Dilwood et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Sally White, Roberta Hassman, Elizabeth Foster, Linda (I) Mitchell, Steven Swonger, Katie Poe, Walter Brettschneider, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, James Kuznicki, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Tyber Lieser, Joseph Kennedy, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Phillip Franco, Alexander Miller, Danny McClatcher, Zachary Tokach, Randy Lynn, Gerry (I) Martinez, Amber Babers, Michelle Arties, Paula Smith, Joshua (I) Kyler, Donna Hearn, Jacob Juarez, Jeffery Foster, Sherry Cox, Hubert Hoh, Gregory Davis, Jimmie Root, Ron Henard, Fidelina Franco, Nick Powell, Susanne Schwalbe, Kathryn McNamara, Anthony Betancourt, Analisa Whittaker, Richard White, Brande Ford, Rachel Fedelin, Deborah Cuchiara, Julia (I) Swonger, Lisa Garcia, Derrick Cox, Robert Campbell, George Jordan, John Tiatia, Annamarie Quijada, Joseph Dilwood, Peter Cano, Sonia MoneyPenny, Joshua Hearn, James Thomas, Keipa Peoples, Joseph Glass, Augusta Jordan, Ronald Ingram, Jacob Maynard, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Nickey Clore, Ronald Wilson, Thomas (I) Lawland, Michelle Sohlberg, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Robert Wekamp, Jennifer Bisping, Gina Goodloe, Renee Cooper, Yong Chi Mathews, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Shirley Peterson, Merlinda Juarez, Marlies Glass, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Barbara Gross, Carl Wooldridge, Meren Selober, Kathleen Lewis, Sharon Henard, Celia Ancheta, Charlene Gennitti, Sally Arnett, Marjorie Brandon, William Wallace, Michael Borghi, Louis Mathews, Keith King, James Gosselin, Phillip Thomas, II, Derrick Knight, Donna Van Hoose, Brandy Crisman, Sherry Hunter, Sharla Hernandez, Libran Selfe, Linda Frazier, Frances Bedel, Susan Wekamp, Patrick Gorman, Samanthia Boyd, Steve Crump, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Daniel Peterson, Sherry (I) Hunter, Laura Gennitti, Stewart Hearn, Tracey (I) Thomas, Richard McNamara, Richard Floyd, Michelle Wooldridge, Paul Fedelin, Josephine Lejeune, Eugenie Root, Joseph Donofrio, Barbara Hines, Jamie (I) Gibson, Elizabeth Roberts, Brooke (I) Sailor, Alyssa Roger, Larry Shea, Tyrell Nakila, Jeremy Riffe, Thomas Martinez, Brooke Sailor, Karl Studdard, Mayo Arties, David Rodriguez, Jr, Ida Dilwood, Gregory Griffith, Sandra (I) Porter, Gerry Martinez, Valerie Selfe, Stephanie Jones, Todd Evers, Roland LeJeune, Julia Swonger, Ryan Neighly, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Amanda Shea, Sherri Witcher, Linda Pressey, Daniel Martinez, Chistopher Dike, Kristine Evers, Linda Mitchell, Terry Hassman, Selena Lichtenberg, Marion Martinez, Ronald Jefferson, Kathleen Groves, Joanna Kyler, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Ronald Martinez, Michael Sabo, Elmer Gambala, Sandra Porter, Sunshyne Powell, Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Edwin Worrell, Colleen Pustola, Ryan Carli, Chad Myrom, Phillip Harman, Amber Ford, Carolyn McQueen, Christopher Smith, diane martinez, Thomas Lawland, Robert Young, Tonya Dorsey, Seth McCargar, Karl (I) Studdard, Aaron Ewert, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Christopher Bedel, Michael Peterson, Jamie Gibson, Raymond Breckenridge, Kelly Vigil, Johnny Garcia, Phillip Goodloe, II, Joniqua Cole, Sven Schwalbe, Tracey Thomas, Brittany Allwein, Lesley Bursha, Alexandria Ohmes, Fidelina (I) Franco, Katherine Baker, Clinton Rolf, Mario Perez, Dominique Wallace, Stephanie Studdard, Michael Hall, Dedrick Papproth, Richard Colegrove, Joshua Kyler and Susanne (I) Schwalbe
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., National Foam Inc, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03407
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01202, Dilwood et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03407-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01202. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01202 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Anthony Betancourt, Jennifer Bisping, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Michael Borghi, Samanthia Boyd, Marjorie Brandon, Raymond Breckenridge, Walter Brettschneider, Lesley Bursha, Robert Campbell, Peter Cano, Ryan Carli, Nickey Clore, Joniqua Cole, Richard Colegrove, Renee Cooper, Derrick Cox, Sherry Cox, Brandy Crisman, Steve Crump, Deborah Cuchiara, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, Gregory Davis, Chistopher Dike, Ida Dilwood, Joseph Dilwood, Joseph Donofrio, Tonya Dorsey, Kristine Evers, Todd Evers, Aaron Ewert, Paul Fedelin, Rachel Fedelin, Richard Floyd, Amber Ford, Brande Ford, Elizabeth Foster, Jeffery Foster, Fidelina Franco, Fidelina (I) Franco, Phillip Franco, Linda Frazier, Elmer Gambala, Johnny Garcia, Lisa Garcia, Charlene Gennitti, Laura Gennitti, Jamie Gibson, Jamie (I) Gibson, Joseph Glass, Marlies Glass, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Gina Goodloe, Phillip Goodloe, II, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Patrick Gorman, James Gosselin, Gregory Griffith, Barbara Gross, Kathleen Groves, Michael Hall, Phillip Harman, Roberta Hassman, Terry Hassman, Donna Hearn, Joshua Hearn, Stewart Hearn, Ron Henard, Sharon Henard, Sharla Hernandez, Barbara Hines, Hubert Hoh, Sherry Hunter, Sherry (I) Hunter, Ronald Ingram, Ronald Jefferson, Stephanie Jones, Augusta Jordan, George Jordan, Jacob Juarez, Merlinda Juarez, Joseph Kennedy, Keith King, Derrick Knight, James Kuznicki, Joanna