc, UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP and Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03401
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01192, Helm et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03401-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01192. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01192 RBJ, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Todd Abrahamson, William S Adams, William (I) S. Adams, Gerald Aganon, Eduardo Ayuso, Gloria Ayuso, Laura Baezdiaz, Travis Baker, Sandra Bicknell, Sarah Birks, Delinda Borjas Soler, Lester Bost, Michael Brook, Ella Bryant, Sherri Burton, Leonard Cahall, Dolores Carlson, Glenn Carlson, Kelly Chambers, David Cowles, Margaret Darnell, Maurice Delage, Antoinette Dell'Aquila, Mary Dills, Erickalynn Donaldson, Erickalynn (I) Donaldson, Beulah Dziduch, Michelle Dziduch, Hermilia Escamilla, Angela Espinoza, Linda Espinoza, Brenda Ferjak, Drake Ferjak, Donna Flores, Richard Flores, Tammy Fogell, Lawrence Fogell, Jr., Robert Followell, Donna Forney, Donna (I) Forney, Justin Frizzell, Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson, Alfredo K Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Edward Garcia, Josefina Garcia, Laura Garcia, Luz Garcia, Stephen Garcia, Sylvia Garcia, Alfredo (I) K. Garcia, Emmanuel Gbobi, Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel, Charles Gould, Nannette Gracin, Jami Grangruth, Keisha V Griffin, Keisha (I) V. Griffin, Julian Hall, Jeffery Halligan, Daniel Hambly, Ruth Hambly, Valarie Harris, Rhonda Haynes, Vanessa Hazard, Marilee Helm, Bonnie Herman, Gianna Hermann, Kayla Hermann, Emily Hetzler, John Hetzler, Stuart Hetzler, Jane Hilton, Roger Holabeck, Elizabeth Hollingsworth, Valerie Holub, Angela Hoyle, Jordan Hoyle, Charles Hoyle, Jr, Patrick Humphrey, Dwight Hunnicutt, Yanna Hunter, Kevin Jackson, Kevin (I) Jackson, Joel Jenkins, Suzan Jenkins, Jaimeson Jones, Christine Kander, Tonee Kinnamon, George Klaric, Shelia Klaric, Evelyn Kocsis, Mark Laborde, Marly Laborde, Danny Lamotte, Mary Lamotte, Jeffery Langford, Paula Langford, David Lee, Christine Lemere, Joseph Lemere, Lushanda Leverette, Catherine Lina, Merrissere Lovett, Watters Lynn, Cynthia Maniscalco, Morris Maniscalco, Bernie March, Ashley Marquardt, John Marquardt, Christine McDonald, Christine (I) McDonald, Gregory Miller, James Moore, Jr., Desirree Morfitt-Shumway, Sherry Morfitt-Shumway, Timothy Morrison, June Moses, Geehae Mothershed, James Nagel, Roberta Nagel, Karl Nathaniel, Bruce Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Robert Newborn, Timothy Northern, Cheryl Oldfather, Mark Oldfather, Nicole Oldfather, Michael Owens, Michael (I) Owens, Donna Paradis, Cheri Patton, Dakota Phillips, David M. Phillips, Rebecca Phillips, David (I) M. Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Patricia Pierce, Paula Powers-Schilhab, Daniel Regis, Daniel (I) Regis, Benny Rivera, Lawrence Rocha, Nada Rocha, Sandra Rockensock, Wayne Rockensock, Marlene Romero-Phillips, Angelika Rowe, Johnny Rowe, Iolanda Russell, Matthew Schrank, Tim Schrank, Joyce Seaman, George Shell, Linda Shell, Janet Silvis, Tom Silvis, Jaime Smith, Jason P Smith, Jolene Smith, Jason (I) P. Smith, Megan Sours, Megan (I) Sours, Michael Speck, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Anne Strasner, Richard Stuckey, Jr., Sharon Surrat, Gralyn Surratt, Christina Thompson, Danny Thompson, Bernadette Trujillo, Matthew Trujillo, Valentino Trujillo, John Van Wyngaardan, Esther Villarreal, Kenneth Vossler, Sandra Vossler, Damaris Wallace, Ethylin Washington, Kent Washington, Lynn Watters, Edward Whittaker, Ian Whittaker, Marcia Whittaker, Matthew Whittaker, Marcia (I) Whittaker, Christopher Wilson, Stephanie Wilson, Susan Wilson, Krissandra Wright. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Todd Abrahamson, William S Adams, William (I) S. Adams, Gerald Aganon, Eduardo Ayuso, Gloria Ayuso, Laura Baezdiaz, Travis Baker, Sandra Bicknell, Sarah Birks, Delinda Borjas Soler, Lester Bost, Michael Brook, Ella Bryant, Sherri Burton, Leonard Cahall, Dolores Carlson, Glenn Carlson, Kelly Chambers, David Cowles, Margaret Darnell, Maurice Delage, Antoinette Dell'Aquila, Mary Dills, Erickalynn Donaldson, Erickalynn (I) Donaldson, Beulah Dziduch, Michelle Dziduch, Hermilia Escamilla, Angela Espinoza, Linda Espinoza, Brenda Ferjak, Drake Ferjak, Donna Flores, Richard Flores, Tammy Fogell, Lawrence Fogell, Jr., Robert Followell, Donna Forney, Donna (I) Forney, Justin Frizzell, Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson, Alfredo K Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Edward Garcia, Josefina Garcia, Laura Garcia, Luz Garcia, Stephen Garcia, Sylvia Garcia, Alfredo (I) K. Garcia, Emmanuel Gbobi, Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel, Charles Gould, Nannette Gracin, Jami Grangruth, Keisha V Griffin, Keisha (I) V. Griffin, Julian Hall, Jeffery Halligan, Daniel Hambly, Ruth Hambly, Valarie Harris, Rhonda Haynes, Vanessa Hazard, Marilee Helm, Bonnie Herman, Gianna Hermann, Kayla Hermann, Emily Hetzler, John Hetzler, Stuart Hetzler, Jane Hilton, Roger Holabeck, Elizabeth Hollingsworth, Valerie Holub, Angela Hoyle, Jordan Hoyle, Charles Hoyle, Jr, Patrick Humphrey, Dwight Hunnicutt, Yanna Hunter, Kevin Jackson, Kevin (I) Jackson, Joel Jenkins, Suzan Jenkins, Jaimeson Jones, Christine Kander, Tonee Kinnamon, George Klaric, Shelia Klaric, Evelyn Kocsis, Mark Laborde, Marly Laborde, Danny Lamotte, Mary Lamotte, Jeffery Langford, Paula Langford, David Lee, Christine Lemere, Joseph Lemere, Lushanda Leverette, Catherine Lina, Merrissere Lovett, Watters Lynn, Cynthia Maniscalco, Morris Maniscalco, Bernie March, Ashley Marquardt, John Marquardt, Christine McDonald, Christine (I) McDonald, Gregory Miller, James Moore, Jr., Desirree Morfitt-Shumway, Sherry Morfitt-Shumway, Timothy Morrison, June Moses, Geehae Mothershed, James Nagel, Roberta Nagel, Karl Nathaniel, Bruce Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Robert Newborn, Timothy Northern, Cheryl Oldfather, Mark Oldfather, Nicole Oldfather, Michael Owens, Michael (I) Owens, Donna Paradis, Cheri Patton, Dakota Phillips, David M. Phillips, Rebecca Phillips, David (I) M. Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Patricia Pierce, Paula Powers-Schilhab, Daniel Regis, Daniel (I) Regis, Benny Rivera, Lawrence Rocha, Nada Rocha, Sandra Rockensock, Wayne Rockensock, Marlene Romero-Phillips, Angelika Rowe, Johnny Rowe, Iolanda Russell, Matthew Schrank, Tim Schrank, Joyce Seaman, George Shell, Linda Shell, Janet Silvis, Tom Silvis, Jaime Smith, Jason P Smith, Jolene Smith, Jason (I) P. Smith, Megan Sours, Megan (I) Sours, Michael Speck, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Anne Strasner, Richard Stuckey, Jr., Sharon Surrat, Gralyn Surratt, Christina Thompson, Danny Thompson, Bernadette Trujillo, Matthew Trujillo, Valentino Trujillo, John Van Wyngaardan, Esther Villarreal, Kenneth Vossler, Sandra Vossler, Damaris Wallace, Ethylin Washington, Kent Washington, Lynn Watters, Edward Whittaker, Ian Whittaker, Marcia Whittaker, Matthew Whittaker, Marcia (I) Whittaker, Christopher Wilson, Stephanie Wilson, Susan Wilson, Krissandra Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDi
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joh
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stuart Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stuart Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jane Hilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jane Hilton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roger Holabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roger Holabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Hollingsworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Hollingsworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Holub(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Holub(pty:pla)
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Todd Abrahamson, William S Adams, William (I) S. Adams, Gerald Aganon, Eduardo Ayuso, Gloria Ayuso, Laura Baezdiaz, Travis Baker, Sandra Bicknell, Sarah Birks, Delinda Borjas Soler, Lester Bost, Michael Brook, Ella Bryant, Sherri Burton, Leonard Cahall, Dolores Carlson, Glenn Carlson, Kelly Chambers, David Cowles, Margaret Darnell, Maurice Delage, Antoinette Dell'Aquila, Mary Dills, Erickalynn Donaldson, Erickalynn (I) Donaldson, Beulah Dziduch, Michelle Dziduch, Hermilia Escamilla, Angela Espinoza, Linda Espinoza, Brenda Ferjak, Drake Ferjak, Donna Flores, Richard Flores, Tammy Fogell, Lawrence Fogell, Jr., Robert Followell, Donna Forney, Donna (I) Forney, Justin Frizzell, Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson, Alfredo K Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Edward Garcia, Josefina Garcia, Laura Garcia, Luz Garcia, Stephen Garcia, Sylvia Garcia, Alfredo (I) K. Garcia, Emmanuel Gbobi, Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel, Charles Gould, Nannette Gracin, Jami Grangruth, Keisha V Griffin, Keisha (I) V. Griffin, Julian Hall, Jeffery Halligan, Daniel Hambly, Ruth Hambly, Valarie Harris, Rhonda Haynes, Vanessa Hazard, Marilee Helm, Bonnie Herman, Gianna Hermann, Kayla Hermann, Emily Hetzler, John Hetzler, Stuart Hetzler, Jane Hilton, Roger Holabeck, Elizabeth Hollingsworth, Valerie Holub, Angela Hoyle, Jordan Hoyle, Charles Hoyle, Jr, Patrick Humphrey, Dwight Hunnicutt, Yanna Hunter, Kevin Jackson, Kevin (I) Jackson, Joel Jenkins, Suzan Jenkins, Jaimeson Jones, Christine Kander, Tonee Kinnamon, George Klaric, Shelia Klaric, Evelyn Kocsis, Mark Laborde, Marly Laborde, Danny Lamotte, Mary Lamotte, Jeffery Langford, Paula Langford, David Lee, Christine Lemere, Joseph Lemere, Lushanda Leverette, Catherine Lina, Merrissere Lovett, Watters Lynn, Cynthia Maniscalco, Morris Maniscalco, Bernie March, Ashley Marquardt, John Marquardt, Christine McDonald, Christine (I) McDonald, Gregory Miller, James Moore, Jr., Desirree Morfitt-Shumway, Sherry Morfitt-Shumway, Timothy Morrison, June Moses, Geehae Mothershed, James Nagel, Roberta Nagel, Karl Nathaniel, Bruce Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Robert Newborn, Timothy Northern, Cheryl Oldfather, Mark Oldfather, Nicole Oldfather, Michael Owens, Michael (I) Owens, Donna Paradis, Cheri Patton, Dakota Phillips, David M. Phillips, Rebecca Phillips, David (I) M. Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Patricia Pierce, Paula Powers-Schilhab, Daniel Regis, Daniel (I) Regis, Benny Rivera, Lawrence Rocha, Nada Rocha, Sandra Rockensock, Wayne Rockensock, Marlene Romero-Phillips, Angelika Rowe, Johnny Rowe, Iolanda Russell, Matthew Schrank, Tim Schrank, Joyce Seaman, George Shell, Linda Shell, Janet Silvis, Tom Silvis, Jaime Smith, Jason P Smith, Jolene Smith, Jason (I) P. Smith, Megan Sours, Megan (I) Sours, Michael Speck, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Anne Strasner, Richard Stuckey, Jr., Sharon Surrat, Gralyn Surratt, Christina Thompson, Danny Thompson, Bernadette Trujillo, Matthew Trujillo, Valentino Trujillo, John Van Wyngaardan, Esther Villarreal, Kenneth Vossler, Sandra Vossler, Damaris Wallace, Ethylin Washington, Kent Washington, Lynn Watters, Edward Whittaker, Ian Whittaker, Marcia Whittaker, Matthew Whittaker, Marcia (I) Whittaker, Christopher Wilson, Stephanie Wilson, Susan Wilson, Krissandra Wright. