Garcia et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Darnelle Selby, Carol Costlow, Errolyn Quaiel, Deana Julian, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Stephen Knapp, Robert (I) Garcia, Tiara Harris, Tamara Hirsch, Alex Porter, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, John (I) Hooser, Jennifer Jason, Earnest Brown, Lani Marsh, Rosalinda Villalobos, Arlene Cano, Michael Kraemer, Bridgette Swaney, Amanda Contreras, Sabrina Mulford, Michael Peterson, David Messenger, Phillip Delatorre, Jessica Schaule, Shawndra Jones, Lori Lovato, Dianna Kyle, Danny Lovato, Cassidy Dearinger, Robert McCullough, Annelie Bergeron, Phillip Rash, Stacey (I) Potts, Jessica Costlow, Latanya Brown, Monica Garcia, Douglas Jarvis, Doug Redlin, Cassi Bothel, Perry Johnson, Stephanie Payne, Laniyah Jinkins, Kenyatta Lowery, Jeremi Spake, Paul Presta, Natasha Scarlett, Chris Mart, Benjamin Selby, Angela Ford, Thomas Klasing, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Saul Macias, James Castro, Derrell Gordon, Kimberly Sawyers, Todossii Short, Angelic Carrasquillo, Amber Dore, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Lauren Starski, Mark Igou, Jr., William Mabie, Shawn Tinsley, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, David Plowman, Richard Valle, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Amanda Caffey, Heather Michaud, Tarena (I) Anderson, Neil Marsh, Sarah (I) Cerda, Christopher Lang, Judy Neal, Anthony D'Mytro, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Cassandra Tijerina, Amanda Erman, Zachary McDonald, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Carla Good, William Crispin, Landis Temple, Tyson Cattoor, Thomas Stancil, Jennifer Lyon, Susanne Fauson, Tonya Wright, Lance Loffinik, Carmen Rocha, Aimee Carroll, Samuel Gieck, Bud Cook, Maggie Polley, Nicholas Porter, Sarah Cerda, Shenique Washington, Anya Soares, Amber (I) Dore, Miguel Perez, Sr., Melissa Wilson, James Tyler Epperson, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Dora Gallegos, John Hooser, Michael (I) Peterson, Elberto Lopez, Michelle Davis, Marie Mirenda, Douglas Zinn, Jessie Jones, Kim Look, Amy Claar, Cecelia Sandovol, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Tarena Anderson, Valerie King, Thomas Quaiel, Jacki Moore, Aimee (I) Carroll, Shyanna Rains, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shaelyne Brady, Brice Kadel, Stacey Potts, Debra France, Jimmy Montoya, Shevawn Basye, Robert McDermott, William Strachan, Tiffany Bousfield, Andrea (I) Macholz, Wanda Cole, Robert Babcock, Isabel Pacheco, Shirley Mathis, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cory Holt, Carlton Whitney, Wyatt Bonner, Amanda (I) Erman, Andrea Macholz, Caleb Snyder, Michael Wessell, Rachel Rich, David Hathcock, Patrick Polley, Darrell Coughlin, Brian Cathey, Alana Maria Mitchell, William Sailor, Jr., Justin Snead, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Zachary Finley, Christopher Ellenburg, Carrie Petersen, Bradley Birks, Christopher Kota, Darrell Jiron, Dwight Scarlett, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Deja Jinkins, Jennifer Ferrell, Marcia Gieck, Charles Fletcher, Rico Ramos, Gloria Hoyt, Patricia Burkepile, Annette Y Telles, Joanne Chavez, Mandy Middleton, Nicholas Marsh, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Timothy Selby, Elizabeth Barrientes, Jeremy Ingman, Waltraud Mickelson, Robert Garcia, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luz Morales, Krystal Kyle, Rayna Sheaffer, Kvia Cornett, Josue Juvera, Joe Bechiom, Kerry Thomas, Wilma Strachan, Alfred Alvarez, Jennifer (I) Lyon, Tyler Rains, Neoma Rodriguez, Victoria Litscomb and Chartrese Tuthill
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, National Foam Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, 3M Company, The, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Dupont de Nemours, Inc. (f/k/a DowDupont, Inc.) and Corteva Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03418
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patrice Adragna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. List of cases for dismissal, #2 Exhibit B. List of cases that will remain)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Napoli, Paul)
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 Summons Issued as to Corteva Inc, Dupont de Nemours, Inc. (f/k/a DowDupont, Inc.). (sshe, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Monica Garcia. Service due by 6/15/2020 (Napoli, Paul)
February 4, 2020 Filing 59 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:20-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel may e-file, as an attachment to the complaint or Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER This Document Relates to Case Numbers: GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (Dkt. No. (412) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al; granting (117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03336-RMG; granting (129) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03335-RMG; granting (100) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03338-RMG; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03339-RMG; granting (376) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03366-RMG; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03357-RMG; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03369-RMG; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03370-RMG; granting (101) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03354-RMG; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03356-RMG; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03392-RMG; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03403-RMG; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03406-RMG; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03418-RMG; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03496-RMG; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03521-RMG; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03522-RMG; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03523-RMG; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03525-RMG; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-00087-RMG; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-00564-RMG; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-01644-RMG; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-01645-RMG; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-01746-RMG; granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-02219-RMG). It is hereby ORDERED that Tate J. Kunkle's appearances as counsel for the Plaintiffs in the above matters are withdrawn. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/10/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Tate J. Kunkle by Robinson Smith, Diane Singer, Enid Zentelis and Sean Fogarty, Hampton Bays Water District, Village of Farmingdale, City of Dayton, Annamarie Bermo, Ian Andrews, Skyler Allen, Monica Garcia, Maurice Miller, Elizabeth Adamo, Gabrielle Barker, Dale Braun, Carolyn Teune, Todd Teune, County of Dutchess, Claudia Adams, Art Schaap, Renee Schaap, Dennis Crow, Isaac Green, Marana, Town of, Tucson, City of, Rosie Taylor, David Bell, Diane Hebrank, Barbara Ayo. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Kunkle, Tate)
October 18, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE RE Counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form, when necessary, to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Do not e-file. Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. *et al as listed on document. The Napoli Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint (Dkt. No. (255) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; *et al in case as listed on document) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to promptly file the Amended Complaints. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/3/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re (42 in 2:18-cv-03311-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints for the Napoli Plaintiffs Response filed by Joan Campbell. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Napoli, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re (42 in 2:18-cv-03311-RMG, 31 in 2:18-cv-03398-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03408-RMG, 33 in 2:18-cv-03402-RMG, 39 in 2:18-cv-03397-RMG, 43 in 2:18-cv-03403-RMG, 30 in 2:18-cv-03416-RMG, 88 in 2:18-cv-03356-RMG, 38 in 2:18-cv-03392-RMG, 34 in 2:18-cv-03380-RMG, 39 in 2:18-cv-03411-RMG, 30 in 2:18-cv-03412-RMG, 48 in 2:18-cv-03369-RMG, 33 in 2:18-cv-03419-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03401-RMG, 37 in 2:18-cv-03383-RMG, 49 in 2:18-cv-03457-RMG, 37 in 2:18-cv-03389-RMG, 41 in 2:18-cv-03390-RMG, 37 in 2:18-cv-03371-RMG, 34 in 2:18-cv-03385-RMG, 366 in 2:18-cv-03366-RMG, 41 in 2:18-cv-03396-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03388-RMG, 56 in 2:18-cv-03334-RMG, 119 in 2:18-cv-03335-RMG, 107 in 2:18-cv-03336-RMG, 33 in 2:18-cv-03415-RMG, 33 in 2:18-cv-03410-RMG, 88 in 2:18-cv-03357-RMG, 38 in 2:18-cv-03370-RMG, 36 in 2:18-cv-03391-RMG, 72 in 2:18-cv-03434-RMG, 36 in 2:18-cv-03387-RMG, 90 in 2:18-cv-03354-RMG, 34 in 2:18-cv-03406-RMG, 31 in 2:18-cv-03413-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03414-RMG, 36 in 2:18-cv-03365-RMG, 33 in 2:18-cv-03393-RMG, 34 in 2:18-cv-03409-RMG, 35 in 2:18-cv-03378-RMG, 36 in 2:18-cv-03417-RMG, 255 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 44 in 2:18-cv-03372-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03395-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03394-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03381-RMG, 90 in 2:18-cv-03338-RMG, 32 in 2:18-cv-03382-RMG, 46 in 2:18-cv-03418-RMG, 30 in 2:18-cv-03404-RMG, 38 in 2:18-cv-03407-RMG, 48 in 2:18-cv-03439-RMG, 35 in 2:18-cv-03377-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints for the Napoli Plaintiffs Response filed by Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/20/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sherk, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints for the Napoli Plaintiffs by Audrey Abrahamsen. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Paul J. Napoli Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV, #51 Exhibit WW, #52 Exhibit XX, #53 Exhibit YY, #54 Exhibit ZZ, #55 Exhibit AAA, #56 Exhibit BBB, #57 Exhibit CCC, #58 Exhibit DDD, #59 Exhibit EEE, #60 Exhibit FFF, #61 Exhibit GGG, #62 Exhibit HHH, #63 Exhibit III, #64 Exhibit JJJ, #65 Exhibit KKK)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Napoli, Paul)
