City of Stuart, Florida v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Stuart, Florida
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam Inc, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, BASF Corporation, The Chemours Company, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The and Chemguard Inc
Respondent: Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03487
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Stuart, Florida (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proofs of Service of all Defendants)(Petosa, Frank)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corp. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, The 3M Company, The Chemours Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, filed by City of Stuart, Florida. Service due by 12/29/2020 (Petosa, Frank) Filing corrected for parties filed against, to include all as listed on document, not only for newly added defendant parties(sshe, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases. Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine LI Hacker on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hacker, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine A Roin on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Roin, Katharine)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by John S Phillips on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Phillips, John)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:20-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Counsel may e-file, as an attachment to the complaint or Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Dwerlkotte on behalf of E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dwerlkotte, David)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STATUS REPORT Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Dowdupont Inc., Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hacker, Katherine)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Summons Reissued re #35 as to Corteva Inc. (sshe, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Summons Reissued re #35 as to Dupont De Nemours Inc. (sshe, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, The Chemours Company. (sshe, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE RE Counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form, when necessary, to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Do not e-file. Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, National Foam Inc, The 3M Company, The Chemours Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Dynax Corporation, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, filed by City of Stuart, Florida. Service due by 1/2/2020(Petosa, Frank) Filing corrected to add new parties filing against as listed on document. (sshe, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:18-cv-03487-RMG. For the foregoing reasons, Stuart's motion to amend the complaint (Dkt. No. (189) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (25) in case 2:18-cv-03487-RMG) is GRANTED. Stuart is DIRECTED to promptly file the Amended Complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/2/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03487-RMG(sshe, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re (189 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 25 in 2:18-cv-03487-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by City of Stuart, Florida. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03487-RMG(Petosa, Frank)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (237 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,, for Leave to Amend Complaints by City of Stuart, Florida. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03487-RMG(Petosa, Frank)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re (189 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 25 in 2:18-cv-03487-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Sherk, John) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03487-RMG(sshe, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER re (215) motion for extension of time. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants are directed to file any responses in opposition on or before August 28, 2019. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. ((215) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (204 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 52 in 2:18-cv-03350-RMG) MOTION to Amend/Correct, (170 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 14 in 2:19-cv-01414-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (171 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 172 in 2:18-cv-03433-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (183 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 46 in 2:18-cv-03359-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (172 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 67 in 2:18-cv-03435-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (189 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 25 in 2:18-cv-03487-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File , (188 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 45 in 2:18-cv-03438-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (178 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 22 in 2:19-cv-00143-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (203 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 48 in 2:18-cv-03481-RMG) MOTION to Amend/Correct, (186 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 12 in 2:19-cv-01201-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (170 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 14 in 2:19-cv-01414-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (189 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 25 in 2:18-cv-03487-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File , (188 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 45 in 2:18-cv-03438-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (46 in 2:18-cv-03359-RMG, 183 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (171 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 172 in 2:18-cv-03433-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (172 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 67 in 2:18-cv-03435-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File, (12 in 2:19-cv-01201-RMG, 186 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (178 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 22 in 2:19-cv-00143-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (48 in 2:18-cv-03481-RMG, 203 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Amend/Correct, (52 in 2:18-cv-03350-RMG, 204 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Amend/Correct by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sherk, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Counsel should prepare and submit a proposed order in Word document format for any Motion to Withdraw as Attorney via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File by City of Stuart, Florida. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit redline comparison City of Stuart's proposed Amended Complaint with original Complaint, #4 Exhibit clean version City of Stuarts proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03487-RMG(Petosa, Frank)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 Any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to the AFFF MDL proceedings may file his or her case directly in the District of South Carolina, in accordance with Paragraphs 25 through 29 of CMO 3. The shell case number for cases related to the AFFF MDL is 2:19-av-55555. Please file the new complaint into this shell case and file as an attachment a Summons (to be issued). The complaint will be assigned a new civil action number. Civil cover sheets need not be filed for cases directly filed in the AFFF MDL. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (sshe, ).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 63 et al (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Reason: Transcript will be refiled in master docket only per ECF technical issue re access Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Organization of Defendants' Counsel, Additional Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Committee Members, Rights and Privileges Preserved, Attorneys' Time and Expense Records, Monthly Status Conferences, Motions Practice, Status Conference on April 5, 2019 (see prior NOTICE at Dkt. No. 30), Other Matters. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG and spread in error to all member cases) Reason: Motion to appoint defense counsel removed and submitted to Chambers, per Chambers. Motion and all related deadlines to be removed from mn and all cv member cases. Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2019 (Response due date of original filing: 3/29/2019 terminated) Clerk's Notice Reminder: Per CMO No. 1, Filing, documents which relate to All Actions shall be filed and docketed in the master case only; when ECF prompts with the question, "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" counsel should choose "No." Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Southern, 2:18-cv-14430, City of Stuart, Florida v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03487-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14430. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 2:18-cv-14430 electronically transferred out to South Carolina. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 2:18-cv-14430 electronically transferred out to South Carolina. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. This case is stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a ruling on transfer and consolidation or until further order of this Court. For administrative purposes only, the Clerk of the Court shall administratively close this case. Either party may file a motion to reopen the case at any time. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/20/2018. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products, LP (Krigbaum, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Sloan on behalf of Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products, LP. Attorney Michael David Sloan added to party Chemguard(pty:dft), Attorney Michael David Sloan added to party Tyco Fire Products, LP(pty:dft). (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint ( Responses due by 12/4/2018) by Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products, LP. Attorney Stephen J. Krigbaum added to party Chemguard(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J. Krigbaum added to party Tyco Fire Products, LP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Krigbaum, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robin Greenwald. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/29/2018. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robin Greenwald. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11114094 by City of Stuart, Florida. Responses due by 11/13/2018 (Petosa, Frank) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring counsel to confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, LP. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11085099, filed by City of Stuart, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Petosa, Frank) (Main Document 1 replaced with correct image on 10/18/2018) (ail). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Stuart, Florida v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Represented By: Stephen J. Krigbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Katharine A Roin
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: John K Sherk
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Represented By: John S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: John K Sherk
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Represented By: Katharine A Roin
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: John S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Katharine A Roin
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: John S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Represented By: Stephen J. Krigbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chemguard
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Represented By: Stephen J. Krigbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Stuart, Florida
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Robin L Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?