Allen et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson, Reid Samedi, Hugh Mchugh, Lloyd Williams, Louella Jones, Lori Grieco, Pamela Frotnera, Matthew Pietras, Linda Robinson, Augustin Rivera, Larry Blanding, Sertaira Boyd, Roy Francis, Mavis Gardner, Ronald Lewis, Margaret Rutherford, Thomas Jackson, Dawn Sherwood, Sean Stewart, Amelia Russe, Betty Tolliver, Giuseppe Palladino, Antonio Wiggins, Robert Jennings, Luis Ramos, Rikki Pearson, Joseph Brescia, Patricia Fayo, Skyler Allen, Cynthia Mullon, Timothy Pietras, Stephanie Jetter, James Mcknight, Hilda Poulos, Martin Taggart, Lorrain Ward, Scott Purdy, Thomas Johnson, Craig Stewart, Ismael Diaz, Kenny Worthen, John Boykin, Alicia Dean, Christopher Cagna, Dorothy Hill, Joseph Fayo, Thomas Tulve III, Herman Pearson, Marybeth Rosolowski, Barbara Nicolato, Sarah Mack, Mark Protonentis, Natalie L. Caccavo-Nunnally, Ricki Gibbs, Josephus Foster, Marguerite Cavallo, Brian Wilson, Rose Torres, Bonnie Sakow, Raymond Strakosch, Deandra Wright, Kendall Bland, Andrew Marino, Maria Palladino, Sarah Vinson, Brian Tuitt, Johon Mckay, Mark Vanvoorhis, Mariano Rivera, Linda Mitchell, Carlette N. Jones, Marie Johnson, Delores Cain, Kenneth Mitchell, Francesco Macchiarella, Angelita Rivera, Anthony Ozga, Nicole Cagna and Louis Mercado
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc, The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, 3M Company and National Foam Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03523
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:18-cv-09296, Allen et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03523-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:18-cv-09296. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter, filed by 3M Company. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/17/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew J. Calica dated December 13, 2018 re: Advising the Court of the JPML Conditional Transfer Order. Document filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit JPML Transfer Order)(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:17-cv-07131-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: 3M Company answer due 12/20/2018; Tyco Fire Products L.P. answer due 12/20/2018. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. Chemguard, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018; National Foam, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018; The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey answer due 12/20/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8 in 7:18-cv-09283-UA) Letter filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., (8 in 7:18-cv-09296-UA) Letter filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 29, 2018 re: Follow-up to October 25, 2018 Letter. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 25, 2018. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Angelita Rivera added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.(Fleming, Douglas) Modified on 10/12/2018 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 17-cv-7131. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sarah Vinson; Sarah Vinson; Christopher Cagna; Christopher Cagna; Nicole Cagna; Nicole Cagna; Thomas Tulve III; 3M Company; Tyco Fire Products L.P.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; party text was entered incorrectly; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Angelita Rivera;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-CV-07131, 17-CV-07134, 17-CV-07136, 18-CV-07057. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company.(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009266-2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15726221).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Fleming, Douglas) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Samedi
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Mchugh
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louella Jones
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Grieco
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Frotnera
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Pietras
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Robinson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustin Rivera
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Blanding
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sertaira Boyd
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Francis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavis Gardner
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lewis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rutherford
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jackson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Sherwood
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Stewart
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Russe
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Tolliver
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Palladino
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Wiggins
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jennings
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramos
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikki Pearson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brescia
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fayo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Allen
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mullon
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Pietras
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jetter
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mcknight
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Poulos
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Taggart
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrain Ward
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Purdy
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Stewart
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Diaz
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Worthen
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boykin
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Dean
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cagna
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hill
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fayo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tulve III
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Pearson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth Rosolowski
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nicolato
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Mack
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Protonentis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie L. Caccavo-Nunnally
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricki Gibbs
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephus Foster
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Cavallo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Torres
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Sakow
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Strakosch
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandra Wright
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Bland
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Marino
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Palladino
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Vinson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tuitt
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johon Mckay
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vanvoorhis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Rivera
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mitchell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlette N. Jones
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Cain
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mitchell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesco Macchiarella
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita Rivera
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ozga
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Cagna
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Mercado
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?