Gibson et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Berniece Robinson, Samuel James, Jr., Jacqueline Middleton, CLAY RANDLES, Peggy Arias, Alyssa Hill, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, Amy Kinoff, Randall Briseno, Henry Torres, Jr., Benita Kalb, Kenneth Vossler, Samuel James, III, Richard Rocha, Scott Howell, Lewis Stoddard, Vanessa Howell, Edwin Beck, Victor Carter, Brody Stegman, Kelly Kinoff, Ashley Dahlberg, Police Chief John Young, Angela Baldwin, Peggy (I) Arias, Oscar Rodriguez, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Alfredo Garcia, Annette Williams, Cinthia Stewart, Christa Baca-Chavez, Frauke Randles, Paul Travis, Mike Coleman, Bruce Banks, Santa Lausell, Cinthia (I) Stewart, Brian Kidwell, Montana (I) Wolthius, Vincent Harris, JEFFREY GARCIA, Derek Brown, Nichole Pentland, Sylvia Walton, LISA GIBSON, Dennis Martell, Heather Didonato, Danny Bridges, ANDREW JAGO, Alfonso Colon, BAILEY JAGO, John Walker, Rusty Bower, SABRINA RODRIGUEZ, Robert Hull, Christina (I) Trujillo, Davina Price, Rachel Lyda, Herbert Mabie, Lisa (I) Gibson, Robert Copeland, Lynann (I) Meumann, Justin Kubik, Lynann Meumann, Daniel Garcia, Rita Bolhmann, Joey Garcia, Jennifer Stegman, Helen Kidwell, Chief Charles Clarke, Michael Murphy, Kameron Hambly, Marc Carbetta, Lady Thomas, Andre Brown, Jolene Smith, Rochelle Drinnon, Steve Stegman, DONNA JAMES, Christina Trujillo, Marla Doyle, Monica Hull, James Archuleta, Joseph Jackson, Daniel Robinson, Anthony Casaus, Jimmy Garcia, Roberta Vigil, Bonnie Miller, Anita Oliphant, William Bergeron, Drake Ferjak, Alan Thein, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Tracy Griego, Montana Wolthius and Justin (I) Kubik
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, Kidde PLC, Inc. and Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03416
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01294, Gibson et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03416-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01294. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01294 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs William Bergeron, Rita Bolhmann, Rusty Bower, Danny Bridges, Randall Briseno, Andre Brown, Derek Brown, Marc Carbetta, Victor Carter, Anthony Casaus, Charles Clarke, Mike Coleman, Alfonso Colon, Robert Copeland, Ashley Dahlberg, Heather Didonato, Marla Doyle, Rochelle Drinnon, Drake Ferjak, Alfredo Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Jeffrey Garcia, Jimmy Garcia, Joey Garcia, Lisa Gibson, Lisa (I) Gibson, Tracy Griego, Kameron Hambly, Vincent Harris, Alyssa Hill, Scott Howell, Vanessa Howell, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Joseph Jackson, Andrew Jago, Bailey Jago, Donna James, Samuel James, III, Samuel James, Jr, Benita Kalb, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Kelly Kinoff, Justin Kubik, Justin (I) Kubik, Santa Lausell, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Rachel Lyda, Herbert Mabie, Dennis Martell, Lynann Meumann, Lynann (I) Meumann, Jacqueline Middleton, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, James Archuleta, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Angela Baldwin, Bruce Banks, Edwin Beck, Bonnie Miller, Michael Murphy, Anita Oliphant, Nichole Pentland, Davina Price, Clay Randles, Frauke Randles, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Richard Rocha, Oscar Rodriguez, Sabrina Rodriguez, Jolene Smith, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Cinthia Stewart, Cinthia (I) Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Alan Thein, Lady Thomas, Henry Torres, Jr, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Christina (I) Trujillo, Roberta Vigil, Kenneth Vossler, John Walker, Sylvia Walton, Annette Williams, Montana Wolthius, Montana (I) Wolthius, John Young. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs William Bergeron, Rita Bolhmann, Rusty Bower, Danny Bridges, Randall Briseno, Andre Brown, Derek Brown, Marc Carbetta, Victor Carter, Anthony Casaus, Charles Clarke, Mike Coleman, Alfonso Colon, Robert Copeland, Ashley Dahlberg, Heather Didonato, Marla Doyle, Rochelle Drinnon, Drake Ferjak, Alfredo Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Jeffrey Garcia, Jimmy Garcia, Joey Garcia, Lisa Gibson, Lisa (I) Gibson, Tracy Griego, Kameron Hambly, Vincent Harris, Alyssa Hill, Scott Howell, Vanessa Howell, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Joseph Jackson, Andrew Jago, Bailey Jago, Donna James, Samuel James, III, Samuel James, Jr, Benita Kalb, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Kelly Kinoff, Justin Kubik, Justin (I) Kubik, Santa Lausell, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Rachel Lyda, Herbert Mabie, Dennis Martell, Lynann Meumann, Lynann (I) Meumann, Jacqueline Middleton, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, James Archuleta, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Angela Baldwin, Bruce Banks, Edwin Beck, Bonnie Miller, Michael Murphy, Anita Oliphant, Nichole Pentland, Davina Price, Clay Randles, Frauke Randles, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Richard Rocha, Oscar Rodriguez, Sabrina Rodriguez, Jolene Smith, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Cinthia Stewart, Cinthia (I) Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Alan Thein, Lady Thomas, Henry Torres, Jr, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Christina (I) Trujillo, Roberta Vigil, Kenneth Vossler, John Walker, Sylvia Walton, Annette Williams, Montana Wolthius, Montana (I) Wolthius, John Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McD
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clay Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clay Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frauke Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frauke Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Berniece Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Berniece Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Rocha(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Rocha
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs William Bergeron, Rita Bolhmann, Rusty Bower, Danny Bridges, Randall Briseno, Andre Brown, Derek Brown, Marc Carbetta, Victor Carter, Anthony Casaus, Charles Clarke, Mike Coleman, Alfonso Colon, Robert Copeland, Ashley Dahlberg, Heather Didonato, Marla Doyle, Rochelle Drinnon, Drake Ferjak, Alfredo Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Jeffrey Garcia, Jimmy Garcia, Joey Garcia, Lisa Gibson, Lisa (I) Gibson, Tracy Griego, Kameron Hambly, Vincent Harris, Alyssa Hill, Scott Howell, Vanessa Howell, Monica Hull, Robert Hull, Joseph Jackson, Andrew Jago, Bailey Jago, Donna James, Samuel James, III, Samuel James, Jr, Benita Kalb, Brian Kidwell, Helen Kidwell, Amy Kinoff, Kelly Kinoff, Justin Kubik, Justin (I) Kubik, Santa Lausell, Inez Linan-Yurivilca, Rachel Lyda, Herbert Mabie, Dennis Martell, Lynann Meumann, Lynann (I) Meumann, Jacqueline Middleton, Dorothy Alberts-Broch, James Archuleta, Peggy Arias, Peggy (I) Arias, Christa Baca-Chavez, Christa (I) Baca-Chavez, Angela Baldwin, Bruce Banks, Edwin Beck, Bonnie Miller, Michael Murphy, Anita Oliphant, Nichole Pentland, Davina Price, Clay Randles, Frauke Randles, Berniece Robinson, Daniel Robinson, Richard Rocha, Oscar Rodriguez, Sabrina Rodriguez, Jolene Smith, Brody Stegman, Jennifer Stegman, Steve Stegman, Cinthia Stewart, Cinthia (I) Stewart, Lewis Stoddard, Alan Thein, Lady Thomas, Henry Torres, Jr, Paul Travis, Christina Trujillo, Christina (I) Trujillo, Roberta Vigil, Kenneth Vossler, John Walker, Sylvia Walton, Annette Williams, Montana Wolthius, Montana (I) Wolthius, John Young. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa (I) Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Justin (I) Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lynann (I) Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peggy (I) Arias (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christa (I) Baca-Chavez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clay Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clay R
