Johnson et al v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Wilfred Berthiaume, Annette Campbell, Joanne Cooper, HEATHER DALBEC, Martin Anderson, BAILEY FLORES, Bernard Zimmerman, Danielle (I) Currie, Karen Iudice, Delia Jimenez, ZENA MORRIS, Raymond (I) Cornmesser, Sonya Lopez, Patricia Tippins, Migdalia Maldonado, SABINE FOWLER, Robert Titus, Latasha Cormier, Marie Kornegay, Cynthia Archer, Peggy Puralewski, David Bell, Christina Perez-Giordano, Cheryl Barter, Michael Morris, April Kubik, Albert Rice, Evelyn Davila, Chris Colburn, Kaycee Simmons, Ute Aiken, Cindy Jordan, Kaycee (I) Simmons, Christopher Campbell, Misty Baker, John Campbell, Jr., Shalice (I) Steffy, Pennie Gale, Joseph Aiken, Stephanie (I) Pierce, George Jordan, Jr., Laura Koegler, Angela (I) Polk, PEARL FRATES, Sheri Bell, Emily Jackson, Cathy Sue Stomberg, Robert Tarver, DUSTIN DONOFRY, Michael Esler, Lee Woosley, Tawny E. Hobdy, William Kowalefski, Tina Blount, William Harris, Jessica Dolan, Vicky Johnson, Claus Gomolka, Thomas Westreicher, Audrey Barron, DAVID MCCREADY, Pamela Rucker, Ricky Harper, Sr., Derante Williams, Carl Brickell, Kimberly Jackson, Rosalie Thompson, Regina Hull, Thomas (I) McGuire, Lesa Ottersberg, STEVE ROUILLER, Crystal Hubbard, Lisa Rigg, Sonmi Parsons, Kelly Couch, Christina Perrow, Walter Gale, Barbara Ulmer, Wynona James, Penny Cimino, Lawrence Jackson, Angela Polk, Dennis Levings, Travis Johnson, Donna K. Johnson, Tanja Lucero, Thomas Chisholm, William Bloom, Carla Haley, Claudia Still, Santana Bell, David Woosley, Dana Flinders, Brady (I) McPeak, THOMAS MCGUIRE, Hyunkyung Chavez, Sudie-Pearl Horton, RAYMOND CORNMESSER, VALERIE CHAVEZ, Cassie Bernard, Lafayette Brady, Ronald Archer, Gary Johnson, Deborah Richards, Vicky (I) Johnson, Michael Price, Steve Lovato, Terry Allnutt, Kathy Anderson, Linda Lorenzana, Dale Holmes, Jr., Angelica Patterson, Susana Donofy, Marty (I) Mertz, Joseph Welty, Shannon Bresciani, Adrian Armendano, Danielle Currie, ANDREA ROBINSON, BRADY MCPEAK, Carlos Bowdre, Larry Fruge, Shalice Steffy, Caycee Garcia, Keith Bond, Dominic Chavez, Felicia Wingo, Elizabeth Westreicher, Jennifer Vink, Antonio Ford, Patricia Tipton, Johnney Newby, Jedadiah Pierce, Rhonda Gershmel, Michael Shuck, Phyllis Taylor, James Parsons, Jr., Sharon Carlos, RUBY BOOTH, PAUL GALLAGHER, Emmitt Honaker, CITRA RODRIGUEZ, Maureen Tunnell, Steven Saleny, Angel Negron, Jason White, Tawny (I) E. Hobdy, MICHAELA GOFORTH, Andrea (I) Robinson, Debora Haskins, Darrell Perrow, Stephanie Pierce, Francisco Maciel, William Foy, Sabrina Bell, Dana (I) Flinders, Chantelle Levasseur, Robert Behrens, Janie Cumpston, Chevon Patrick, William Toner, Ursula Horn, SUSAN FLORES, George Gordon, Jr., MARTY MERTZ, VENNITA BROWNING, Kimberly Harper, Mark Bevel, Colleen Garcia, Joe Esquibel, Clifford Dufrain, Michael James, James Anderson, Ryann Milam, Timothy Holmes, Brian Garcia, Gisela Tubiolo, Francisco Camacho, John Ulmer, George Lopez, Tyliah Harris, CELESTINA MUNIZ, Kaden Martin, Chartese Tuthill, Maria Rice, Courtney Garcia, Peggy Johnson, Joann Rigg, James Wilson, ELISABETH CALLAHAN, Jamie Soliz, Ann Marie Gonzalez, Paul Dorety, Evelyn (I) Davila, Robert Thurston, Delia (I) Jimenez, Brenda Wilson, MICHAELA MCGUIRE, John Esler, Judith Anderson, JIMMY CURRIE, Ladocia Bloom, JONATHAN CALLAHAN, Amy Clements and Charles Rucker
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The and Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03410
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01271, Johnson et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03410-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01271. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01271 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Adrian Armendano, Misty Baker, Audrey Barron, Cheryl Barter, Robert Behrens, David Bell, Sabrina Bell, Santana Bell, Sheri Bell, Cassie Bernard, Wilfred Berthiaume, Mark Bevel, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Tina Blount, Keith Bond, Ruby Booth, Carlos Bowdre, Lafayette Brady, Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Vennita Browning, Elisabeth Callahan, Jonathan Callahan, Francisco Camacho, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr., Sharon Carlos, Dominic Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Valerie Chavez, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, Amy Clements, Chris Colburn, Joanne Cooper, Latasha Cormier, Raymond Cornmesser, Raymond (I) Cornmesser, Kelly Couch, Janie Cumpston, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Jimmy Currie, Heather Dalbec, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jessica Dolan, Dustin Donofry, Susana Donofy, Paul Dorety, Clifford Dufrain, John Esler, Michael Esler, Joe Esquibel, Dana Flinders, Dana (I) Flinders, Bailey Flores, Susan Flores, Antonio Ford, Sabine Fowler, William Foy, Pearl Frates, Larry Fruge, Pennie Gale, Walter Gale, Paul Gallagher, Brian Garcia, Caycee Garcia, Colleen Garcia, Courtney Garcia, Rhonda Gershmel, Michaela Goforth, Claus Gomolka, Ann Marie Gonzalez, George Gordon, Jr., Carla Haley, Kimberly Harper, Ricky Harper, Sr., Tyliah Harris, William Harris, Debora Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Tawny (I) E. Hobdy, Timothy Holmes, Dale Holmes, Jr., Emmitt Honaker, Ursula Horn, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Crystal Hubbard, Regina Hull, Karen Iudice, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Michael James, Wynona James, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Donna K. Johnson, Gary Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Travis Johnson, Vicky Johnson, Vicky (I) Johnson, Cindy Jordan, George Jordan, Jr., Laura Koegler, Marie Kornegay, William Kowalefski, April Kubik, Chantelle Levasseur, Dennis Levings, George Lopez, Sonya Lopez, Linda Lorenzana, Steve Lovato, Tanja Lucero, Francisco Maciel, Migdalia Maldonado, Kaden Martin, David McCready, Michaela McGuire, Thomas McGuire, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Terry Allnutt, James Anderson, Judith Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Martin Anderson, Cynthia Archer, Ronald Archer, Thomas (I) McGuire, Brady McPeak, Brady (I) McPeak, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Ryann