Kyler, Joshua Kyler, Joshua (I) Kyler, Thomas Lawland, Thomas (I) Lawland, Roland LeJeune, Josephine Lejeune, Kathleen Lewis, Selena Lichtenberg, Tyber Lieser, Randy Lynn, Daniel Martinez, Diane Martinez, Gerry Martinez, Gerry (I) Martinez, Marion Martinez, Ronald Martinez, Brittany Allwein, Celia Ancheta, Sally Arnett, Mayo Arties, Michelle Arties, Amber Babers, Katherine Baker, Christopher Bedel, Frances Bedel, Thomas Martinez, Louis Mathews, Yong Chi Mathews, Jacob Maynard, Seth McCargar, Danny McClatcher, Kathryn McNamara, Richard McNamara, Carolyn McQueen, Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Alexander Miller, Linda Mitchell, Linda (I) Mitchell, Sonia MoneyPenny, Chad Myrom, Tyrell Nakila, Ryan Neighly, Alexandria Ohmes, Dedrick Papproth, Keipa Peoples, Mario Perez, Daniel Peterson, Michael Peterson, Shirley Peterson, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Katie Poe, Sandra Porter, Sandra (I) Porter, Nick Powell, Sunshyne Powell, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Linda Pressey, Colleen Pustola, Annamarie Quijada, Jeremy Riffe, Elizabeth Roberts, David Rodriguez, Jr, Alyssa Roger, Clinton Rolf, Eugenie Root, Jimmie Root, Michael Sabo, Brooke Sailor, Brooke (I) Sailor, Susanne Schwalbe, Sven Schwalbe, Susanne (I) Schwalbe, Libran Selfe, Valerie Selfe, Meren Selober, Amanda Shea, Larry Shea, Christopher Smith, Paula Smith, Michelle Sohlberg, Karl Studdard, Stephanie Studdard, Karl (I) Studdard, Julia Swonger, Steven Swonger, Julia (I) Swonger, James Thomas, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Tracey Thomas, Tracey (I) Thomas, Phillip Thomas, II, John Tiatia, Zachary Tokach, Donna Van Hoose, Kelly Vigil, Dominique Wallace, William Wallace, Robert Wekamp, Susan Wekamp, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Richard White, Sally White, Analisa Whittaker, Ronald Wilson, Sherri Witcher, Carl Wooldridge, Michelle Wooldridge, Edwin Worrell, Robert Young. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Reassignment. The above-captioned matter is REASSIGNED to Judge Jackson for all purposes. All future filings in this action shall bear the case number 18-cv-1202-RBJ-KMT. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/18/2018. (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/28/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman filed by Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Alyssa Roger, Richard McNamara, Aaron Ewert, Thomas Martinez, Tracey (I) Thomas, Colleen Pustola, Celia Ancheta, Michelle Arties, Daniel Martinez, Kathleen Groves, Lisa Garcia, Julia Swonger, Robert Campbell, Frances Bedel, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Selena Lichtenberg, Annamarie Quijada, Ida Dilwood, Jeremy Riffe, Linda (I) Mitchell, Danny McClatcher, Tyrell Nakila, Fidelina (I) Franco, Louis Mathews, Brande Ford, Rachel Fedelin, Fidelina Franco, Phillip Franco, Donna Hearn, Meren Selober, James Thomas, Christopher Smith, Susanne (I) Schwalbe, Jennifer Bisping, Stephanie Studdard, Sonia MoneyPenny, Robert Wekamp, Mario Perez, Sunshyne Powell, Phillip Thomas, II, Marjorie Brandon, Charlene Gennitti, Ronald Wilson, George Jordan, Linda Mitchell, Brittany Allwein, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, Sandra Porter, Alexandria Ohmes, Sherry Hunter, Roberta Hassman, Paula Smith, Sharla Hernandez, Karl (I) Studdard, Elmer Gambala, Brooke Sailor, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Sandra (I) Porter, Sven Schwalbe, Sherry (I) Hunter, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Chistopher Dike, Robert Young, Paul Fedelin, Tyber Lieser, Alexander Miller, Carolyn McQueen, Dominique Wallace, Richard Colegrove, Walter Brettschneider, Anthony Betancourt, Joshua Hearn, Chad Myrom, Michael Hall, Sally Arnett, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Kristine Evers, Gerry Martinez, Keipa Peoples, Josephine Lejeune, Sharon Henard, Joanna Kyler, Joseph Donofrio, William Wallace, Johnny Garcia, Brandy Crisman, Marion Martinez, Samanthia Boyd, Raymond Breckenridge, Diane Martinez, Joseph Dilwood, Michael Peterson, Clinton Rolf, Keith King, Augusta Jordan, Jimmie Root, Brooke (I) Sailor, Todd Evers, James Kuznicki, Tracey Thomas, Nick Powell, Gregory Griffith, Libran Selfe, Steven Swonger, David Rodriguez, Jr, Stewart Hearn, Richard Floyd, Hubert Hoh, Zachary Tokach, Valerie Selfe, Steve Crump, Marlies Glass, Kathryn McNamara, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Michael Sabo, Linda Frazier, Linda Pressey, Michael Borghi, Susanne Schwalbe, Amber Babers, Joseph Kennedy, Amber Ford, Jacob Maynard, Ronald Martinez, Sally White, Jacob Juarez, Jamie Gibson, Analisa Whittaker, Mayo Arties, Daniel Peterson, Katherine Baker, Phillip Goodloe, II, Phillip Harman, John Tiatia, Donna Van Hoose, Derrick Knight, Amanda Shea, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Elizabeth Roberts, Julia (I) Swonger, Joshua Kyler, Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Susan Wekamp, Edwin Worrell, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Joniqua Cole, Dedrick Papproth, Richard White, Shirley Peterson, Sherry Cox, Thomas (I) Lawland, Joseph Glass, Jeffery Foster, Tonya Dorsey, Gregory Davis, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Seth McCargar, Elizabeth Foster, Patrick Gorman, Jamie (I) Gibson, Carl Wooldridge, Yong Chi Mathews, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Roland LeJeune, Renee Cooper, Katie Poe, Thomas Lawland, Ron Henard, Laura Gennitti, Terry Hassman, Deborah Cuchiara, Ryan Neighly, Kathleen Lewis, Ronald Ingram, Peter Cano, Sherri Witcher, Lesley Bursha, Ryan Carli, Barbara Hines, Nickey Clore, Karl Studdard, Kelly Vigil, Christopher Bedel, Ronald Jefferson, Michelle Wooldridge, Michelle Sohlberg, Derrick Cox, Larry Shea, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Stephanie Jones, Merlinda Juarez, Gina Goodloe, Joshua (I) Kyler, Barbara Gross, Eugenie Root, James Gosselin, Gerry (I) Martinez, Randy Lynn. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/28/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Anthony Betancourt, Jennifer Bisping, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Michael Borghi, Samanthia Boyd, Marjorie Brandon, Raymond Breckenridge, Walter Brettschneider, Lesley Bursha, Robert Campbell, Peter Cano, Ryan Carli, Nickey Clore, Joniqua Cole, Richard Colegrove, Renee Cooper, Derrick Cox, Sherry Cox, Brandy Crisman, Steve Crump, Deborah Cuchiara, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, Gregory Davis, Chistopher Dike, Ida Dilwood, Joseph Dilwood, Joseph Donofrio, Tonya Dorsey, Kristine Evers, Todd Evers, Aaron Ewert, Paul Fedelin, Rachel Fedelin, Richard Floyd, Amber Ford, Brande Ford, Elizabeth Foster, Jeffery Foster, Fidelina Franco, Fidelina (I) Franco, Phillip Franco, Linda Frazier, Elmer Gambala, Johnny Garcia, Lisa Garcia, Charlene Gennitti, Laura Gennitti, Jamie Gibson, Jamie (I) Gibson, Joseph Glass, Marlies Glass, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Gina Goodloe, Phillip Goodloe, II, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Patrick Gorman, James Gosselin, Gregory Griffith, Barbara Gross, Kathleen Groves, Michael Hall, Phillip Harman, Roberta Hassman, Terry Hassman, Donna Hearn, Joshua Hearn, Stewart Hearn, Ron Henard, Sharon Henard, Sharla Hernandez, Barbara Hines, Hubert Hoh, Sherry Hunter, Sherry (I) Hunter, Ronald Ingram, Ronald Jefferson, Stephanie Jones, Augusta Jordan, George Jordan, Jacob Juarez, Merlinda Juarez, Joseph Kennedy, Keith King, Derrick Knight, James Kuznicki, Joanna Kyler, Joshua Kyler, Joshua (I) Kyler, Thomas Lawland, Thomas (I) Lawland, Roland LeJeune, Josephine Lejeune, Kathleen Lewis, Selena Lichtenberg, Tyber Lieser, Randy Lynn, Daniel Martinez, Diane Martinez, Gerry Martinez, Gerry (I) Martinez, Marion Martinez, Ronald Martinez, Brittany Allwein, Celia Ancheta, Sally Arnett, Mayo Arties, Michelle Arties, Amber Babers, Katherine Baker, Christopher Bedel, Frances Bedel, Thomas Martinez, Louis Mathews, Yong Chi Mathews, Jacob Maynard, Seth McCargar, Danny McClatcher, Kathryn McNamara, Richard McNamara, Carolyn McQueen, Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Alexander Miller, Linda Mitchell, Linda (I) Mitchell, Sonia MoneyPenny, Chad Myrom, Tyrell Nakila, Ryan Neighly, Alexandria Ohmes, Dedrick Papproth, Keipa Peoples, Mario Perez, Daniel Peterson, Michael Peterson, Shirley Peterson, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Katie Poe, Sandra Porter, Sandra (I) Porter, Nick Powell, Sunshyne Powell, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Linda Pressey, Colleen Pustola, Annamarie Quijada, Jeremy Riffe, Elizabeth Roberts, David Rodriguez, Jr, Alyssa Roger, Clinton Rolf, Eugenie Root, Jimmie Root, Michael Sabo, Brooke Sailor, Brooke (I) Sailor, Susanne Schwalbe, Sven Schwalbe, Susanne (I) Schwalbe, Libran Selfe, Valerie Selfe, Meren Selober, Amanda Shea, Larry Shea, Christopher Smith, Paula Smith, Michelle Sohlberg, Karl Studdard, Stephanie Studdard, Karl (I) Studdard, Julia Swonger, Steven Swonger, Julia (I) Swonger, James Thomas, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Tracey Thomas, Tracey (I) Thomas, Phillip Thomas, II, John Tiatia, Zachary Tokach, Donna Van Hoose, Kelly Vigil, Dominique Wallace, William Wallace, Robert Wekamp, Susan Wekamp, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Richard White, Sally White, Analisa Whittaker, Ronald Wilson, Sherri Witcher, Carl Wooldridge, Michelle Wooldridge, Edwin Worrell, Robert Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to p
June 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney
June 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Barbara Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Barbara Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hubert Hoh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hubert Hoh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry (I) Hunter (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry (I) Hunter (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronald Ingram(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronald Ingram(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronald Jefferson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ronal
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 6/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #7 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Anthony Betancourt, Jennifer Bisping, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Michael Borghi, Samanthia Boyd, Marjorie Brandon, Raymond Breckenridge, Walter Brettschneider, Lesley Bursha, Robert Campbell, Peter Cano, Ryan Carli, Nickey Clore, Joniqua Cole, Richard Colegrove, Renee Cooper, Derrick Cox, Sherry Cox, Brandy Crisman, Steve Crump, Deborah Cuchiara, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, Gregory Davis, Chistopher Dike, Ida Dilwood, Joseph Dilwood, Joseph Donofrio, Tonya Dorsey, Kristine Evers, Todd Evers, Aaron Ewert, Paul Fedelin, Rachel Fedelin, Richard Floyd, Amber Ford, Brande Ford, Elizabeth Foster, Jeffery Foster, Fidelina