August 23, 2019 Filing 45 TEXT ORDER re (194 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (39) in case 2:18-cv-03311-RMG; (53) in case 2:18-cv-03334-RMG; (103) in case 2:18-cv-03336-RMG; (115) in case 2:18-cv-03335-RMG; (86) in case 2:18-cv-03338-RMG; (33) in case 2:18-cv-03365-RMG; (363) in case 2:18-cv-03366-RMG; (85) in case 2:18-cv-03357-RMG; (45) in case 2:18-cv-03369-RMG; (35) in case 2:18-cv-03370-RMG; (163) in case 2:18-cv-03349-RMG; (87) in case 2:18-cv-03354-RMG; (85) in case 2:18-cv-03356-RMG; (34) in case 2:18-cv-03371-RMG; (41) in case 2:18-cv-03372-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03381-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03382-RMG; (31) in case 2:18-cv-03378-RMG; (31) in case 2:18-cv-03380-RMG; (45) in case 2:18-cv-03439-RMG; (46) in case 2:18-cv-03457-RMG; (32) in case 2:18-cv-03377-RMG; (34) in case 2:18-cv-03383-RMG; (67) in case 2:18-cv-03434-RMG; (34) in case 2:18-cv-03389-RMG; (38) in case 2:18-cv-03390-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03388-RMG; (34) in case 2:18-cv-03392-RMG; (30) in case 2:18-cv-03393-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03394-RMG; (36) in case 2:18-cv-03397-RMG; (37) in case 2:18-cv-03396-RMG; (28) in case 2:18-cv-03398-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03401-RMG; (30) in case 2:18-cv-03402-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03395-RMG; (40) in case 2:18-cv-03403-RMG; (27) in case 2:18-cv-03404-RMG; (31) in case 2:18-cv-03406-RMG; (35) in case 2:18-cv-03407-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03408-RMG; (31) in case 2:18-cv-03409-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03410-RMG; (36) in case 2:18-cv-03411-RMG; (26) in case 2:18-cv-03412-RMG; (28) in case 2:18-cv-03413-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03414-RMG; (30) in case 2:18-cv-03415-RMG; (27) in case 2:18-cv-03416-RMG; (32) in case 2:18-cv-03417-RMG; (31) in case 2:18-cv-03385-RMG; (29) in case 2:18-cv-03419-RMG; (43) in case 2:18-cv-03418-RMG; (33) in case 2:18-cv-03387-RMG; (32) in case 2:18-cv-03391-RMG; (29) in case 2:19-cv-01644-RMG; (18) in case 2:19-cv-01645-RMG; (10) in case 2:19-cv-01707-RMG; (11) in case 2:19-cv-01746-RMG) Napoli Plaintiffs' motion to amend complaints. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to re-file with redlined proposed amended complaints. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/22/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Counsel should prepare and submit a proposed order in Word document format for any Motion to Withdraw as Attorney via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Napoli Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit Paul J. Napoli Declaration, # 3 Redline version proposed Amended Complaint(s) to be added)No proposed order.(Napoli, Paul) Refiled corrected documents provided/verified by filing user correctly in management case and spread to all applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 Any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to the AFFF MDL proceedings may file his or her case directly in the District of South Carolina, in accordance with Paragraphs 25 through 29 of CMO 3. The shell case number for cases related to the AFFF MDL is 2:19-av-55555. Please file the new complaint into this shell case and file as attachments Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories and a Summons (to be issued). The complaint will be assigned a new civil action number. Civil cover sheets need not be filed for cases directly filed in the AFFF MDL. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 40 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 63 et al (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Reason: Transcript will be refiled in master docket only per ECF technical issue re access Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Organization of Defendants' Counsel, Additional Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Committee Members, Rights and Privileges Preserved, Attorneys' Time and Expense Records, Monthly Status Conferences, Motions Practice, Status Conference on April 5, 2019 (see prior NOTICE at Dkt. No. 30), Other Matters. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 37 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG and spread in error to all member cases) Reason: Motion to appoint defense counsel removed and submitted to Chambers, per Chambers. Motion and all related deadlines to be removed from mn and all cv member cases. Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2019 (Response due date of original filing: 3/29/2019 terminated) Clerk's Notice Reminder: Per CMO No. 1, Filing, documents which relate to All Actions shall be filed and docketed in the master case only; when ECF prompts with the question, "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" counsel should choose "No." Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 32 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01282, Garcia et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03418-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01282. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01282 RBJ-kMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 27 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #26 Order. This case is directly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01282-RBJ-KMT. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/17/2018. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Chemguard. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chemguard re #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn. (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added