Milam, Michael Morris, Zena Morris, Celestina Muniz, Angel Negron, Johnney Newby, Lesa Ottersberg, Sonmi Parsons, James Parsons, Jr., Chevon Patrick, Angelica Patterson, Christina Perez-Giordano, Christina Perrow, Darrell Perrow, Jedadiah Pierce, Stephanie Pierce, Stephanie (I) Pierce, Angela Polk, Angela (I) Polk, Michael Price, Peggy Puralewski, Albert Rice, Maria Rice, Deborah Richards, Joann Rigg, Lisa Rigg, Andrea Robinson, Andrea (I) Robinson, Citra Rodriguez, Steve Rouiller, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Steven Saleny, Michael Shuck, Kaycee Simmons, Kaycee (I) Simmons, Jamie Soliz, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Claudia Still, Cathy Sue Stomberg, Robert Tarver, Phyllis Taylor, Rosalie Thompson, Robert Thurston, Patricia Tippins, Patricia Tipton, Robert Titus, William Toner, Gisela Tubiolo, Maureen Tunnell, Chartese Tuthill, Barbara Ulmer, John Ulmer, Jennifer Vink, Joseph Welty, Elizabeth Westreicher, Thomas Westreicher, Jason White, Derante Williams, Brenda Wilson, James Wilson, Felicia Wingo, David Woosley, Lee Woosley, Bernard Zimmerman. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Adrian Armendano, Misty Baker, Audrey Barron, Cheryl Barter, Robert Behrens, David Bell, Sabrina Bell, Santana Bell, Sheri Bell, Cassie Bernard, Wilfred Berthiaume, Mark Bevel, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Tina Blount, Keith Bond, Ruby Booth, Carlos Bowdre, Lafayette Brady, Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Vennita Browning, Elisabeth Callahan, Jonathan Callahan, Francisco Camacho, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr., Sharon Carlos, Dominic Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Valerie Chavez, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, Amy Clements, Chris Colburn, Joanne Cooper, Latasha Cormier, Raymond Cornmesser, Raymond (I) Cornmesser, Kelly Couch, Janie Cumpston, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Jimmy Currie, Heather Dalbec, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jessica Dolan, Dustin Donofry, Susana Donofy, Paul Dorety, Clifford Dufrain, John Esler, Michael Esler, Joe Esquibel, Dana Flinders, Dana (I) Flinders, Bailey Flores, Susan Flores, Antonio Ford, Sabine Fowler, William Foy, Pearl Frates, Larry Fruge, Pennie Gale, Walter Gale, Paul Gallagher, Brian Garcia, Caycee Garcia, Colleen Garcia, Courtney Garcia, Rhonda Gershmel, Michaela Goforth, Claus Gomolka, Ann Marie Gonzalez, George Gordon, Jr., Carla Haley, Kimberly Harper, Ricky Harper, Sr., Tyliah Harris, William Harris, Debora Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Tawny (I) E. Hobdy, Timothy Holmes, Dale Holmes, Jr., Emmitt Honaker, Ursula Horn, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Crystal Hubbard, Regina Hull, Karen Iudice, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Michael James, Wynona James, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Donna K. Johnson, Gary Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Travis Johnson, Vicky Johnson, Vicky (I) Johnson, Cindy Jordan, George Jordan, Jr., Laura Koegler, Marie Kornegay, William Kowalefski, April Kubik, Chantelle Levasseur, Dennis Levings, George Lopez, Sonya Lopez, Linda Lorenzana, Steve Lovato, Tanja Lucero, Francisco Maciel, Migdalia Maldonado, Kaden Martin, David McCready, Michaela McGuire, Thomas McGuire, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Terry Allnutt, James Anderson, Judith Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Martin Anderson, Cynthia Archer, Ronald Archer, Thomas (I) McGuire, Brady McPeak, Brady (I) McPeak, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Ryann Milam, Michael Morris, Zena Morris, Celestina Muniz, Angel Negron, Johnney Newby, Lesa Ottersberg, Sonmi Parsons, James Parsons, Jr., Chevon Patrick, Angelica Patterson, Christina Perez-Giordano, Christina Perrow, Darrell Perrow, Jedadiah Pierce, Stephanie Pierce, Stephanie (I) Pierce, Angela Polk, Angela (I) Polk, Michael Price, Peggy Puralewski, Albert Rice, Maria Rice, Deborah Richards, Joann Rigg, Lisa Rigg, Andrea Robinson, Andrea (I) Robinson, Citra Rodriguez, Steve Rouiller, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Steven Saleny, Michael Shuck, Kaycee Simmons, Kaycee (I) Simmons, Jamie Soliz, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Claudia Still, Cathy Sue Stomberg, Robert Tarver, Phyllis Taylor, Rosalie Thompson, Robert Thurston, Patricia Tippins, Patricia Tipton, Robert Titus, William Toner, Gisela Tubiolo, Maureen Tunnell, Chartese Tuthill, Barbara Ulmer, John Ulmer, Jennifer Vink, Joseph Welty, Elizabeth Westreicher, Thomas Westreicher, Jason White, Derante Williams, Brenda Wilson, James Wilson, Felicia Wingo, David Woosley, Lee Woosley, Bernard Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michae
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Caycee Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Caycee Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Colleen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Colleen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Courtney Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Courtney Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michaela Goforth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michae
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caycee Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caycee Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Colleen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Colleen Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Courtney Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Courtney Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Gershmel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michaela Goforth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michaela Goforth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claus Gomolka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Claus Gomolka(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ann Marie Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ann Marie Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party George Gordon, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Harper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Harper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ricky Harper, Sr.(pty:pla), Attorne