Franco, Fidelina (I) Franco, Phillip Franco, Linda Frazier, Elmer Gambala, Johnny Garcia, Lisa Garcia, Charlene Gennitti, Laura Gennitti, Jamie Gibson, Jamie (I) Gibson, Joseph Glass, Marlies Glass, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Gina Goodloe, Phillip Goodloe, II, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Patrick Gorman, James Gosselin, Gregory Griffith, Barbara Gross, Kathleen Groves, Michael Hall, Phillip Harman, Roberta Hassman, Terry Hassman, Donna Hearn, Joshua Hearn, Stewart Hearn, Ron Henard, Sharon Henard, Sharla Hernandez, Barbara Hines, Hubert Hoh, Sherry Hunter, Sherry (I) Hunter, Ronald Ingram, Ronald Jefferson, Stephanie Jones, Augusta Jordan, George Jordan, Jacob Juarez, Merlinda Juarez, Joseph Kennedy, Keith King, Derrick Knight, James Kuznicki, Joanna Kyler, Joshua Kyler, Joshua (I) Kyler, Thomas Lawland, Thomas (I) Lawland, Roland LeJeune, Josephine Lejeune, Kathleen Lewis, Selena Lichtenberg, Tyber Lieser, Randy Lynn, Daniel Martinez, Diane Martinez, Gerry Martinez, Gerry (I) Martinez, Marion Martinez, Ronald Martinez, Brittany Allwein, Celia Ancheta, Sally Arnett, Mayo Arties, Michelle Arties, Amber Babers, Katherine Baker, Christopher Bedel, Frances Bedel, Thomas Martinez, Louis Mathews, Yong Chi Mathews, Jacob Maynard, Seth McCargar, Danny McClatcher, Kathryn McNamara, Richard McNamara, Carolyn McQueen, Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Alexander Miller, Linda Mitchell, Linda (I) Mitchell, Sonia MoneyPenny, Chad Myrom, Tyrell Nakila, Ryan Neighly, Alexandria Ohmes, Dedrick Papproth, Keipa Peoples, Mario Perez, Daniel Peterson, Michael Peterson, Shirley Peterson, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Katie Poe, Sandra Porter, Sandra (I) Porter, Nick Powell, Sunshyne Powell, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Linda Pressey, Colleen Pustola, Annamarie Quijada, Jeremy Riffe, Elizabeth Roberts, David Rodriguez, Jr, Alyssa Roger, Clinton Rolf, Eugenie Root, Jimmie Root, Michael Sabo, Brooke Sailor, Brooke (I) Sailor, Susanne Schwalbe, Sven Schwalbe, Susanne (I) Schwalbe, Libran Selfe, Valerie Selfe, Meren Selober, Amanda Shea, Larry Shea, Christopher Smith, Paula Smith, Michelle Sohlberg, Karl Studdard, Stephanie Studdard, Karl (I) Studdard, Julia Swonger, Steven Swonger, Julia (I) Swonger, James Thomas, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Tracey Thomas, Tracey (I) Thomas, Phillip Thomas, II, John Tiatia, Zachary Tokach, Donna Van Hoose, Kelly Vigil, Dominique Wallace, William Wallace, Robert Wekamp, Susan Wekamp, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Richard White, Sally White, Analisa Whittaker, Ronald Wilson, Sherri Witcher, Carl Wooldridge, Michelle Wooldridge, Edwin Worrell, Robert Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #8 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading, filed by attorney Paul J. Napoli. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Anthony Betancourt, Jennifer Bisping, Bobbie Blanco-Roper, Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper, Michael Borghi, Samanthia Boyd, Marjorie Brandon, Raymond Breckenridge, Walter Brettschneider, Lesley Bursha, Robert Campbell, Peter Cano, Ryan Carli, Nickey Clore, Joniqua Cole, Richard Colegrove, Renee Cooper, Derrick Cox, Sherry Cox, Brandy Crisman, Steve Crump, Deborah Cuchiara, Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez, Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez, Gregory Davis, Chistopher Dike, Ida Dilwood, Joseph Dilwood, Joseph Donofrio, Tonya Dorsey, Kristine Evers, Todd Evers, Aaron Ewert, Paul Fedelin, Rachel Fedelin, Richard Floyd, Amber Ford, Brande Ford, Elizabeth Foster, Jeffery Foster, Fidelina Franco, Fidelina (I) Franco, Phillip Franco, Linda Frazier, Elmer Gambala, Johnny Garcia, Lisa Garcia, Charlene Gennitti, Laura Gennitti, Jamie Gibson, Jamie (I) Gibson, Joseph Glass, Marlies Glass, Michelle A. Gonzalez, Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez, Gina Goodloe, Phillip Goodloe, II, Jerome Gordon, Sr., Patrick Gorman, James Gosselin, Gregory Griffith, Barbara Gross, Kathleen Groves, Michael Hall, Phillip Harman, Roberta Hassman, Terry Hassman, Donna Hearn, Joshua Hearn, Stewart Hearn, Ron Henard, Sharon Henard, Sharla Hernandez, Barbara Hines, Hubert Hoh, Sherry Hunter, Sherry (I) Hunter, Ronald Ingram, Ronald Jefferson, Stephanie Jones, Augusta Jordan, George Jordan, Jacob Juarez, Merlinda Juarez, Joseph Kennedy, Keith King, Derrick Knight, James Kuznicki, Joanna Kyler, Joshua Kyler, Joshua (I) Kyler, Thomas Lawland, Thomas (I) Lawland, Roland LeJeune, Josephine Lejeune, Kathleen Lewis, Selena Lichtenberg, Tyber Lieser, Randy Lynn, Daniel Martinez, Diane Martinez, Gerry Martinez, Gerry (I) Martinez, Marion Martinez, Ronald Martinez, Brittany Allwein, Celia Ancheta, Sally Arnett, Mayo Arties, Michelle Arties, Amber Babers, Katherine Baker, Christopher Bedel, Frances Bedel, Thomas Martinez, Louis Mathews, Yong Chi Mathews, Jacob Maynard, Seth McCargar, Danny McClatcher, Kathryn McNamara, Richard McNamara, Carolyn McQueen, Kathy Metzger-Martinez, Alexander Miller, Linda Mitchell, Linda (I) Mitchell, Sonia MoneyPenny, Chad Myrom, Tyrell Nakila, Ryan Neighly, Alexandria Ohmes, Dedrick Papproth, Keipa Peoples, Mario Perez, Daniel Peterson, Michael Peterson, Shirley Peterson, Deborah Pina-Thomas, Katie Poe, Sandra Porter, Sandra (I) Porter, Nick Powell, Sunshyne Powell, Sunshyne (I) Powell, Linda Pressey, Colleen Pustola, Annamarie Quijada, Jeremy Riffe, Elizabeth Roberts, David Rodriguez, Jr, Alyssa Roger, Clinton