June 27, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laniyah Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laniyah Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Jiron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Jiron(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Perry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Perry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shawndra Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shawndra Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deana Julian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deana Julian(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josue Juvera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josue Juvera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brice Kadel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brice Kadel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie King(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Valerie King(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Knapp(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Kota(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Kota(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Kraemer(p
June 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONES issued by Clerk. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/15/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Being satisfied that cause has been shown, it is ordered that the Order to Show Cause #4 is hereby discharged. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/15/18. (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn (Caro, Louise) (Modified on 6/14/2018 edited the title of the text to reflect Response)(evana, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #11 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strike-Out Amended Complaint)(Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment, Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., filed by Wyatt Bonner, Cassi Bothel, Tiffany Bousfield, Tiffany (I) Bousfield, Shaelyne Brady, Earnest Brown, Latanya Brown, Patricia Burkepile, Amanda Caffey, Arlene Cano, Angelic Carrasquillo, Aimee Carroll, Aimee (I) Carroll, James Castro, Brian Cathey, Tyson Cattoor, Sarah Cerda, Sarah (I) Cerda, Joanne Chavez, Amy Claar, Wanda Cole, Amanda Contreras, Bud Cook, Kvia Cornett, Carol Costlow, Jessica Costlow, Darrell Coughlin, William Crispin, Anthony D'Mytro, Michelle Davis, Cassidy Dearinger, Sheryl Deken-Martinez, Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez, Phillip Delatorre, Amber Dore, Amber (I) Dore, Christopher Ellenburg, James Tyler Epperson, Amanda Erman, Amanda (I) Erman, Susanne Fauson, Jennifer Ferrell, Zachary Finley, Charles Fletcher, Angela Ford, Debra France, Dora Gallegos, Monica Garcia, Robert Garcia, Robert (I) Garcia, Marcia Gieck, Samuel Gieck, Carla Good, Derrell Gordon, Tiara Harris, David Hathcock, Tamara Hirsch, Cory Holt, John Hooser, John (I) Hooser, Gloria Hoyt, Mark Igou, Jr, Mark (I) Igou, Jr., Jeremy Ingman, Douglas Jarvis, Jennifer Jason, Deja Jinkins, Laniyah Jinkins, Darrell Jiron, Perry Johnson, Jessie Jones, Shawndra Jones, Deana Julian, Josue Juvera, Brice Kadel, Valerie King, Thomas Klasing, Stephen Knapp, Christopher Kota, Michael Kraemer, Dianna Kyle, Krystal Kyle, Christopher Lang, David Laster, Valerie Laster, Cathy Lawrence, Mary Lawrence, Luwanna Lazo Hernandez, Mario Lazo Hernandez, Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez, Victoria Litscomb, Lance Loffinik, Kim Look, Elberto Lopez, Danny Lovato, Lori Lovato, Kenyatta Lowery, Kenyatta (I) Lowery, Jennifer Lyon, Jennifer (I) Lyon, William Mabie, Andrea Macholz, Andrea (I) Macholz, Saul Macias, Lani Marsh, Alfred Alvarez, Tarena Anderson, Tarena (I) Anderson, Robert Babcock, Elizabeth Barrientes, Shevawn Basye, Joe Bechiom, Annelie Bergeron, Bradley Birks, Neil Marsh, Nicholas Marsh, Chris Mart, Shirley Mathis, Robert McCullough, Robert McDermott, Zachary McDonald, David Messenger, Heather Michaud, Waltraud Mickelson, Angela Middlestadt-Nukes, Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes, Mandy Middleton, Marie Mirenda, Alana Maria Mitchell, Jimmy Montoya, Jacki Moore, Luz Morales, Sabrina Mulford, Judy Neal, Isabel Pacheco, Stephanie Payne, Miguel Perez, Sr, Carrie Petersen, Richard Petersen-Trujillo, Michael Peterson, Michael (I) Peterson, David Plowman, Maggie Polley, Patrick Polley, Alex Porter, Nicholas Porter, Stacey Potts, Stacey (I) Potts, Paul Presta, Errolyn Quaiel, Thomas Quaiel, Shyanna Rains, Tyler Rains, Rico Ramos, Phillip Rash, Doug Redlin, Rachel Rich, Carmen Rocha, Neoma Rodriguez, William Sailor, Jr, William (I) Sailor, Jr, Cecelia Sandovol, Cecelia (I) Sandovol, Kimberly Sawyers, Dwight Scarlett, Natasha Scarlett, Jessica Schaule, Benjamin Selby, Darnelle Selby, Timothy Selby, Rayna Sheaffer, Todossii Short, Justin Snead, Caleb Snyder, Anya Soares, Jeremi Spake, Thomas Stancil, Lauren Starski, William Strachan, Wilma Strachan, Bridgette Swaney, Annette Y Telles, Landis Temple, Kerry Thomas, Cassandra Tijerina, Cassandra (I) Tijerina, Shawn Tinsley, Shawn (I) Tinsley, Chartrese Tuthill, Chartrese (I) Tuthill, Richard Valle, Rosalinda Villalobos, Rosalinda (I) Villalobos, Shenique Washington, Michael Wessell, Carlton Whitney, Melissa Wilson, Tonya Wright, Douglas Zinn.(Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tate James Kunkle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Atto
June 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party
June 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul J. Napoli on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laniyah Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laniyah Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darrell Jiron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Darrell Jiron(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Perry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Perry Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J.