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6123408)Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dorothy Alberts-Broch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Archuleta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peggy Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christa Baca-Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edwin Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rita Bolhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rusty Bower(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danny Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randall Briseno(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andre Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marc Carbetta(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victor Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Casaus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfonso Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Dahlberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Heather Didonato(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marla Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rochelle Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Drake Ferjak(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alfredo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmy Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joey Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tracy Griego(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kameron Hambly(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vincent Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alyssa Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vanessa Howell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Hull(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bailey Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel James, III(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel James, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Benita Kalb (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Helen Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Kinoff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Justin Kubik(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Santa Lausell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Inez Linan-Yurivilca(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rachel Lyda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Herbert Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Martell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lynann Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jacqueline Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bonnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anita Oliphant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nichole Pentland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Davina Price(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clay Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clay Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frauke Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frauke Randles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Berniece Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Berniece Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Rocha(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Rocha(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Oscar Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Oscar Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jolene Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jolene Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brody Stegman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brody Stegman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Stegman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Stegman(pty:pla), Attor

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berniece Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel James, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Middleton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAY RANDLES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Hill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Alberts-Broch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kinoff
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Briseno
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Torres, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Kalb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Vossler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel James, III
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Howell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Stoddard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Howell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Beck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brody Stegman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kinoff
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dahlberg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Chief John Young
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Baldwin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy (I) Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Linan-Yurivilca
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia Stewart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Baca-Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frauke Randles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Travis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Banks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Lausell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia (I) Stewart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kidwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana (I) Wolthius
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GARCIA
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Pentland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Walton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA GIBSON
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Martell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Didonato
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Bridges
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW JAGO
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Colon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY JAGO
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Bower
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hull
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina (I) Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lyda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mabie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Copeland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynann (I) Meumann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Kubik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynann Meumann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bolhmann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stegman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Kidwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Charles Clarke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameron Hambly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Carbetta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lady Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Drinnon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Stegman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA JAMES
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Doyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Hull
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Archuleta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Casaus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Oliphant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bergeron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Ferjak
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Thein
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa (I) Baca-Chavez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Griego
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Wolthius
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin (I) Kubik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?