Rolf, Eugenie Root, Jimmie Root, Michael Sabo, Brooke Sailor, Brooke (I) Sailor, Susanne Schwalbe, Sven Schwalbe, Susanne (I) Schwalbe, Libran Selfe, Valerie Selfe, Meren Selober, Amanda Shea, Larry Shea, Christopher Smith, Paula Smith, Michelle Sohlberg, Karl Studdard, Stephanie Studdard, Karl (I) Studdard, Julia Swonger, Steven Swonger, Julia (I) Swonger, James Thomas, Phillip Benjamin Thomas, Phillip Jonathan Thomas, Tracey Thomas, Tracey (I) Thomas, Phillip Thomas, II, John Tiatia, Zachary Tokach, Donna Van Hoose, Kelly Vigil, Dominique Wallace, William Wallace, Robert Wekamp, Susan Wekamp, Leann Wekamp-Porrello, Richard White, Sally White, Analisa Whittaker, Ronald Wilson, Sherri Witcher, Carl Wooldridge, Michelle Wooldridge, Edwin Worrell, Robert Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fidelina (I) Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jamie (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roberta Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Terry Hassman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donna Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stewart Hearn(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ron Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharon Henard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sharla Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Barbara Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Barbara Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hubert Hoh(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hubert Hoh(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Hunter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry (I) Hunter (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry (I) Hunter (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ronald Ingram(pty:pla), Attorney
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/ 17/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/17/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Louise Rita Caro and Patrick J. Lanciotti. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6107030)Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brittany Allwein(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brittany Allwein(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Celia Ancheta(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Celia Ancheta(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sally Arnett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sally Arnett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mayo Arties(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mayo Arties(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle Arties(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle Arties(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Babers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Babers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Katherine Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Katherine Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Bedel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Bedel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frances Bedel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Frances Bedel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony Betancourt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Bisping(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bobbie Blanco-Roper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Borghi(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samanthia Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marjorie Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Raymond Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Walter Brettschneider(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lesley Bursha(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Peter Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ryan Carli (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Nickey Clore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joniqua Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Colegrove(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Derrick Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sherry Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brandy Crisman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Steve Crump(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deborah Cuchiara(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Chistopher Dike(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Ida Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Dilwood(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Donofrio(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tonya Dorsey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kristine Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Todd Evers(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aaron Ewert(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party D. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party D. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party S. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party S. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Paul Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Rachel Fedelin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brande Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elizabeth Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeffery Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Fidelina Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Franco(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Linda Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party K. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party K. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party R. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party S. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party S. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elmer Gambala(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Johnny Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Lisa Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charlene Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jamie Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joseph Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marlies Glass(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle A. Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gina Goodloe(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Goodloe, II(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jerome Gordon, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Patrick Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Gosselin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gregory Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Barbara Gross(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kathleen Groves(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party B. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michael Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Harman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Roberta Ha

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilwood et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Jonathan Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Hassman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Foster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda (I) Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Swonger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Poe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Brettschneider
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa (I) Cullen-Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kuznicki
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Cullen-Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyber Lieser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kennedy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Franco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny McClatcher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Tokach
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lynn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry (I) Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Babers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Arties
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua (I) Kyler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hearn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Juarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Foster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Cox
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Hoh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Root
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Henard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelina Franco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Powell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Schwalbe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn McNamara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Betancourt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analisa Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brande Ford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Fedelin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Cuchiara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia (I) Swonger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Cox
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tiatia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamarie Quijada
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dilwood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia MoneyPenny
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hearn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keipa Peoples
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Glass
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ingram
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Maynard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Pina-Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickey Clore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (I) Lawland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sohlberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Wekamp-Porrello
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wekamp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bisping
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Goodloe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Chi Mathews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Benjamin Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlinda Juarez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlies Glass
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshyne (I) Powell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Gross
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wooldridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meren Selober