June 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Adrian Armendano, Misty Baker, Audrey Barron, Cheryl Barter, Robert Behrens, David Bell, Sabrina Bell, Santana Bell, Sheri Bell, Cassie Bernard, Wilfred Berthiaume, Mark Bevel, Ladocia Bloom, William Bloom, Tina Blount, Keith Bond, Ruby Booth, Carlos Bowdre, Lafayette Brady, Shannon Bresciani, Carl Brickell, Vennita Browning, Elisabeth Callahan, Jonathan Callahan, Francisco Camacho, Annette Campbell, Christopher Campbell, John Campbell, Jr., Sharon Carlos, Dominic Chavez, Hyunkyung Chavez, Valerie Chavez, Thomas Chisholm, Penny Cimino, Amy Clements, Chris Colburn, Joanne Cooper, Latasha Cormier, Raymond Cornmesser, Raymond (I) Cornmesser, Kelly Couch, Janie Cumpston, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Jimmy Currie, Heather Dalbec, Evelyn Davila, Evelyn (I) Davila, Jessica Dolan, Dustin Donofry, Susana Donofy, Paul Dorety, Clifford Dufrain, John Esler, Michael Esler, Joe Esquibel, Dana Flinders, Dana (I) Flinders, Bailey Flores, Susan Flores, Antonio Ford, Sabine Fowler, William Foy, Pearl Frates, Larry Fruge, Pennie Gale, Walter Gale, Paul Gallagher, Brian Garcia, Caycee Garcia, Colleen Garcia, Courtney Garcia, Rhonda Gershmel, Michaela Goforth, Claus Gomolka, Ann Marie Gonzalez, George Gordon, Jr., Carla Haley, Kimberly Harper, Ricky Harper, Sr., Tyliah Harris, William Harris, Debora Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Tawny (I) E. Hobdy, Timothy Holmes, Dale Holmes, Jr., Emmitt Honaker, Ursula Horn, Sudie-Pearl Horton, Crystal Hubbard, Regina Hull, Karen Iudice, Emily Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Michael James, Wynona James, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Donna K. Johnson, Gary Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Travis Johnson, Vicky Johnson, Vicky (I) Johnson, Cindy Jordan, George Jordan, Jr., Laura Koegler, Marie Kornegay, William Kowalefski, April Kubik, Chantelle Levasseur, Dennis Levings, George Lopez, Sonya Lopez, Linda Lorenzana, Steve Lovato, Tanja Lucero, Francisco Maciel, Migdalia Maldonado, Kaden Martin, David McCready, Michaela McGuire, Thomas McGuire, Joseph Aiken, Ute Aiken, Terry Allnutt, James Anderson, Judith Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Martin Anderson, Cynthia Archer, Ronald Archer, Thomas (I) McGuire, Brady McPeak, Brady (I) McPeak, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Ryann Milam, Michael Morris, Zena Morris, Celestina Muniz, Angel Negron, Johnney Newby, Lesa Ottersberg, Sonmi Parsons, James Parsons, Jr., Chevon Patrick, Angelica Patterson, Christina Perez-Giordano, Christina Perrow, Darrell Perrow, Jedadiah Pierce, Stephanie Pierce, Stephanie (I) Pierce, Angela Polk, Angela (I) Polk, Michael Price, Peggy Puralewski, Albert Rice, Maria Rice, Deborah Richards, Joann Rigg, Lisa Rigg, Andrea Robinson, Andrea (I) Robinson, Citra Rodriguez, Steve Rouiller, Charles Rucker, Pamela Rucker, Steven Saleny, Michael Shuck, Kaycee Simmons, Kaycee (I) Simmons, Jamie Soliz, Shalice Steffy, Shalice (I) Steffy, Claudia Still, Cathy Sue Stomberg, Robert Tarver, Phyllis Taylor, Rosalie Thompson, Robert Thurston, Patricia Tippins, Patricia Tipton, Robert Titus, William Toner, Gisela Tubiolo, Maureen Tunnell, Chartese Tuthill, Barbara Ulmer, John Ulmer, Jennifer Vink, Joseph Welty, Elizabeth Westreicher, Thomas Westreicher, Jason White, Derante Williams, Brenda Wilson, James Wilson, Felicia Wingo, David Woosley, Lee Woosley, Bernard Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jonathan Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Raymond (I) Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evelyn (I) Davila (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana (I) Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabine Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Foy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pearl Frates(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Larry Fruge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pennie Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Walter Gale(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Gallagher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Caycee Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party
May 24, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., NATIONAL FOAM, INC., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6120802)Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ute Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ute Aiken(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Terry Allnutt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Terry Allnutt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Judith Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Judith Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kathy Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kathy Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Martin Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Martin Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cynthia Archer(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cynthia Archer(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ronald Archer(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ronald Archer(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Adrian Armendano(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party C. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Misty Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Audrey Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cheryl Barter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Behrens(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sabrina Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Santana Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheri Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassie Bernard(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wilfred Berthiaume(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Bevel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ladocia Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tina Blount(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Keith Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ruby Booth(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Bowdre(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lafayette Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shannon Bresciani(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carl Brickell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Vennita Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party I. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party I. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party J. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elisabeth Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Francisco Camacho(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Annette Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christopher Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Campbell, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sharon Carlos(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dominic Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Hyunkyung Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Valerie Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Thomas Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Penny Cimino(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Chris Colburn(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joanne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Latasha Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Raymond Cornmesser(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kelly Couch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janie Cumpston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jimmy Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party I. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Heather Dalbec(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Evelyn Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Dolan(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dustin Donofry(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Susana Donofy(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Paul Dorety(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Clifford Dufrain(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party T. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party T. E.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michael Esler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joe Esquibel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party J. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party J. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dana Flinders(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bailey Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Susan Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to pa

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Berthiaume
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER DALBEC
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY FLORES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Zimmerman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle (I) Currie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Iudice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Jimenez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZENA MORRIS
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond (I) Cornmesser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tippins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Maldonado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABINE FOWLER
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Titus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Cormier
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kornegay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Archer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Puralewski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perez-Giordano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Barter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Kubik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Colburn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaycee Simmons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Aiken
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaycee (I) Simmons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Baker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalice (I) Steffy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennie Gale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Aiken
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie (I) Pierce
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Koegler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela (I) Polk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARL FRATES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Sue Stomberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tarver
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN DONOFRY
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Esler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Woosley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawny E. Hobdy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kowalefski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Blount
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Dolan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claus Gomolka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Westreicher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Barron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MCCREADY
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rucker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Harper, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derante Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Brickell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Hull
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (I) McGuire
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Ottersberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE ROUILLER
