Armstrong v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Travis Armstrong
Defendant: Speedway LLC and ATW Properties LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00389
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss Defendant ATW Properties, LLC Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/8/2019.(jbry, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER( 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/2/2019, Discovery due by 12/13/2019, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 1/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/2/2020, ADR Statement due by 1/3/2020, Mediation Due by 2/3/2020), Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/8/2019. (jbry, ) Modified on 4/8/2019 to edit text (jbry, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Dismiss ATW Properties LLC by ATW Properties LLC, Speedway LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Crites, J)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by ATW Properties LLC, Speedway LLC.(Crites, J)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by ATW Properties LLC, Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Crites, J)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/8/2019, Discovery due by 11/4/2019, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/15/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 11/29/2019, Mediation Due by 12/31/2019, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/1/2019.(jbry, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Travis Armstrong.(Boan, Jason)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by ATW Properties LLC, Speedway LLC.(Crites, J)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ATW Properties LLC, Speedway LLC.(jbry, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-22-01004. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8262381), filed by Speedway LLC, ATW Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Armstrong
Represented By: Jason Preston Boan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATW Properties LLC
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?