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Todd Abrahamson, William S Adams, William (I) S. Adams, Gerald Aganon, Eduardo Ayuso, Gloria Ayuso, Laura Baezdiaz, Travis Baker, Sandra Bicknell, Sarah Birks, Delinda Borjas Soler, Lester Bost, Michael Brook, Ella Bryant, Sherri Burton, Leonard Cahall, Dolores Carlson, Glenn Carlson, Kelly Chambers, David Cowles, Margaret Darnell, Maurice Delage, Antoinette Dell'Aquila, Mary Dills, Erickalynn Donaldson, Erickalynn (I) Donaldson, Beulah Dziduch, Michelle Dziduch, Hermilia Escamilla, Angela Espinoza, Linda Espinoza, Brenda Ferjak, Drake Ferjak, Donna Flores, Richard Flores, Tammy Fogell, Lawrence Fogell, Jr., Robert Followell, Donna Forney, Donna (I) Forney, Justin Frizzell, Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle Frizzell-Thompson, Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson, Alfredo K Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Edward Garcia, Josefina Garcia, Laura Garcia, Luz Garcia, Stephen Garcia, Sylvia Garcia, Alfredo (I) K. Garcia, Emmanuel Gbobi, Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel, Charles Gould, Nannette Gracin, Jami Grangruth, Keisha V Griffin, Keisha (I) V. Griffin, Julian Hall, Jeffery Halligan, Daniel Hambly, Ruth Hambly, Valarie Harris, Rhonda Haynes, Vanessa Hazard, Marilee Helm, Bonnie Herman, Gianna Hermann, Kayla Hermann, Emily Hetzler, John Hetzler, Stuart Hetzler, Jane Hilton, Roger Holabeck, Elizabeth Hollingsworth, Valerie Holub, Angela Hoyle, Jordan Hoyle, Charles Hoyle, Jr, Patrick Humphrey, Dwight Hunnicutt, Yanna Hunter, Kevin Jackson, Kevin (I) Jackson, Joel Jenkins, Suzan Jenkins, Jaimeson Jones, Christine Kander, Tonee Kinnamon, George Klaric, Shelia Klaric, Evelyn Kocsis, Mark Laborde, Marly Laborde, Danny Lamotte, Mary Lamotte, Jeffery Langford, Paula Langford, David Lee, Christine Lemere, Joseph Lemere, Lushanda Leverette, Catherine Lina, Merrissere Lovett, Watters Lynn, Cynthia Maniscalco, Morris Maniscalco, Bernie March, Ashley Marquardt, John Marquardt, Christine McDonald, Christine (I) McDonald, Gregory Miller, James Moore, Jr., Desirree Morfitt-Shumway, Sherry Morfitt-Shumway, Timothy Morrison, June Moses, Geehae Mothershed, James Nagel, Roberta Nagel, Karl Nathaniel, Bruce Nelson, Patricia Nelson, Robert Newborn, Timothy Northern, Cheryl Oldfather, Mark Oldfather, Nicole Oldfather, Michael Owens, Michael (I) Owens, Donna Paradis, Cheri Patton, Dakota Phillips, David M. Phillips, Rebecca Phillips, David (I) M. Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Patricia Pierce, Paula Powers-Schilhab, Daniel Regis, Daniel (I) Regis, Benny Rivera, Lawrence Rocha, Nada Rocha, Sandra Rockensock, Wayne Rockensock, Marlene Romero-Phillips, Angelika Rowe, Johnny Rowe, Iolanda Russell, Matthew Schrank, Tim Schrank, Joyce Seaman, George Shell, Linda Shell, Janet Silvis, Tom Silvis, Jaime Smith, Jason P Smith, Jolene Smith, Jason (I) P. Smith, Megan Sours, Megan (I) Sours, Michael Speck, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Anne Strasner, Richard Stuckey, Jr., Sharon Surrat, Gralyn Surratt, Christina Thompson, Danny Thompson, Bernadette Trujillo, Matthew Trujillo, Valentino Trujillo, John Van Wyngaardan, Esther Villarreal, Kenneth Vossler, Sandra Vossler, Damaris Wallace, Ethylin Washington, Kent Washington, Lynn Watters, Edward Whittaker, Ian Whittaker, Marcia Whittaker, Matthew Whittaker, Marcia (I) Whittaker, Christopher Wilson, Stephanie Wilson, Susan Wilson, Krissandra Wright (Attachments: #1 redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William (I) S. Adams (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Erickalynn (I) Donaldson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lawrence Fogell, Jr. (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna (I) Forney (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfredo (I) K. Garcia (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Keisha (I) V. Griffin (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marilee Helm(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bonnie Herman (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emily Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stuart Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stuart Hetzler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jane Hilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jane Hilton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roger Holabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roger Holabeck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Hollingsworth(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party
May 17, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rsams, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Patrick J. Lanciotti. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc, Kidde PLC, Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6105658)Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party E. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party E. A.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Todd Abrahamson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William S Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Aganon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eduardo Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gloria Ayuso(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Baezdiaz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Travis Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Bicknell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delinda Borjas Soler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lester Bost(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ella Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherri Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leonard Cahall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dolores Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glenn Carlson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Chambers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Cowles(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party E. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party E. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Margaret Darnell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Maurice Delage(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antoinette Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mary Dills(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erickalynn Donaldson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beulah Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hermilia Escamilla(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party D. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party D. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna FORNEY(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna FORNEY(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lawrence Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy Fogell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Frizzell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party K. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party K. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party T. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party T. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfredo K Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edward Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josefina Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Luz Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sylvia Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emmanuel Gbobi(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nannette Gracin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jami Grangruth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keisha V Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party MARILEE HELM(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party MARILEE HELM(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julian Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffery Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruth Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valarie Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vanessa Hazard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bonnie Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bonnie Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gianna Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayla Hermann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti adde

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helm et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonee Kinnamon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie March
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marly Laborde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrissere Lovett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) R. Frizzell-Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Rowe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha V Griffin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Langford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Oldfather
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Holub
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desirree Morfitt-Shumway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Ayuso
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Speck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Nelson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geehae Mothershed
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Regis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Schrank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hetzler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Burton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Flores
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Hoyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Birks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lamotte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Holabeck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Paradis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Vossler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha (I) V. Griffin
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Surrat
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Phillips
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Dziduch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William (I) S. Adams
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentino Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Powers-Schilhab
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Hunnicutt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Whittaker
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bicknell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Hambly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dills
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Hetzler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Langford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Bost
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Grangruth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lamotte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Northern
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Maniscalco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Nathaniel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Fogell, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hambly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Pierce
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Halligan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Shell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Cahall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Followell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin (I) Jackson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nagel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Flores
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Oldfather
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Frizzell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason P Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lina
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erickalynn Donaldson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Fogell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Lemere
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gould
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Herman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Bryant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Klaric
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lushanda Leverette
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Silvis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Maniscalco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Sours
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel (I) Regis
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Delage
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine McDonald
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna FORNEY
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Strasner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanna Hunter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David (I) M. Phillips
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Ferjak
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Carlson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iolanda Russell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo K Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gralyn Surratt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason (I) P. Smith
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo (I) K. Garcia
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Kander
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delinda Borjas Soler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethylin Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Chambers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Watters
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Humphrey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Abrahamson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cowles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILEE HELM
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Kocsis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Nelson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia (I) Whittaker
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Seaman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE MOSES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Patton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R Frizzell-Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Wallace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Hetzler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Owens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Gbobi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianna Hermann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krissandra Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Laborde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hoyle, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watters Lynn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Haynes
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine (I) McDonald
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Van Wyngaardan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Newborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Jenkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Baezdiaz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Rivera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lemere
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Darnell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna (I) Forney
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Dell'Aquila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Morfitt-Shumway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hollingsworth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael (I) Owens
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schrank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Frizzell-Thompson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ayuso
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beulah Dziduch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hoyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Silvis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Romero-Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimeson Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Klaric
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette Gracin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Shell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erickalynn (I) Donaldson
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Hilton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Nagel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelika Rowe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Aganon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nada Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rockensock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Marquardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S Adams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Oldfather
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Vossler
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rockensock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Hazard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Morrison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzan Jenkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Ferjak
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stuckey, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Marquardt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Villarreal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermilia Escamilla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Carlson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adebola Gbobi-Emmanuel
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan (I) Sours
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Hermann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?