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hubbard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rigg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonmi Parsons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Couch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perrow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Gale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ulmer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynona James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Cimino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Polk
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Levings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna K. Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Lucero
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chisholm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bloom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Haley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Still
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Woosley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Flinders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady (I) McPeak
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCGUIRE
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyunkyung Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudie-Pearl Horton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND CORNMESSER
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE CHAVEZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Bernard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafayette Brady
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Archer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Richards
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky (I) Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Lovato
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Allnutt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lorenzana
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Holmes, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Patterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Donofy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty (I) Mertz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Welty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Bresciani
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Armendano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Currie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA ROBINSON
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADY MCPEAK
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Bowdre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fruge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalice Steffy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caycee Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bond
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Wingo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Westreicher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vink
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tipton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnney Newby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jedadiah Pierce
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gershmel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shuck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Parsons, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Carlos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBY BOOTH
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL GALLAGHER
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt Honaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITRA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Tunnell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Saleny
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Negron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawny (I) E. Hobdy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAELA GOFORTH
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea (I) Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Haskins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Perrow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pierce
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Maciel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Foy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana (I) Flinders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantelle Levasseur
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behrens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Cumpston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevon Patrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Toner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Horn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN FLORES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gordon, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTY MERTZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENNITA BROWNING
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bevel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Esquibel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Dufrain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryann Milam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Holmes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisela Tubiolo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Camacho
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ulmer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyliah Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELESTINA MUNIZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaden Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chartese Tuthill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Rigg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISABETH CALLAHAN
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Soliz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dorety
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn (I) Davila
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thurston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia (I) Jimenez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]