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Lewis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Henard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Ancheta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Gennitti
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Arnett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Brandon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wallace
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Borghi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Mathews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gosselin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Thomas, II
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Knight
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Van Hoose
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Crisman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Hunter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharla Hernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libran Selfe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Frazier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Bedel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wekamp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Gorman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samanthia Boyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Crump
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry (I) Hunter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gennitti
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Hearn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey (I) Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McNamara
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Floyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Wooldridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Fedelin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Lejeune
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenie Root
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Donofrio
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hines
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie (I) Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke (I) Sailor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Roger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Shea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell Nakila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Riffe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Sailor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Studdard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayo Arties
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rodriguez, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Dilwood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Griffith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra (I) Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Selfe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Evers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland LeJeune
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Swonger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Neighly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Gordon, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Shea
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Witcher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Pressey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chistopher Dike
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Evers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hassman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Lichtenberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jefferson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Groves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Kyler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie (I) Blanco-Roper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sabo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Gambala
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshyne Powell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Metzger-Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Worrell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Pustola
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Carli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Myrom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Harman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Ford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn McQueen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: diane martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lawland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Young
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Dorsey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth McCargar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl (I) Studdard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Ewert
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Blanco-Roper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bedel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Breckenridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Goodloe, II
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joniqua Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sven Schwalbe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Allwein
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal |