Bermo et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Plaintiff: Mark Dema, Judith Carr, Jonathan Donnelly, Terry Hovencamp, Michael Pietras, Lori Boykin, Daniel Lucak, Cynthia Hovencamp, Michael Coughlin, Loraine Miller, Annamarie Bermo, Erin Miller, Tara Singletary, Maria Hernandez, Kimberly Doyle, Steve Smith, Elron Melvin, Peter Gasparini, Jacqueline Scherch, Gary Vanvoorhis, Emma Gasparini and Rick Gutta
Defendant: National Foam Inc, The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, The City of Newburgh and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03522
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jon Knauf on behalf of The City of Newburgh Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03522-RMG(Knauf, Alan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K Kendall on behalf of The City of Newburgh Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03522-RMG(Kendall, Amy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from John J. Walsh, Esq.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03522-RMG(Walsh, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:18-cv-09283, Bermo et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03522-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:18-cv-09283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter, filed by 3M Company. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/17/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew J. Calica dated December 13, 2018 re: Advising the Court of the JPML Conditional Transfer Order. Document filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit JPML Transfer Order)(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/21/2018. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER with respect to #11 Letter Motion for Conference. Plaintiffs are directed to respond by 11/21/18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/15/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Paul E. Svensson dated 11/06/2018. Document filed by The City of Newburgh.(Svensson, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:17-cv-07131-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: National Foam, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018; The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey answer due 12/20/2018. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8 in 7:18-cv-09283-UA) Letter filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., (8 in 7:18-cv-09296-UA) Letter filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 29, 2018 re: Follow-up to October 25, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 25, 2018. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Walsh, II on behalf of The City of Newburgh. (Walsh, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 18CV7057. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-CV-07131, 17-CV-07134, 17-CV-07136, 18-CV-07057. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company.(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009308-2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15720140).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint with Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B- Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bermo et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dema
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Carr
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Donnelly
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hovencamp
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pietras
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Boykin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lucak
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hovencamp
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Coughlin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Miller
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamarie Bermo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Miller
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Singletary
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Doyle
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Smith
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elron Melvin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gasparini
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Scherch
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Vanvoorhis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Gasparini
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gutta
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Newburgh
Represented By: John J. Walsh, II
Represented By: Paul Edward Svensson
Represented By: Alan Jon Knauf
Represented By: John J Walsh, II
Represented By: Amy K Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?