June 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Gloria Hoyt(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark Igou, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Mark (I) Igou, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jeremy Ingman(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Douglas Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Jennifer Jason(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Deja Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro added to party Laniyah Jinkins(pty:pla), Attorney Louise Rita Caro
June 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tarena (I) Anderson (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiffany (I) Bousfield (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aimee (I) Carroll (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah (I) Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber (I) Dore (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert (I) Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tiara Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Hathcock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tamara Hirsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cory Holt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Hooser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John (I) Hooser (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti adde
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/04/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on June 14, 2018, plaintiffs shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summonses issued. (rsams, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment, Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6121871)Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alfred Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tarena Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Barrientes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shevawn Basye(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joe Bechiom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Annelie Bergeron(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradley Birks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wyatt Bonner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassi Bothel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tiffany Bousfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shaelyne Brady(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Earnest Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Latanya Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Burkepile(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Caffey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arlene Cano(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angelic Carrasquillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aimee Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tyson Cattoor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Cerda(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joanne Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Claar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wanda Cole(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bud Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kvia Cornett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carol Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessica Costlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Crispin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony D'Mytro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassidy Dearinger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheryl Deken-Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phillip Delatorre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Dore(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Ellenburg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Tyler Epperson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Erman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Susanne Fauson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Ferrell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Zachary Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra France(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dora Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Monica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marcia Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Samuel Gieck(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carla Good(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrell Gordon(pty:pla

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnelle Selby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Costlow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errolyn Quaiel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Julian
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chartrese (I) Tuthill
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Knapp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert (I) Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hirsch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Lawrence
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lawrence
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John (I) Hooser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jason
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lani Marsh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Villalobos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Cano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kraemer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Swaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Contreras
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Mulford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Messenger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Delatorre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Schaule
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawndra Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lovato
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Kyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lovato
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassidy Dearinger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McCullough
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annelie Bergeron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Rash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey (I) Potts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Costlow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Jarvis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Redlin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassi Bothel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Payne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laniyah Jinkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Lowery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremi Spake
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Presta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Scarlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Selby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Klasing
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Macias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Castro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrell Gordon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sawyers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todossii Short
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelic Carrasquillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Dore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyatta (I) Lowery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Starski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Igou, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mabie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Tinsley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela (I) Middlestadt-Nukes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Petersen-Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Plowman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Valle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda (I) Villalobos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Caffey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Michaud
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarena (I) Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Marsh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah (I) Cerda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lang
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D'Mytro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia (I) Sandovol
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Tijerina
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Erman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary McDonald
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luwanna (I) Lazo Hernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Good
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Crispin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landis Temple
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Cattoor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stancil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lyon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Fauson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Loffinik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Carroll
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Gieck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Cook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Polley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cerda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenique Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anya Soares
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber (I) Dore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Perez, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tyler Epperson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark (I) Igou, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hooser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael (I) Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elberto Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Mirenda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Zinn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Look
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Claar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Sandovol
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl (I) Deken-Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarena Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Quaiel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacki Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee (I) Carroll
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyanna Rains
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra (I) Tijerina
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaelyne Brady
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brice Kadel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Potts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra France
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Montoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shevawn Basye
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McDermott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Strachan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bousfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea (I) Macholz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Cole
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Babcock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Pacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Mathis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William (I) Sailor, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Holt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Whitney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt Bonner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Erman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Macholz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Snyder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wessell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Rich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hathcock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Polley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Coughlin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Cathey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Maria Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sailor, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Snead
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany (I) Bousfield
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luwanna Lazo Hernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn (I) Tinsley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Finley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ellenburg
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Petersen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Birks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kota
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti