Campbell et al v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al
Plaintiff: Richard Campbell and Joan Campbell
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00422
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 63 et al (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Reason: Transcript will be refiled in master docket only per ECF technical issue re access Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Organization of Defendants' Counsel, Additional Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Committee Members, Rights and Privileges Preserved, Attorneys' Time and Expense Records, Monthly Status Conferences, Motions Practice, Status Conference on April 5, 2019 (see prior NOTICE at Dkt. No. 30), Other Matters. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG and spread in error to all member cases) Reason: Motion to appoint defense counsel removed and submitted to Chambers, per Chambers. Motion and all related deadlines to be removed from mn and all cv member cases. Filing date of original filing: 3/15/2019 (Response due date of original filing: 3/29/2019 terminated) Clerk's Notice Reminder: Per CMO No. 1, Filing, documents which relate to All Actions shall be filed and docketed in the master case only; when ECF prompts with the question, "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" counsel should choose "No." Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. (sshe, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wisconsin Eastern, 1:19-cv-00162, Campbell et al v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-422-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00162. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 2873) transferring this action to the USDC-District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by the Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/13/2019. (cc: all counsel)(tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to March 8, 2019, for all Defendants to File an Answer, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/04/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Chemguard, Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Riebe, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chemguard, Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Riebe, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of Chemguard, Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
January 31, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Chemguard, Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Riebe, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by Chemguard, Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Riebe, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc from Marinette County, Case Number: 18-cv-277 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3022025) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marinette County Summons and Complaint)(Riebe, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Campbell
Represented By: Charles J Crueger
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Campbell
Represented By: Charles J Crueger
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: George Burnett
Represented By: Ryan J Riebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: George Burnett
Represented By: Ryan J Riebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?