Tidwell v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Lindy Tidwell
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lindy Tidwell. (Cauley, Penny)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC answer due 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent for Extension)(Echols, Chad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (vdru, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lindy Tidwell.(vdru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 1/22/2019 (vdru, ).
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8219967.), filed by Lindy Tidwell. Service due by 4/18/2019.(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindy Tidwell
Represented By: Penny Hays Cauley
Represented By: William Kyle Geddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?